North Carolina Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Benjamin A Kahn
Case #: 6:24-bk-50204
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Apr 29, 2025

Debtor
Freirich Foods, Inc.
819 W Kerr St
Salisbury, NC 28144-3241
Represented By
John A. Northen
contact info
Vicki L. Parrott
contact info
Last checked: never
Bankruptcy Administrator
John Paul Hughes Cournoyer
U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator 101 South Edgeworth Street
Greensboro, NC 27401


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 12:01 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
306 306 court Notice of Confirmation Wed 04/30 8:41 AM
Notice of Order Confirming Plan (Shoffner, T.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
305 305 order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan Tue 04/29 4:50 PM
Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan. (Whitesell, S.)
Related: [-]
304 304 2 pgs order Use Cash Collateral Tue 04/29 4:45 PM
Final Order Denying as Moot Motion To Use Cash Collateral Related [+] (Whitesell, S.)
Related: [-] 3
court Hearing Held (Motion) Tue 04/29 1:04 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] (Franklin, Richard)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Freirich Foods, Inc.
court Hearing Held (Other) Tue 04/29 1:06 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] (Franklin, Richard)
Related: [-] 215 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor Freirich Foods, Inc.
court Court Minutes no document alt Tue 04/29 1:10 PM
Court Minutes - Date of Hearing: 4/29/2025 Appearances: John Northen, Matthew Weiner, Bob Price Related [+]
Related: [-] 3 Motion by Debtor to Use Cash Collateral (8), OREDERED: denied as moot215 Confirmation of Chapter 11 Plan, ORDERED: confirmed as amended, O: Northen (Franklin, Richard
Friday, April 25, 2025
303 303 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 04/26 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 301 Notice (Generic)
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
302 302 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 04/24 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 04/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 297 Order on Application for Compensation
301 301 court Notice (Generic) (with BNC option) Wed 04/23 9:51 AM
Notice Of Tentative Hearing Adversary. Related [+] Objections are due 5/9/2025. If an objection is filed, a hearing will be held on 5/28/2025 at 09:30 AM Courtroom #1, Greensboro) (Shoffner, T.)
Related: [-] related document298 Motion to Approve Settlement in Adversary Proceeding No. 24-6005 Filed by Plaintiff Freirich Foods, Inc.
300 300 misc Ballots - Summary of Voting Wed 04/23 9:35 AM
Summary of Voting on Debtor's Plan of Reorganization Filed by Debtor Freirich Foods, Inc.. (Northen, John)
Related: [-]