WOOTEN v. Commissioner of Social Security
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Joel B Toomey |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00701 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/02 1:18 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 8:24-cv-701-JBT. Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson no longer assigned to the case. (NAS) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of substitution of AUSA
Tue 03/26 4:26 PM
Notice of substitution of AUSA. Robert Dalton Windham substituting for Nadine DeLuca Elder. (Windham, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/20 2:20 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:24-cv-701-TGW. (AJS) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/20 1:08 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by NIKOLITSA WOOTEN. (Quick, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Wed 03/20 1:08 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jason Daniel Quick on behalf of NIKOLITSA WOOTEN. Lead Counsel: Jason Quick. (Quick, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/20 1:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21890976). The plaintiff CONSENTS to jurisdiction of the United States magistrate judge filed by NIKOLITSA WOOTEN.(Quick, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |