Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Karoline Mehalchick
Case #: 3:24-cv-00483
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2024
Terminated:Jan 24, 2025
Last checked: Monday Sep 16, 2024 4:37 AM EDT
Defendant
Universal Printing Company LLC
Represented By
Adam D. Brown
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Shannon Hampton Sutherland
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Mediator
Mediator
Represented By
Thomas B. Helbig
Helbig Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
Cheryl Hodovanec
Represented By
Peter C Wood, Jr.
Mobilio Wood
contact info


Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago
Friday, January 24, 2025
28 28 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case (60 Day Settlement Order) Fri 01/24 8:59 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all deadlines in the above-captioned action are STAYED, the Clerk of Court is directed to mark this matter CLOSED for statistical purposes only, and the parties shall, as soon as practicable, submit an appropriate dismissal filing in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a). Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 1/24/2025. (cw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
27 27 misc Report of Mediator (Settlement Reached) Wed 01/22 4:20 PM
REPORT OF MEDIATOR (Settlement Reached). (Helbig, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
26 26 misc Status Report Fri 12/20 9:28 AM
STATUS REPORT by Cheryl Hodovanec. (Wood, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 12/09 1:39 PM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order or on or before Monday, December 23, 2024, counsel shall file a joint status report as to the status of mediation. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 12/9/2024. (cw)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
24 24 9 pgs order Order Approving Stipulation Mon 11/04 12:05 PM
Order approving re23 Stipulation Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 11/4/2024. (cw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
23 23 misc Stipulation Thu 10/31 2:12 PM
STIPULATION by Universal Printing Company LLC, filed by Universal Printing Company LLC.(Brown, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order Mon 09/09 7:36 PM
CIVIL PRACTICE ORDER - Use of Generative Artificial Intelligence ("AI"). See Order for details. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 9/9/2024. (cd)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order Mon 08/19 1:07 PM
CIVIL PRACTICE ORDER re: Use of Generative Artificial Intelligence. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 8/19/24. (cp)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
20 20 order Scheduling Order Fri 08/16 9:58 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/14/2024. Discovery due by 2/14/2025. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 4/14/2024. Defendant Expert Report is due by 5/14/2025. Motions due by 3/14/2025. Supplemental due by 5/30/2025. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 8/16/2024. (cw)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Fri 08/16 9:46 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Thomas B. Helbig for Mediator added. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 8/16/2024. (cw)
Related: [-]
18 18 7 pgs order Order Fri 08/16 9:41 AM
CIVIL PRACTICE ORDER. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 8/16/2024. (cw)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Fri 08/16 9:54 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Scheduling Order (Doc 17) deleted and will be refiled. (cw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
15 15 misc Case Management Plan Thu 08/08 10:24 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Cheryl Hodovanec. (Wood, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
14 14 order Verbal Order (Not Ruling on Motions) Tue 07/09 10:20 AM
VERBAL ORDER Per Defendants letter (Doc. 13 ), Attorney Sutherland is excused from the CMC scheduled on August 14, 2024. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 7/9/2024. (jkc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
13 13 misc Letter Mon 07/08 11:29 AM
Letter dated 7/3/24 to the Court from Shannon Hampton Sutherland. (dj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order Tue 07/02 8:08 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2024 11:00 AM before Honorable Karoline Mehalchick. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 7/2/2024. (cw) (cw)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 06/17 3:28 PM
ANSWER to9 Amended Complaint by Universal Printing Company LLC.(Brown, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 06/04 2:51 PM
ORDER finding as moot7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 6/4/2024 (cw)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 06/03 2:29 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Universal Printing Company LLC, filed by Cheryl Hodovanec.(Wood, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
8 8 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Mon 05/20 3:55 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Age-Based Discrimination filed by Universal Printing Company LLC.(Brown, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unpublished Opinion(s)
7 7 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 05/20 3:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Age-Based Discrimination by Universal Printing Company LLC.(Brown, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Thursday, April 04, 2024
6 6 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Thu 04/04 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam D. Brown on behalf of Universal Printing Company LLC (Brown, Adam)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Thu 04/04 10:01 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Hampton Sutherland on behalf of Universal Printing Company LLC (Sutherland, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 03/28 12:45 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Cheryl Hodovanec. Universal Printing Company LLC waiver sent on 3/20/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Wood, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/26 12:06 PM
CIVIL ASSIGNMENT ORDER - SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 3/26/2024. (cw)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
misc Docket Annotation Mon 03/25 11:21 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Mehalchick. (nr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
misc Docket Annotation Thu 03/21 9:13 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Mannion. (jw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 03/20 11:43 AM
Summons Issued as to Universal Printing Company LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (ao)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/20 11:42 AM
COMPLAINT against Universal Printing Company LLC ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number APAMDC-6583036), filed by Cheryl Hodovanec.(ao)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet