Washington Western District Court
Judge:Benjamin H Settle
Case #: 3:24-cv-05215
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 16, 2024 1:40 AM PDT
Defendant
Holt Group Inc
Represented By
Steven L Naito
Tarlow Naito & Summers
contact info
Plaintiff
Savannah Intellectual Property LLC
Represented By
Scott T Schauermann
Hitt Hiller Monfils Williams LLP
contact info
Louis M Heidelberger
The Law Officeof Louis M Heidelberger Esq PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 28, 2025
37 37 misc Status Report Fri 03/28 7:57 AM
Third STATUS REPORT by Defendant Holt Group Inc (Esler, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
36 36 misc Joint Status Report Thu 01/23 11:57 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Homen, Delfina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
35 35 misc Joint Status Report Thu 12/26 3:57 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Homen, Delfina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
34 34 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 11/27 11:22 AM
ORDER granting Parties'32 Stipulated Motion to Stay. The parties shall file with the Court joint status reports every thirty (30) days from the date of this Order on the progress of the Oregon Litigation until such time as final decisions are issued on those two dispositive motions. All remaining case deadlines, including the remaining patent construction deadlines, as well as Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendant's pending motion for judgment on the pleadings (Dkt. No.30 ), will be reset as appropriate once the stay is no longer in effect. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
33 33 respm Declaration Tue 11/26 2:56 PM
DECLARATION of Delfina Homen filed by Defendant Holt Group Inc re32 Stipulated MOTION to Stay Case Pending Motions Decision in Oregon(Homen, Delfina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
32 32 motion Stay Tue 11/26 2:55 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Stay Case Pending Motions Decision in Oregon , filed by Defendant Holt Group Inc. Noting Date 11/26/2024, (Homen, Delfina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 14, 2024
31 31 respm Declaration Thu 11/14 3:36 PM
DECLARATION of Jim Reinhart filed by Defendant Holt Group Inc re30 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Homen, Delfina)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Thu 11/14 3:34 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , filed by Defendant Holt Group Inc. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 12/12/2024, (Homen, Delfina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
29 29 misc Transcript - Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Wed 10/23 4:45 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held on 9/19/2024 before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at[LINK:www.wawd.uscourts.gov] . To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Sheri Schelbert, sheri_schelbert@wawd.uscourts.gov, 253-882-3831. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2025, (SLS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
28 28 6 pgs misc Memorandum Thu 10/10 4:20 PM
MEMORANDUM Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions by Plaintiff Savannah Intellectual Property LLC(Schauermann, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Monday, September 30, 2024
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 09/30 11:56 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's26 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Plaintiffs Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions due 10/10/2024; Non-infringement and invalidity contentions due 11/12/2024; Exchange of Initial Disclosures due 11/12/2024; Exchange of Proposed Terms and Claims Elements for Construction due 11/29/2024; Preliminary Claim Construction due 12/30/2024. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
26 26 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 09/26 1:39 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , filed by Plaintiff Savannah Intellectual Property LLC. Noting Date 9/26/2024, (Schauermann, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
Friday, September 20, 2024
25 25 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/20 3:48 PM
ORDER re22 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Delfina S Homen for DEFENDANT Holt Group Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (MG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
24 24 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 09/19 2:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Plaintiffs Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions due by 9/30/2024, Non-infringement and invalidity contentions due by 10/30/2024, Exchange of Initial Disclosures due by 10/30/2024, Exchange of Proposed Terms and Claims Elements for Construction due by 11/19/2024, Preliminary Claim Construction due by 12/19/2024, Joint Claim Construction due by 2/3/2025, Construction Expert Disclosures due by 2/3/2025, Completion of Claim Construction Discovery due by 3/24/2025, Opening Claim Construction Brief due by 3/29/2025, Responsive Claim Construction Brief due by 4/13/2025, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 7/14/2025, Motions due by 8/25/2025, Discovery completed by 9/22/2025, Dispositive motions due by 10/22/2025, Motions in Limine due by 12/15/2025, Pretrial Order due by 12/29/2025, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 8/13/2025, Trial briefs to be submitted by 12/30/2025, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 12/30/2025, Pretrial Conference set for 1/5/2026 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle.***10 Day*** Jury Trial is set for 1/20/2026 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. The court will not provide remote public access for this hearing.(MET)
Related: [-]
23 23 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 09/19 2:41 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held on 9/19/2024 before Judge Benjamin H. Settle- Dep Clerk: Mary Trent ; Pla Counsel: Louis Heidelberger, Scott Schauermann ; Def Counsel: Brian Esler ; CR: Sheri Schelbert ; Time of Hearing: 1:45 PM ; Courtroom: E ; Court hears from counsel, reviews proposed pretrial and trial dates and orders one trial date to begin on January 20, 2026. Scheduling order to follow. (MET)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/19 12:32 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Delfina S. Homen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Holt Group Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8634713 (Esler, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Wed 09/18 1:52 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Steven L Naito for Defendant Holt Group Inc. (Naito, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/17 4:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian William Esler on behalf of Defendant Holt Group Inc. (Esler, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 09/11 9:25 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 9/19/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MET)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
