US v. Baez-Nova
Original Case: 1:21-cr-10163
First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cr-01261 |
Type | criminal / conviction and/or sentence |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 01, 2024 7:51 PM EDT |
Appellee
UNITED STATES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
ROBINSON ALBERTO BAEZ-NOVA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/01/2024 7:51 PM EDT |
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
CRIMINAL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #138) filed by Appellant Robinson Alberto Baez-Nova. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 04/02/2024. 24-1261 (AVN) | ||
Att: 1 30 pgs Abbreviated Record | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Case Opening Notice | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF |