Ofray v. City of Rochester et al
New York Western District Court | |
Judge: | Elizabeth A Wolford |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-06170 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 20, 2024 11:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
City of Rochester
City Hall 30 Church St. Room 400A City Hall
Rochester, NY 14614 |
|
Defendant
RPD Officer Mitchell Leach
Rochester Police Department 185 exchange blvd
Rochester, NY 14614 |
|
Defendant
Rochester Police Department
Rochester Police Department 185 exchange blvd
Rochester, NY 14614 |
|
Petitioner
Jasmine Ofray
239 Avenue D
Rochester, NY 14621 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
utility
E-Filing Notification Wrong Event Used
Tue 04/16 2:31 PM
E-Filing Notification:11 AFFIDAVIT of Service. Incorrect event used to electronically file document. For future reference, use Summons Returned Executed event. No action required. (RE) |
||
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/16 2:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed11 City of Rochester served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024; Mitchell Leach served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024; Rochester Police Department served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024. (RE) |
||
utility
E-Filing Notification Not Legible
Tue 04/16 2:58 PM
E-Filing Notification:11 AFFIDAVIT of Service. Clerk corrected scan to view right side up. In future, please attached scan in proper format. (RE) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 04/12 11:40 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Verified Complaint served on RPD/Ofc. Leach/City of Rochester on 4 12-2024 filed by Jasmine Ofray. (Young, Mark) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/28 4:15 PM
Summons Issued as to Mitchell Leach. (TMK) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Continuation of Exhibits
Thu 03/28 12:38 PM
CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to1 Complaint summons-RPD Ofc. Mitchell Leach . (Young, Mark) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/28 12:34 PM
Summons Issued as to City of Rochester, Rochester Police Department. (TMK) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/28 12:20 PM
Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK) |
||
adr
Automatic Referral to Mediation
Thu 03/28 12:21 PM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's[LINK:ADR webpage] and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at[LINK:adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov] .' Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the [LINK:ADR Plan] and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan. (TMK) |
||
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/28 12:21 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (TMK) |
||
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Continuation of Exhibits
Wed 03/27 2:41 PM
CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to1 Complaint Fed summons all def. . (Young, Mark) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Continuation of Exhibits
Wed 03/27 2:40 PM
CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet . (Young, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Continuation of Exhibits
Tue 03/26 9:31 AM
CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to1 Complaint Summons-all parties separate . (Young, Mark) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Continuation of Exhibits
Tue 03/26 9:30 AM
CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to2 Continuation of Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet . (Young, Mark) |
|
3 | 3
order
Text Order
Tue 03/26 9:01 AM
TEXT ORDER to Show Cause why this case should not be stricken for failure to submit the Civil Cover Sheet as required by Local Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 3. The deadline to respond to this Order to Show Cause is April 25, 2024. Failure to comply with this order will result in this case being stricken from the court docket. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 03/26/2024.(CAL) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
utility
E-Filing Notification
Fri 03/22 9:45 AM
E-Filing Notification:2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS Civil Cover Sheet . (Young, Mark) ACTION REQUIRED: filing Attorney is directed to file a completed civil cover sheet, pursuant to Local Rule 3. No judge assignment will be made until filing is entered on the docket. Please utilize the Continuation of Exhibits event, located within the Responses and Replies category. Summonses for issuance please use the Original Summons Filed event, found under Service of Process. (DMK) |
||
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Continuation of Exhibits
Thu 03/21 8:45 AM
CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS Civil Cover Sheet . (Young, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/20 9:23 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5133951, filed by Jasmine Ofray.(Young, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
E-Filing Notification
Wed 03/20 2:35 PM
E-Filing Notification:1 COMPLAINT filing Attorney is directed to file a completed civil cover sheet, pursuant to Local Rule 3. No judge assignment will be made until filing is entered on the docket. Please utilize the Continuation of Exhibits event, located within the Responses and Replies category. Summonses for issuance please use the Original Summons Filed event, found under Service of Process. (RE) |