Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas M Horan
Case #: 1:24-bk-10443
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors5,001-10,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
SC Healthcare Holding, LLC
830 West Trailcreek Dr.
Peoria, IL 61614
Represented By
Joel McKnight Mudd
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Andrew L Magaziner
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Carrie V Hardman
C/o Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Carol E Thompson
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Gregory Michael Gartland
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Shella Borovinskaya
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Scott Ahmad
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Carol E Cox
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Daniel J. McGuire
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 7:26 PM EDT
Claims Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global
222 N. Pacific Coast Highway Suite 300
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Albert Kass
Kcc Llc Dba Verita Global
contact info
Creditor
Tammy Maclaughlin, as independent administrator of the Estate of Carol Tribble
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Stacy Colnaghi, Special Administrator of the Estate and Person of Christopher Colnaghi
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Hickory Point Bank & Trust
Represented By
Samuel J. Witsman
Hart, Southworth And Witsman
contact info
Michael G. Busenkell
Gellert Seitz Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Illinois Department of Healthcare and Family Services
115 S LaSalle St
Chicago, IL 60603
Represented By
John Reding
Illinois Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Creditor
SumnerOne, Inc.
Represented By
Domenic E. Pacitti
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Creditor
JMB Capital Partners Lending LLC
Represented By
Emily Hong
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Eric J. Monzo
Morris James LLP
contact info
Francisco Vazquez
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Christopher M. Donnelly
Morris James LLP
contact info
Brya Michele Keilson
Morris James LLP
contact info
Robert M. Hirsh
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Creditor
Jessica Reading, in her capacity as independent administrator of the estate of Cheryl Heatherly
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
John Goodall, Independent Administrator of the Estate of Marcel Wilhelm
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Judy Woolsey, Independent Administrator of the Estate of Dimple Burch
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Terri Scarborough
Represented By
Daniel M O'Hare
Bailey & Glasser, LLP
contact info
Jonathan Gold
Bailey & Glasser LLP
contact info
David A. Felice
Bailey & Glasser, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Lument Real Estate Capital LLC, f/k/a Lancaster Pollard Mortgage Company
Represented By
Jacob D Mahle
Vorys Sater Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Carrie M. Brosius
Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Margaret A. Vesper
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Charles C. Bissinger, Jr.
Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Kari B. Coniglio
Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Matthew G. Summers
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Laurel D. Roglen
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Rock Island County Health Department
2112 25th Avenue
Rock Island, IL 61201
Represented By
Austin Richard Carlson
Rock Island County State'S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Rock Island County Collector
1504 3rd Avenue
Rock Island, IL 61201
Represented By
Austin Richard Carlson
Rock Island County State'S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Martin Brothers Distributing Company, Inc.
Represented By
Aaron S. Applebaum
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Emily C. S. Jones
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Kristina M Stanger
Nyemaster Goode P C
contact info
Creditor
Renee A. Wright, Plenary Guardian of the Estate and Person of Diane K. Jorgensen
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Jeffrey Garfinkle
Buchalter
contact info
Creditor
Mark B. Petersen
Represented By
Barry A. Chatz
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Paige Noelle Topper
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Creditor
Wayne Feller, as Independent Executor of the Estate of Catheryn C. Feller
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Randy Blodgett
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Pamela Dabney, Special Administrator of the Estate and Person of William Dabney
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Mytoshia Hilson-Thomas, Administrator of the Estate of Keith Lamore Thomas, Sr.
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Julia Clemons, Special Administrator of the Estate and Person of Danny Love
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Bank of Rantoul
Represented By
John A. Lipinsky
Clingen, Callow & Mclean, LLC
contact info
Brian A. Sullivan
Werb & Sullivan
contact info
Creditor
Farrell Herron, Special Administrator of the Estate and Person of Norma Herron
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Billy C. McQueen
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Donna Giesler, Special Administrator of the Estate and Person of Duane Ayres
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Dorothy Kiratsous
528 Cimmaron Circle
Crystal Lake, IL 60012
Represented By
Kevin Justen
Law Office Of Kevin Justen
contact info
Creditor
Dan Pyell, Independent Administrator of the Estate of Clara Pyell
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Gary W. Maxwell, as Independent Executor of the Estate of Le La Lu Maxwell
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Marialyce Draves
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC
4515 N Santa Fe Ave. Dept. APS
Oklahoma City, OK 73118
Creditor
X-Caliber Funding LLC
Represented By
Kenneth J. Ottaviano
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
John E. Lucian
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Paige Barr Tinkham
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Jordan L. Williams
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Lawrence Raymond Thomas, III
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Jordan Williams
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Creditor
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Justin Cory Falgowski
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Creditor
Hartford Fire Insurance Company and its affiliated sureties
Represented By
Virginia T. Shea, Esq.
Mcelroy Deutsch Mulvaney & Carpenter LLC
contact info
Michael R. Morano
Mcelroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter
contact info
Gary D. Bressler
Mcelroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Select Rehabilitation LLC
2600 Compass Raod
Glenview, IL 60026
Creditor Committee
Martin Brothers Distributing Company Inc
406 Viking Road
Cedar Falls, IA 50613
Creditor Committee
Onestaff Medical LLC
10802 Farnam Dr
Omaha, NE 68154
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Martin S. Kedziora
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Anthony W. Clark
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Shari L. Heyen
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Nancy A. Peterman
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Danielle S Kemp
Greenberg Traurig, P.A.
contact info
Dennis A. Meloro
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
Danny Duerdoth
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
McKesson Corporation
6555 State Hwy 161
Irving, TX 75039
Creditor Committee
Lawrence Recruiting Specialists Inc
2655 Northwinds Pkwy
Atlanta, GA 30009
Creditor Committee
Darlena Moore, as Independent Administrator of Linda I Johnson
60 W Randolph St, 4th FL
Chicago, IL 60601
Represented By
Eva Golabek
contact info
Creditor Committee
Omnicare Inc
6825 W Galveston Street #3
Chandler, AZ 85226
Health Care Ombudsman
Suzanne Koenig
Represented By
Robert M. Schechter
Porzio, Bromberg & Newman P.C.
contact info
Cheryl Ann Santaniello
Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C.
contact info
Christopher P. Mazza
Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C.
contact info
Kimberly Pageau
Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
United States of America
U.S. Department of Justice P.O. Box 875 Ben Franklin Station
Washington, DC 20044
Represented By
John Zachary Balasko
Steptoe & Johnson PLLC
contact info
Jae Won Ha
Doj-Civ
contact info
Miniard Culpepper
Doj-Civ
contact info
Interested Party
Bank of Farmington
Represented By
Matthew P. Ward
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC
Represented By
David M. Fournier
Troutman Pepper Locke LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Column Financial, Inc.
Represented By
David E. Lemke
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Trip Nix
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Tyler Layne
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Richard Scott Cobb
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Steven J Levitt
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Hannah Berny, Esq.
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Joshua Brooks
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Community State Bank
Represented By
Matthew P. Ward
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Interested Party
GMF Petersen Note, LLC
Represented By
Stacy A Lutkus
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Kristin Going
Mcdermott, Will & Emery LLP
contact info
David R. Hurst
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Grandbridge Real Estate Capital LLC, and Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC
Represented By
Heather P. Lambert
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
contact info
David M. Fournier
Troutman Pepper Locke LLP
contact info
Matthew R. Brooks
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Interested Party
HNC/HK, Inc. and Jackson Heights Nursing Center, Inc.
