Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Charles P Kocoras
Case #: 1:24-cv-02294
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2024
Terminated:May 29, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 16, 2024 3:37 AM CDT
Defendant
The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Defendant
ANLANGGO
Defendant
Assessment location
Defendant
Asuka Art Deco
Defendant
BULUOGEDI
Defendant
BYWIN
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
BaiShaDunTingKeJiYouXianGongSi
Defendant
Bao Li Clothing
Defendant
Bitynre
Defendant
Buzzdaisy Children's Clothing
Defendant
CAMEL HOME TEXTILE
Defendant
CAShaobeiq
Defendant
COLDSTONE
Defendant
CYHART
Defendant
Can be applied to
Defendant
Christ Eby
Defendant
Ckdiluy
Defendant
Commander
Defendant
Coskidz
Defendant
DANG VAN NAM
Defendant
DAPUYIYOU
Defendant
Defendant 205
Defendant
Defendant 88
Defendant
Defendant182
Defendant
Designer&BD LTD
Defendant
DingAnBaiMuShangMaoYouXianGongSi
Defendant
ERYEE
Defendant
Firefly Phone Case
Defendant
Fjing023946XzhenY
Defendant
FoShanShiQianHongZhenMaoYiYouXianGongSi
Defendant
Focus Sticker Shop
Defendant
From a perspective
Defendant
FuXiangShangMao
Defendant
Funny Custom Store
Defendant
GMEGEOME
Defendant
GuWenShangMaoYouXianGongSi
Defendant
Guangzhou Kaiyue Trading
Defendant
Guangzhoutianhoushangmaoyouxiangongsi
Defendant
GuoYangBo0220
Defendant
HALIL IBRAHIM ILI LLC
Defendant
Hangyuan Store
Defendant
Happy making friends
Defendant
Hengxinboda
Defendant
Huangwei SP
Defendant
Huatingzhencaizanyangfuzhuangdian
Defendant
Intercloud sticker
Defendant
J.Bart
Defendant
JBDSB
Defendant
JIANGTAO-YANG
Defendant
JKQNBVGT
Defendant
JXLEDNEON
Defendant
JapanGreatBlanket361
Defendant
Jianyao Art
Defendant
Jie Xin Department Store
Defendant
Jiexi Hong
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace(80)
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
Kawaii Daisy
Defendant
KuYangDaShangMao
Defendant
KunMingPangShaiShangMao
Defendant
Kunming Ruisi Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
LIJIANMEI
Defendant
LIUCARLL
Defendant
LXT Art
Defendant
LY Wall Art Decor
Defendant
LYHYiXiangxiaodian
Defendant
Ladonna 10
Defendant
LingLunShangMao
Defendant
Luzhia
Defendant
Lvner
Defendant
Meilinshangmao
Defendant
Ming Tea Wall Art
Defendant
MoCa
Defendant
My Dear Home
Defendant
NANCHANGGEFUMAOYIYOUXIANGONGSI
Defendant
NESD
Defendant
NanYangKaiXin
Defendant
Nqi220086BtongB
Defendant
PENGCHENG-GU
Defendant
PlayFishFish
Defendant
Pucky
Defendant
QUBin
Defendant
Qdong215779WlanS
Defendant
Ran Shops
Defendant
Red
Defendant
SHUNSUTONG
Defendant
Shanghai Yiting trading Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen East Yuan Ting trading Co., LTD
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
Shenzhen Perfect global Technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Shenzhen Qushi Technology Co., LTD
Defendant
SizenuNaK
Defendant
Skywalking
Defendant
Songgo Electronic Equipment
Defendant
Songpqkty
Defendant
Ssheng172015YshuoH
Defendant
Star Neon
Defendant
SuBingJian DianZi
Defendant
Supjuiors
Defendant
THE ARCHER
Defendant
TNOLTK STORE
Defendant
Tongpp
Defendant
Took-US
Defendant
Vaxson
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
Vinis0
Defendant
WangZeng0220
Defendant
WuXiaoYan1983
Defendant
Xiangtan Xiukun Business Department
Defendant
XingShan Ltd
Defendant
XingTaiQiZhiXiWenHuaChuanBoYouXianGongSi
Defendant
Xingtaizaokangjianzhugongchengyouxiangongsi
Defendant
Xingtian Ltd.
