YOUNGBLOOD-MCDANIEL et al v. DIAGNOSTIC BIOSCIENCE LABORATORIES, LLC
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas P Barber |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00700 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 20, 2024 2:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
DIAGNOSTIC BIOSCIENCE LABORATORIES, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
ENDPOINT CAPITAL, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TRACY YOUNGBLOOD-MCDANIEL
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons returned executed
Wed 04/10 12:55 PM
RETURN of service executed on 04/05/2024 by Tracy Youngblood-McDaniel, Endpoint Capital, LLC as to Diagnostic Bioscience Laboratories, LLC. (Zoesch, John) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Fri 03/22 4:13 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Endpoint Capital, LLC, Tracy Youngblood-McDaniel. Related case(s): No (Zoesch, John) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/22 4:10 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Endpoint Capital, LLC, Tracy Youngblood-McDaniel. (Zoesch, John) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Thu 03/21 2:31 PM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Thu 03/21 2:30 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons issued
Thu 03/21 10:55 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Diagnostic Bioscience Laboratories, LLC. (LD) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/20 3:09 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 8:24-cv-700-TPB-UAM. (RLK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/20 2:08 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21891119) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Zoesch, John) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - MIPA Fully Executed, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons |