District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00453
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 20, 2024 3:22 AM EDT
Defendant
ZACHARY SHANABERGER (1)
Represented By
Gary E. Proctor
Law Offices Of Gary E. Proctor, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Peter V. Roman
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Thomas G. Strong
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/20/2024 3:50 AM EDT
Thursday, December 21, 2023
1 1 INDICTMENT as to ZACHARY SHANABERGER (1) count(s) 1. (FORFEITURE ALLEGATION) (zltp)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to ZACHARY SHANABERGER.(zltp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to ZACHARY SHANABERGER (1). Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/21/2023. (zltp)
Related: [-]