Defendant
XuKe1989
Defendant
YLKBZSG
Defendant
YXDZSW8
Defendant
YZhenSheng
Defendant
Yangwandedian
Defendant
Your Friend Art Firm
Defendant
Yuanfengyang
Defendant
ZAObA
Defendant
ZCXDF
Defendant
ZYT-USA
Defendant
ZhiJiangShiLanLiuShangMaoYouXianGongSi
Defendant
ZhouQi Shop
Defendant
Zmao132613SyueH
Defendant
aizhimimaoyiyouxia
Defendant
bantianyaokaoyu
Defendant
bastingoo
Defendant
blueland
Defendant
chenglihuibaihuolingshou
Defendant
chenyiliangosidxx
Defendant
dabushuanghedianzi
Defendant
first 1
Defendant
foshanshisanshuiqukenkemengmaoyishanghang
Defendant
guangzhouloudoukejishanghang
Defendant
guangzhoushengzhenzhenwangluokejiyouxiangongsi
Defendant
guangzhouyueteshangmaoyouxiangongsi
Defendant
hefeinaoliuwangluojejiyouxiangongsi
Defendant
heminsway
Defendant
hnmlvy
Defendant
hongyaofPMM8Fu6
Defendant
jinzhehuawangluokeji
Defendant
jiujiangyongdishiwangluokeji
Defendant
jixinweidianpu
Defendant
kunminglongxiaodeshangmaoyouxiangongsi
Defendant
leiyijiangbaihuoshanghang
Defendant
li shuang space poster
Defendant
lijunnbiaobeimei
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
lipengfeigf
Defendant
liujunjiedebeimeixiaodian
Defendant
mingwuhuachenfanyuexinxijishuy
Defendant
panlingbobaihuoshanghangpbl6398
Defendant
panlongqutiancongbaihuoshanghang
Defendant
panlongquweimobaihuoshanghang
Defendant
pillar liu
Defendant
pingdingheyangshangmaoyouxiangongsi
Defendant
putianshichengxiangqulishengxiongbaihuoshanghanggetigongsh anghu
Defendant
putianshichengxiangquxialinjiedaowuchaopingbaihuol
Defendant
putianshilichengquanruinibaihuoshanghang
Defendant
putianshilichengqugongchenjiedaolijianbinbaihuolin
Defendant
putianshilichengquqianliyibaihuodian
Defendant
qinhongxiaodianshop
Defendant
renjinru
Defendant
renyinghao
Defendant
rongxunyytt
Defendant
sdferfxvd
Defendant
wUIEN2DRRS
Defendant
wangyaliped
Defendant
wangyuzhen store
Defendant
wenchengzenghaibao
Defendant
wuhuqujihangshangmaoyouxiangongsi
Defendant
xianningzhenxingdianzishangwuyouxiangongsi
Defendant
xianyouxianlichengjiedaoheweibaihuolingshouchaoshi
Defendant
xianyouxianlichengjiedaowanghuiriyongpinjingyingbu
Defendant
xianyouxianlinanzhenyuyongchaojiadianshanghang
Defendant
xieruyi123
Defendant
xieyunhandexiaodian
Defendant
yangquanshijiaoquerlimaoyishanghang
Defendant
yangwenxunlaoa
Defendant
yaochengwei
Defendant
yearn wall poster
Defendant
yiwushihaijiuchengsanmaoyiyouxiangongsi
Defendant
yong Liu Shop
Defendant
younger life style
Defendant
yuanxibaihuo
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
yunchengshiyanhuqudonglishangmaoltd
Defendant
yunchengshiyanhuqufeitongdianzishangwuyouxiangongs
Defendant
yunchengshiyanhuqujiuhongmaoyebaihuodian
Defendant
zelinmuye
Defendant
zhang290095hao050529qi
Defendant
zhangoujie
Defendant
zhaomingjiang334-US
Defendant
zhaoziweidexiaodianpu
Defendant
zhoubindexiaodian
Defendant
zhuhaiNB
Defendant
zhushihaodexiaodianpu
Plaintiff
TV Tokyo Corporation
Represented By
Cameron Eugene Mcintyre
Jiangip LLC
contact info
Monica Rita Martin
Jiang Ip LLC
contact info
Adam Grodman
Jiangip LLC
contact info
Christopher Romero
Jiangip, LLC
contact info
Yi Bu
Jiangip LLC
contact info
Keith A. Vogt
Keith Vogt, Ltd.
contact info
Yanling Jiang
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
At US
Terminated: 05/23/2024
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace(149)
Terminated: 04/16/2024
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace(64)
Terminated: 04/16/2024
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace(69)
Terminated: 04/16/2024
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace(81)
Terminated: 04/16/2024
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace(Express)(80)
Terminated: 04/16/2024
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace(Selection)(138)
Terminated: 04/16/2024
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace(Selection)(145)
Terminated: 04/16/2024
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace(Selection)(82)
Terminated: 04/16/2024
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace(Selection)(83)
Terminated: 04/16/2024
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace(Selection)(84)
Terminated: 04/16/2024
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace(Selection)(85)
Terminated: 04/16/2024
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace(Selection)(86)
Terminated: 04/16/2024
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace(Selection)(97)
Terminated: 04/16/2024
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace(U.S)(102)
Terminated: 04/16/2024
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace(U.S)(115)
Terminated: 04/16/2024
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace(U.S)(76)
Terminated: 04/16/2024
Defendant
Joybuy Marketplace(U.S)(89)
Terminated: 04/16/2024
Defendant
Kirdeivy
Terminated: 05/23/2024


Docket last updated: 09/12/2024 8:18 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (vkm, )
Related: [-]
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (vkm, )
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs COMPLAINT filed by TV Tokyo Corporation; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21766530.(Vogt, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
2 2 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation Schedule A to Complaint 1 (Vogt, Keith)
Related: [-]
3 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith)
Related: [-]
4 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith)
Related: [-]
5 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling)
Related: [-]
6 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi)
Related: [-]
7 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam)
Related: [-]
8 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Cameron Eugene Mcintyre (Mcintyre, Cameron)
Related: [-]
9 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Monica Rita Martin (Martin, Monica)
Related: [-]
10 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Christopher Romero (Romero, Christopher)
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TV Tokyo Corporation (Vogt, Keith)
Related: [-]
12 12 MOTION by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation for leave to file under seal (Vogt, Keith)
Related: [-]
13 13 MOTION by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation for leave to file excess pages (Vogt, Keith)
Related: [-]
15 15 30+ pgs MEMORANDUM in support of 14 Exparte motion(Vogt, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-4, of Keith A. Vogt's declaration,
Att: 3 Declaration of Hiroaki Saiki,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1, of Hiroaki Saiki's declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2, of Hiroaki Saiki's declaration
16 16 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation Sealed Exhibit 3, Declaration of Hiroaki Saiki regarding memorandum in support of motion,15(Vogt, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 3-1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 3-2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3-4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3-5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 3-6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 3-7
17 17 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for leave to file12 , motion for leave to file excess pages13 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 3/28/2024 at 09:50 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
Related: [-]