In Re Application for Order Enforcing a Subpoena
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Myong J Joun |
Case #: | 1:24-mc-91151 |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Terminated: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 03/21 11:39 AM
Judge Myong J. Joun: ORDER entered. ALLOWED re1 APPLICATION to Issue Subpoenas to Produce Documents.(Dore, Samantha) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Thu 03/21 9:07 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Myong J. Joun assigned to case. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
misccs
Application for Order Enforcing a Subpoena
Wed 03/20 4:32 PM
APPLICATION for an order enforcing a subpoena / Application to Issue Subpoenas to Produce Documents Filing fee: $ 52, receipt number AMADC-10327222 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Henry, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Julie Dennehy Document Subpoena, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Bee Santangelo Document Subpoena, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Mark Walter Document Subpoena, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Beautox Etc's Amended Response to Allergan's First Set of Interrogatories |