New York Western District Court
Case #: 6:24-cr-06044
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 20, 2024 3:17 AM EDT
Defendant
Connor Stevenson (1)
Represented By
William Michael Swift
The Law Office Of James L. Riotto Ii
contact info
Steven G. Slawinski
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sean C. Eldridge
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/20/2024 3:42 AM EDT
Thursday, February 23, 2023
Arrest of Connor Stevenson (LMD) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs COMPLAINT as to Connor Stevenson (1). (LMD) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen: Appearances: Def. w/Steve Slawinski, AFPD; Sean Eldridge, AUSA and Jennifer Cannito, Esq.; DATE OF ARREST: 2/23/2023. Initial Appearance as to Connor Stevenson held on 2/23/2023 Steve Slawinski AFPD appointed provisionally until pending the filing of a financial affidavit. Government moves for detention under f (1)(A), f (2)(A) and c(3)(A) and c(3)(B). Detention Hearing set for 2/27/2023 04:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 1st Floor, 100 State Street, Rochester NY before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. Court directs the government to comply with Brady v. Maryland. Written Brady v. Maryland order to be issued. Time Excluded as to Connor Stevenson from:2/23/2023 to 2/27/2023 in the interest of justice. (FTR Gold.) (LMD) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
3 3 ORDER as to Connor Stevenson regarding continuing Brady obligations.. Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 2/23/23.(KAP) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen:Status Conference as to Connor Stevenson held on 2/27/2023. Appearances: Steven G. Slawinski, AFPD; Sean C. Eldridge, AUSA. Detention Hearing not held, Deft will reserve the right to request one in the future if necessary. Mr. Slawinski is exploring the possibility of inpatient treatment for Deft. Parties further working towards pretrial resolution. Status Conference/Set PH Date set for 3/27/2023 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. TIME EXCLUDED FROM 2/27/2023 TO 3/27/2023 FOR REASONS STATED ON THE RECORD. Deft remains in custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(JB) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Connor Stevenson: (JB) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
5 5 MOTION for Bond by Connor Stevenson.(Slawinski, Steven) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Obituary
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
6 6 TEXT ORDER as to Connor Stevenson re5 MOTION for Bond filed by Connor Stevenson: Detention Hearing set for 3/22/2023 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 1st Floor, 100 State Street, Rochester NY before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 3/21/2023.(JB) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
Remark: 23-MR-6036 assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa (JB) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen:Detention Hearing as to Connor Stevenson held on 3/22/2023. Appearances: Steven G. Slawinski, AFPD; Sean C. Eldridge, AUSA; Jennifer Cannito, USPO; Tammy Stevenson, Witness. Govt proceeds by proffer. Deft provides rebuttal. Tammy Stevenson, Deft's Mother, is called to testify. Witness sworn, direct examination takes place. Govt provides cross-examination. Witness is excused at the conclusion of cross-examination. Govt replies to rebuttal, Deft provides sur-rebuttal. The Court will recess to consider the arguments presented. Detention Hearing set to continue 3/22/2023 at 12:30 PM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen.(Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(JB) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen:Detention Hearing as to Connor Stevenson held on 3/22/2023. Appearances: Steven G. Slawinski, AFPD; Sean C. Eldridge, AUSA; Jennifer Cannito, USPO. After consideration of the arguments, the Court grants Deft's MOTION for Bond (ECF5 ) and denies Govt's motion for detention. Deft will be ordered released from custody upon receiving word a bed is available at Conifer Park. Deft is further ordered temporarily released from custody to attend his fiance's funeral on 3/23/2023, written order to be issued. Govt requests time to seek an appeal of these orders from the District Court. Govt will have until close of business to file said relief. Status Conference/Set PH Date remains set for 3/27/2023 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. TIME REMAINS EXCLUDED TO 3/27/2023 FOR REASONS STATED ON THE RECORD. Deft remains in custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(JB) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Connor Stevenson (1). Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 3/22/2023.(JB) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER granting in part5 Motion for Bond Bond set for Connor Stevenson (1). Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 3/22/2023.(JB) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
11 11 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by USA as to Connor Stevenson re10 Order on Motion for Bond, 8 Detention Hearing,,,9 Order Setting Conditions of Release (Eldridge, Sean) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
