Erickson v. Utah State Legislature et al
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | Jill N Parrish |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00048 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 20, 2024 2:23 AM MDT |
Defendant
Utah Attorney General
|
|
Defendant
Utah State Judiciary
|
|
Defendant
Utah State Legislature
|
|
Plaintiff
Joshua D Erickson
1771 N 2525 E
LAYTON, UT 84040 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Wed 04/17 11:27 AM
ORDER denying 6 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 4/17/24. (dle) |
|
order
Order Referring Motion
Wed 04/17 10:48 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Joshua D Erickson. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 4/17/24. (dle) Modified by correcting Judge on 4/17/2024 (dle) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
utility
Reassignment to District Judge
Thu 04/11 9:00 AM
NOTICE OF NON-CONSENT Consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge under DUCivR 72-4 has not been obtained. Case randomly assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish and Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Magistrate Judge is automatically referred under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B). Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned as the presiding judge to the case. (mh) |
||
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appoint Counsel
Wed 03/20 1:50 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Originally received by the court on 03/18/2024). filed by Plaintiff Joshua D Erickson. (sg) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Complaint (Court)
Wed 03/20 1:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Utah Attorney General, Utah State Judiciary, Utah State Legislature (Originally received by the court on 03/18/2024). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Joshua D Erickson. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (sg) |
|
Att: 1 USM-285 Form, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/20 1:43 PM
ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. 1. The court will screen this case under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) and DUCivR 3-2(b). 2. The time to serve the complaint is tolled until further order of the court. 3. If this case is allowed to proceed, the court will order service of process on Defendant(s). 4. Plaintiff must not file any motions or other documents during the time this case is screened or until the court orders otherwise. However, Plaintiff may file court forms (e.g., the email filing and electronic notification form for unrepresented parties and the consent to jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge form). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 03/20/2024. (sg) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment
Wed 03/20 10:35 AM
NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not e-file the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Joshua D Erickson. Form due by 4/10/2024. (mh) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Lodged Document
Tue 03/19 4:11 PM
DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint, Motion to appoint counsel, USM 285, Civil Cover Sheet, Envelope. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court.(sg) |
|
Att: 1 Motion to Appoint Counsel, | ||
Att: 2 Form USM 285, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/19 4:07 PM
**SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. filed by Plaintiff Joshua D Erickson. (sg) |