Vertical Holdings, LLC
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Janet S Baer |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-03994 |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Debtor
Vertical Holdings, LLC
612 Aborn Ave
Elgin, IL 60124 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Frank J Kokoszka
Kokoszka & Janczur, P.C. 19 South LaSalle Suite 1201
Chicago, IL 60603 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Docket last updated: 03/20/2024 12:04 PM CDT |
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7a)
Wed 03/20 9:32 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Fee Amount $338, Filed by Richard G Larsen on behalf of Vertical Holdings, LLC (Larsen, Richard) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 03/20 9:34 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-03994 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47666079. Fee Amount $ 338.00 (Larsen, Richard) (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Asset Corporation)
Wed 03/20 10:11 AM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/15/2024 at 12:00 PM via Zoom - Kokoszka: Meeting ID 682 668 2897, Passcode 9254024265, Phone 1-872-201-1823. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) |