Nivo 1, LLC
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Sheri Bluebond |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-12115 |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Nivo 1, LLC
458 N Doheny Dr # 1889
Los Angeles, CA 90069-7563 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
trustee
Trustee's Notice of Continued Meeting of Creditors (Rule 2003(e)) (No PDF)
Mon 04/22 9:56 AM
Trustee's Notice of Continued Meeting of Creditors Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA). 341(a) Meeting Continued to 4/29/2024 at 09:00 AM at UST-LA3, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-811-2961, PARTICIPANT CODE:9609127. (Shevitz, David) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice
Thu 04/18 11:51 AM
Notice of Security Interest in Rents & Profits (5958 Carlton Way, Units 1-4, Los Angeles, CA 90028) Filed by Creditor HARTMAN 2020 INVESTMENTS, a California general partnership, dated October l3, 2021; W. ROBERT KOHORST; ERNEST M. POSEY, "Trustee of the Ernest Posey Business Trust; PETER RICHTER; PETER SIGFRIED. (Silverman, Timothy) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
court
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document
Wed 04/17 10:14 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other - Proof of service required. (SM) |
|
court
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Wed 04/17 3:02 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Hearing to be held on 05/29/2024 at 11:00 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1539 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for8 , (LL) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Declaration
Tue 04/16 6:42 PM
Declaration re: Response to Order to Show Cause Filed by Debtor Nivo 1, LLC. (Manasian, Paul) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 04/16 6:35 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Paul Edward Manasian Filed by Debtor Nivo 1, LLC. (Manasian, Paul) |
|
Saturday, March 30, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Sat 03/30 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 03/30/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Thu 03/28 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/28/2024. (Admin.) |
|
9 | 9
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
Thu 03/28 11:35 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/22/2024 at 09:00 AM at UST-LA3, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-811-2961, PARTICIPANT CODE:9609127. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 6/21/2024. (LL2) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
OSC to appear and show cause (BNC-PDF)
Tue 03/26 2:59 PM
Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal Based On Non-Individual Debtors Lack Of Representation By An Attorney (BNC-PDF) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing in this case will be held in Courtroom 1539 at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012 on April 17, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Signed on 3/26/2024 (ME2) |
|
court
Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Tue 03/26 3:00 PM
Hearing Set Hearing to be held on 04/17/2024 at 10:00 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1539 Los Angeles, CA 90012. The hearing judge is Sheri Bluebond (ME2) |
||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
nef
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Mon 03/25 8:31 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Silverman, Timothy. (Silverman, Timothy) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Fri 03/22 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/22/2024. (Admin.) |
|
4 | 4
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Fri 03/22 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/22/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
court
X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired)
Wed 03/20 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1,738.00 by KC. Receipt Number 22001416. (admin) |
|
1 | 1
8
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 03/20 9:18 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Nivo 1, LLC List of Equity Security Holders due 4/3/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 4/3/2024. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 4/3/2024. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 4/3/2024. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 4/3/2024. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 4/3/2024. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 4/3/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 4/3/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 4/3/2024. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 4/3/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 4/3/2024. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 4/3/2024. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 4/3/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 4/3/2024. (KC2) |