Slone et al. v. Transworld Systems, Inc.
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | J Philip Calabrese |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00521 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 20, 2024 2:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Transworld Systems, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jacob Slone, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wendy Slone
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
Wed 04/10 9:22 AM
Order [non-document]: Defendant's motion for an extension to May 3, 2024 to answer, move, or otherwise plead is unopposed and granted (ECF No.4 ). Judge J. Philip Calabrese on April 10, 2024.(Y,A) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event)
Tue 04/09 4:33 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Aston Acquisition Corp. for Transworld Systems, Inc. filed by Transworld Systems, Inc.. (St. Angelo, Bradley) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Extension (answer complaint)
Tue 04/09 4:29 PM
Stipulated Motion for extension of time until May 3, 2024 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Transworld Systems, Inc.. Related document(s)1 .(St. Angelo, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Return of Service Executed
Thu 04/04 11:25 AM
Return of Service by personal service executed upon Transworld Systems, Inc. on 3/22/2024, filed on behalf of Wendy Slone; Jacob Slone, Jr (Ramirez, Marita) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
oth_evt
Summons Issued
Wed 03/20 2:09 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Transworld Systems, Inc. (F,AW) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/20 1:36 PM
Complaint for Damages with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $405.00, receipt number AOHNDC-12467145. Filed by Wendy Slone, Jacob Slone, Jr. (Ramirez, Marita) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Cease and Desist Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Wed 03/20 2:05 PM
Judge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (F,AW) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Wed 03/20 2:06 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (F,AW) |