West Virginia Southern District Court
Judge:Joseph R Goodwin
Case #: 2:24-cv-00136
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 16, 2024 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
American Zurich Insurance Company
Represented By
Arie M. Spitz
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Jeffrey D. Van Volkenburg
Varner & Van Volkenburg
contact info
Adam Samuel Fox
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Debra Tedeschi Varner
Varner & Van Volkenburg
contact info
Plaintiff
The City of Ravenswood
Represented By
Stuart A. McMillan
Bowles Rice
contact info
Jonathan T. Mayhew
Bowles Rice
contact info
Grayson Noah O'Saile
Bowles Rice
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
155 155 5 pgs respm Memorandum In Support Fri 04/25 2:48 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW by American Zurich Insurance Company in support of154 MOTION by American Zurich Insurance Company to Continue TRIAL DATE (Varner, Debra)
Related: [-]
154 154 motion Continue Fri 04/25 2:46 PM
MOTION by American Zurich Insurance Company to Continue TRIAL DATE (Varner, Debra)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
153 153 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/18 11:53 AM
ORDER continuing the pretrial conference and trial dates as the Court considers Plaintiff's113 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Defendant's115 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2025 at 10:00 AM in Charleston before Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. Final Settlement Conference set for 6/16/2025 at 9:00 AM in Charleston before Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. Trial set for 6/17/2025 at 8:30 AM in Charleston before Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/18/2025. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (skm)
Related: [-]