Almeida v. Taxiarchos et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Leo T Sorokin |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10704 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Violation 5th & 8th Amendme |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 20, 2024 3:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
City of New Bedford
|
|
Defendant
Rose Renee Fernandes
|
|
Defendant
Tallage Davis, LLC
|
|
Defendant
John Taxiarchos
|
|
Plaintiff
Ana Almeida
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 04/26 8:35 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: re8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 5/15/2024 to File Answer. ALLOWED. City of New Bedford answer due 5/15/2024. (Dore, Samantha) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/25 10:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott G. Ofrias on behalf of City of New Bedford (Ofrias, Scott) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 04/25 9:52 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 5/15/2024 to File Answer by City of New Bedford.(Thayer, Kenneth) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/25 9:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth N. Thayer on behalf of City of New Bedford (Thayer, Kenneth) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 03/29 3:59 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Ana Almeida. City of New Bedford served on 3/25/2024, answer due 4/15/2024. Acknowledgement filed by Ana Almeida. (Rosenberg, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 03/26 11:57 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ana Almeida. Tallage Davis, LLC waiver sent on 3/21/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Rosenberg, Nicholas) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/20 4:29 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kinsella, Jaylannie) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Wed 03/20 4:24 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Cook, Savannah) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 03/20 2:33 PM
NOTICE by Ana Almeida Notice of Constitutional Challenge to State Statute (Gardner, Joshua) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/20 2:22 PM
COMPLAINT against City of New Bedford, Rose Renee Fernandes, John Taxiarchos, Tallage Davis, LLC Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10326618 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Ana Almeida.(Gardner, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Form |