18 18 misc Joint Status Report Wed 09/04 9:41 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 10. (Naito, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 07/31 9:01 AM
Pursuant to the request and agreement of the parties, the following deadlines are reset: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/21/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/28/2024, Joint Status Report due by 9/4/2024. (MET)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
17 17 misc Jury Demand Thu 05/16 11:18 AM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Holt Group Inc (Naito, Steven)
Related: [-]
16 16 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Thu 05/16 10:32 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re13 Answer to Complaint. ***Action Required*** Jury Demand Improperly Indicated. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (AMD)
Related: [-]
15 15 order BHS - Discovery, Depositions, and JSR Order (FORM) Thu 05/16 10:01 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/31/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/7/2024, Joint Status Report due by 8/14/2024. (MET)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
14 14 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 05/15 3:03 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Sekisui House, Ltd. for Holt Group Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Holt Group Inc. (Naito, Steven)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/15 2:57 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND Attorney Steven L Naito added to party Holt Group Inc(pty:dft) by Holt Group Inc.(Naito, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 04/26 2:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Holt Group, Inc.'s motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, Dkt.11 , is unopposed and, therefore, GRANTED. This deadline is extended to 5/15/2024. Authorized by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(AMD)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/26 12:49 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, , filed by Defendant Holt Group Inc. Noting Date 4/26/2024, (Naito, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
10 10 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/11 4:04 PM
ORDER re9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Louis M Heidelberger for PLAINTIFF Savannah Intellectual Property LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (MG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
utility Notice to PHV and Local Counsel Unable to Process Application Wed 04/10 12:15 PM
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice9 by attorney Louis M. Heidelberger will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or[LINK:WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov] with additional questions.(MG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
9 9 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/09 10:25 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Louis M. Heidelberger FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Savannah Intellectual Property LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8422973 (Schauermann, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion for Relief Mon 04/08 5:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff Savannah Intellectual Property's unopposed motion for relief from LCR 83.1(D)(2), Dkt.4 , is GRANTED. Its Portland, Oregon based counsel, Scott Schauermann, may act as local counsel for pro hac vice counsel Louis Heidelberger, notwithstanding the fact Schauermann does not have a physical office in in the Western District of Washington. Future motions in the case should be accompanied by a Proposed Order. LCR 7(b)(1). IT IS SO ORDERED. Authorized by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(AMD)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 04/05 12:10 PM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Holt Group Inc. (AMD)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Praecipe for a Summons Fri 04/05 11:29 AM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Savannah Intellectual Property LLC (Schauermann, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
utility Notice of Docket Text Modification Mon 04/01 10:06 AM
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re5 Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement : Added Affiliate. (AMD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
5 5 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 03/27 12:02 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Savannah Intellectual Property LLC. (Schauermann, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion Noting Date (Public) Mon 03/25 9:23 AM
Noting Date reset by Clerk to 4/12/2024, re4 MOTION for Relief. (AMD)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
4 4 motion Relief Fri 03/22 12:56 PM
MOTION for Relief from Local Rule 83.1(D)(2) , filed by Plaintiff Savannah Intellectual Property LLC. Noting Date 3/22/2024, (Schauermann, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Thursday, March 21, 2024
3 3 utility Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright Thu 03/21 2:42 PM
Initial REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (AMD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
2 2 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Wed 03/20 11:28 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Copyright/Patent/Trademark Forms Omitted. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (AMD)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 03/20 10:30 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) The Holt Group, Inc., a Washington Corporation with JURY DEMAND Related [+] filed by Savannah Intellectual Property LLC, a Pennsylvania Limited Liability Company.(Schauermann, Scott) Modified on 3/20/2024 to strike duplicate text (AMD)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8397367
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 03/20 11:25 AM
Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (AMD)
Related: [-]
utility Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Wed 03/20 11:29 AM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Plaintiff must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3/27/2024. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(AMD)
Related: [-]