Arizona District Court
Judge:G Murray Snow
Referred: Eileen S Willett
Case #: 2:24-cv-00559
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2024
Terminated:May 28, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 71 minutes ago
Friday, February 07, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 02/07 10:14 AM
ORDER denying as moot12 ,14 Plaintiff's Applications to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Court will take no action on the Amended Complaint (Doc.11 ). This case must remain closed. Signed by Senior District Judge G Murray Snow on 2/7/25. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
14 14 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 02/05 12:33 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Rosalinda Leon (5 pages). (DXD)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Change of Address (Party) Tue 02/04 4:13 PM
NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Rosalinda Leon: 4235 W San Juan, Phoenix, AZ 85019. (1 Page) (KLG)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
12 12 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 10/28 3:15 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Rosalinda Leon (2 pages). (DXD)
Related: [-]
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 10/28 3:14 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arizona State Prison Complex, Perryville filed by Rosalinda Leon (6 pages).(DXD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
10 10 order Clerks Judgment Tue 05/28 3:31 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's Order filed May 28, 2024, judgment of dismissal is entered. Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice. (DXD)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/28 3:29 PM
ORDER denying2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and granting8 Motion to Dismiss. The Complaint (Doc.1 ) is dismissed without prejudice and the Clerk must enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/28/24. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
8 8 motion Dismiss Case Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/21 11:27 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Case, MOTION Waive Fees by Rosalinda Leon. (2 pages) (EJA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Change of Address (Party) Fri 05/10 9:36 AM
NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Rosalinda Leon: #206401, A-21-01, ASPC Perryville/ Lumley Unit, PO Box 3300, Goodyear, AZ 85338 (1 page). (DXD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/07 11:11 AM
NOTICE re: Inmate Leon #206401 has moved to the B.W. Lumley unit by Santa Cruz Librarian.(DXD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Change of Address Form
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
5 5 misc Notice: Prisoner Case Subject to Electronic Filing Tue 03/19 11:53 AM
NOTICE: This case is subject to electronic filing. Please review the attached documents. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment Tue 03/19 11:52 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (DXD)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Tue 03/19 11:50 AM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Rosalinda Leon (15 pages). (DXD)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 03/19 11:48 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Rosalinda Leon (3 pages). (DXD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/19 11:46 AM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Rosalinda Leon (26 pages).(DXD)
Related: [-]