Gamble Williams v. Boston Police Department et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Patti B Saris |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10701 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/18 3:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Theodore Gamble Williams.(McDonagh, Christina) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Copy Mailed
Wed 03/20 4:26 PM
Copy ECF#4 and IFP Form mailed to Theodore Gamble Williams #W117585 Old Colony Correctional Center 1 Administration Road Bridgewater MA 02324 on 3-20-24. (Castilla, Francis) |
|
4 | 4
order
PSSA Order 7 - Prisoner IFP but no account statement
Wed 03/20 4:25 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. Procedural Order regarding resolution of filling fee. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must respond within 21 days. (Castilla, Francis) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Wed 03/20 2:10 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Cook, Savannah) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/20 1:21 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Theodore Gamble Williams.(Castilla, Francis) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/20 1:18 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Theodore Gamble Williams.(Castilla, Francis) |