12 12 **DISREGARD, FILED IN ERROR** MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re11 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court and Emergency Stay Application by Connor Stevenson (Slawinski, Steven) Modified on 3/22/2023 (JB). [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
13 13 5 pgs MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re11 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court and Emergency Stay Application by Connor Stevenson (Slawinski, Steven) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Connor Stevenson held on 3/22/23 before Judge Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Brandi Wilkins, scalisba@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/12/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/24/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2023. (Wilkins, Brandi) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
15 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen:Status Conference as to Connor Stevenson held on 3/27/2023. Appearances: Steven G. Slawinski, AFPD; Sean C. Eldridge, AUSA. Parties request time to continue resolution discussions. Status Conference/Set PH Date set for 4/27/2023 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. TIME EXCLUDED FROM 3/27/2023 TO 4/27/2023 FOR REASONS STATED ON THE RECORD. Deft remains in custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(JB) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
16 16 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Connor Stevenson. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 3/30/23.(KAP) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
17 17 MOTION to Adjourn Status Conference by Connor Stevenson. (Slawinski, Steven) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
Set/Reset Hearings as to Connor Stevenson:( Status Conference set for 5/30/2023 01:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 1st Floor, 100 State Street, Rochester NY before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen.), ***Excludable started as to Connor Stevenson:, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Connor Stevenson: (JB) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
18 18 TEXT ORDER granting17 Motion to Adjourn Status Conference as to Connor Stevenson (1). The Status Conference shall be adjourned until 5/30/2023 at 1:00 PM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. At Defendant's request, time is excluded in the interests of justice pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161 (h)(7)(A) until the adjourn date. I find that the Defendant's and the public's interest in a speedy trial are outweighed by the Defendant's interest in having sufficient time to continue plea negotiations with the Government. Should the parties need additional time to continue resolution discussions, a request must be filed, in writing, no less than 5 business days in advance of the new conference date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 5/1/2023.(JB) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
Set/Reset Hearings as to Connor Stevenson:( Status Conference set for 5/30/2023 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 1st Floor, 100 State Street, Rochester NY before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen.), Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Connor Stevenson: (JB) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
19 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen:Status Conference as to Connor Stevenson held on 5/30/2023. Appearances: Steven G. Slawinski, AFPD; Sean C. Eldridge, AUSA. Parties indicate they intend to contact a District Judge for a Plea Hearing. Status Conference/Set PH Date set for 7/11/2023 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. TIME EXCLUDED FROM 5/30/2023 TO 7/11/2023 FOR REASONS STATED ON THE RECORD. Deft remains in custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(JB) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
20 20 First MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Connor Stevenson. (Swift, William) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
21 21 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Appearance of Counsel Attorney: William M. Swift. by Connor Stevenson. (Swift, William) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
22 22 TEXT ORDER granting21 Motion for Leave to Appear Notice of Appearance of William M. Swift as to Connor Stevenson (1). SO ORDERED.. Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on June 22, 2023.(VSG) Clerk to Follow up [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
CALENDAR EVENT as to Connor Stevenson: Status Conference reset for 7/11/2023 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 1st Floor, 100 State Street, Rochester NY before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. PLEASE NOTE THE CHANGE IN TIME . (JB) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
23 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen:Status Conference as to Connor Stevenson held on 7/11/2023. Appearances: William Michael Swift, Esq.; Sean C. Eldridge, AUSA. Mr.Swift notes his appearance on the record, parties request additional time to review the plea agreement and potentially reschedule the matter before a District Judge for resolution. Status Conference/Set PH Date set for 8/31/2023 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. TIME EXCLUDED FROM 7/11/2023 TO 8/31/2023 FOR REASONS STATED ON THE RECORD. Deft remains in custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(JB) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
24 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen:Status Conference as to Connor Stevenson held on 8/31/2023. Appearances: William Michael Swift, Esq.; Cassie M. Kocher, AUSA on behalf of Sean C. Eldridge, AUSA. Parties continuing to work towards resolution, request a 60-day adjournment. Status Conference/Set PH Date set for 10/30/2023 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. TIME EXCLUDED FROM 8/31/2023 TO 10/30/2023 FOR REASONS STATED ON THE RECORD. Deft remains in custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(JB) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
25 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen:Status Conference as to Connor Stevenson held on 10/30/2023. Appearances: William Michael Swift, Esq.; Sean C. Eldridge, AUSA. Parties continuing to work towards resolution, request one final 30-day adjournment. Status Conference/Set PH Date set for 11/27/2023 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. TIME EXCLUDED FROM 10/30/2023 TO 11/27/2023 FOR REASONS STATED ON THE RECORD. Deft remains in custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(JB)[6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
26 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen:Status Conference as to Connor Stevenson held on 11/27/2023. Appearances: William Michael Swift, Esq.; Sean C. Eldridge, AUSA. Deft not present, the Court waives his presence under Rule 43(b). Parties request a further adjournment seeking time to schedule the matter before a District Judge for resolution. Status Conference/Set PH Date set for 1/25/2024 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. TIME EXCLUDED FROM 11/27/2023 TO 1/25/2024 FOR REASONS STATED ON THE RECORD. Deft remains in custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(JB) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
27 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen:Status Conference as to Connor Stevenson held on 1/25/2024. Appearances: William Michael Swift, Esq.; Sean C. Eldridge, AUSA. Mr. Swift requests a further 30-day adjournment to review a proposed offer with his client and determine whether to accept. Status Conference/Set PH Date set for 2/27/2024 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. TIME EXCLUDED FROM 1/25 TO 2/27/2024 FOR REASONS STATED ON THE RECORD. Deft remains in custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(JB) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
28 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen:Status Conference as to Connor Stevenson held on 2/27/2024. Appearances: William Michael Swift, Esq.; Sean C. Eldridge, AUSA. Deft not present, the Court waives his presence under Rule 43(b). Counsel is directed to advise his client that further failures to appear may result in the issuance of a production order. Parties seeking a date to appear for resolution before a District Judge. Status Conference/Set PH Date set for 3/26/2024 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. TIME EXCLUDED FROM 2/27/2024 TO 3/26/2024 FOR REASONS STATED ON THE RECORD. Deft remains in custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(JB) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Connor Stevenson. Plea Agreement Hearing set for 3/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, 100 State Street, Rochester NY 14614 before Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. (KJA) [6:23-mj-00534-MJP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
29 29 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Connor Stevenson. (JHF)
Related: [-]
30 30 2 pgs INFORMATION as to Connor Stevenson (1) count(s) 1, 2. (JHF)
Related: [-]
31 31 11 pgs PLEA AGREEMENT as to Connor Stevenson. (JHF)
Related: [-]
32 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Charles J. Siragusa: Sean Eldridge, AUSA appearing on behalf of government. William Swift, Esq. appearing with defendant. Plea Hearing as to Connor Stevenson held on 3/19/2024. Plea entered by Connor Stevenson (1), Guilty Counts 1 and 2 of the Information. PROBATION NOTIFIED OF PLEA. Sentencing set for 7/22/2024 at 9:15 AM in US Courthouse, 100 State Street, Rochester NY 14614 before Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Defendant remains in custody. (Court Reporter Brandi Wilkins.)(KJA)
Related: [-]
33 33 2 pgs SENTENCE GUIDELINE ORDER as to Connor Stevenson. Sentencing set for 7/22/2024 at 9:15 AM before Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO READ THE ATTACHED ORDER AS THE FULL CONTENTS OF THE ORDER ARE NOT CONTAINED IN THIS DOCKET ENTRY . Motions for Extensions of time are due two (2) business days prior to the expiration of any deadline. Untimely requests for extension of time will not be considered. The Court will not consider late submissions or application for extensions of time. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 3/19/2024.(KJA)
Related: [-]