Louisiana Middle District Court
Judge:Brian A Jackson
Referred: Scott D Johnson
Case #: 3:24-cv-00225
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2024
Terminated:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Monday Sep 16, 2024 3:18 AM CDT
Defendant
Joseph Biden
Represented By
Candace B. Ford
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
First Guaranty Bank
Represented By
Patrick Roger Follette
Chehardy Sherman Williams Murray Recile Stakelum And Hayes
contact info
Nicholas Ryan Varisco
Chehardy Sherman Williams
contact info
Matthew Arthur Sherman
Chehary, Sherman, Williams
contact info
Defendant
Guaranty Bank and Trust Co.
Represented By
Madaline King Rabalais
Butler Snow LLP
contact info
Randal J. Robert
Butler Snow
contact info
Defendant
Kamala Harris
Represented By
Candace B. Ford
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Xochitl Torres Small
Represented By
Candace B. Ford
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By
Candace B. Ford
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Candace B. Ford
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Vilsack
Represented By
Candace B. Ford
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Alfreda Rodney Williams
15864 La. Hwy. 970 South
Lettsworth, LA 70753
Plaintiff
Peter James Williams
15864 La. Hwy. 970 South
Lettsworth, LA 70753

GPO Feb 28 2025
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Guaranty Bank and Trust Co., 29 Rule 12 (B)(6) MOTION to Dismiss filed by First Guaranty Bank, 33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America. It is the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that the Defendants' Motions to Dismiss be granted and Plaintiffs' claims dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 3/14/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 2/28/2025. (JEG)
GPO Mar 26 2025
RULING and ORDER : Adopting 46 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Motions to Dismiss 21, 29 and 33 are GRANTED. The matter be and is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 03/26/2025. (ELW)

Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
55 55 appeal USCA Case Number Tue 05/06 8:29 AM
USCA Case Number 25-30250 for54 Notice of Appeal filed by Peter James Williams. (NLT)
Related: [-]