Represented By
Steven P. Blonder
Much
contact info
Howard A. Cohen
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Interested Party
The Estate of Linda Harris
Represented By
Matthew P. Ward
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Heartland Bank and Trust Company
405 North Hershey Road
Bloomington, IL 61702
Represented By
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Bayard P.A.
contact info
Interested Party
Illinois Department of Healthcare and Family Services
Office of the Attorney General of Illino 115 South LaSalle Street
Chicago, IL 60603
Represented By
John Reding
Illinois Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Interested Party
Mark B. Petersen and certain non-debtor entities directly or indirectly owned by Mr. Petersen
Represented By
Paige Noelle Topper
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Petersen Acquisitions LLC
Represented By
David E. Gordon
Polsinelli, PC
contact info
Michael Vincent DiPietro
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Interested Party
National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By
Andrew Margulis
Ropers Majeski PC
contact info
John C. Phillips, Jr
Phillips, Mclaughlin & Hall, P.A.
contact info
David A. Bilson
Philips, Mclaughlin & Hall, P.A.
contact info
Interested Party
Omnicare, Inc. and Its Affiliated Entities
Represented By
Geoffrey S. Goodman
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
R. Grant Dick, IV
Cooch And Taylor, P.A.
contact info
Mediator
Christopher S. Sontchi
11 Tobin Court
Hockessin, DE 19707
Represented By
Christopher S. Sontchi
Sontchi, LLC
contact info
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Linda Richenderfer
Office Of The Us Trustee
contact info
Linda J. Casey
Office Of United States Trustee
contact info

Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
1562 1562 plan Plan Supplement Fri 05/09 6:18 PM
Plan Supplement for the Debtors' Combined Disclosure Statement and Chapter 11 Plan of Liquidation Filed by SC Healthcare Holding, LLC (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1561 1561 motion Compensation - Application (Attorney) Fri 05/09 2:12 PM
Application for Compensation (Eleventh) and Reimbursement of Expenses of Winston & Strawn LLP for the period February 1, 2025 to February 28, 2025 Filed by SC Healthcare Holding, LLC. Objections due by 5/23/2025. (Borovinskaya, Shella)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit
Thursday, May 08, 2025
1560 1560 notice Address Change - Notice Thu 05/08 3:36 PM
Notice of Address Change Filed by SC Healthcare Holding, LLC. (Thompson, Carol)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
1559 1559 misc Certificate of Publication Wed 05/07 12:41 PM
Certificate of Publication re: Publication Notice of (A) Combined Disclosure Statement and Chapter 11 Plan of Liquidation and (B) Deadline to File Administrative Expense Claims Related [+] Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 1413
1558 1558 misc Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Wed 05/07 11:27 AM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding Application for Compensation (Fourth) of Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC DBA Verita Global for the period December 1, 2024 to February 28, 2025 Related [+] Filed by SC Healthcare Holding, LLC. (Borovinskaya, Shella)
Related: [-] 1394
1557 1557 misc Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Wed 05/07 10:58 AM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding Eleventh Monthly Fee Application of SAK Management Services, LLC d/b/a SAK Healthcare, as Medical Operations Advisor for the Patient Care Ombudsman, for Allowance and Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period of February 1, 2025 Through February 28, 2025 Related [+] Filed by Suzanne Koenig. (Santaniello, Cheryl)
Related: [-] 1384
1556 1556 misc Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Wed 05/07 10:52 AM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding Eleventh Monthly Fee Application of Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C. as Counsel for the Patient Care Ombudsman, for Allowance and Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period of February 1, 2025 Through February 28, 2025 Related [+] Filed by Suzanne Koenig. (Santaniello, Cheryl)
Related: [-] 1383
Monday, May 05, 2025
1555 1555 crditcrd none Mon 05/05 6:40 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay (B)([LINK 24-10443 TMH] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A12160972, amount $ 199.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1554 1554 8 pgs motion Relief from Stay - Motion (FEE) Mon 05/05 6:39 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay (FEE) Motion of Pamela Dabney, Special Administrator of the Estate and Person of William Dabney, for Relief from the Automatic Stay Pursuant to Section 362(d) of the Bankruptcy Code . Fee Amount $199. Filed by Pamela Dabney, Special Administrator of the Estate and Person of William Dabney. Hearing scheduled for 5/28/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2025. (Joyce, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
Att: 2 Notice
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
1553 1553 crditcrd none Mon 05/05 6:37 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay (B)([LINK 24-10443 TMH] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A12160968, amount $ 199.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1552 1552 7 pgs motion Relief from Stay - Motion (FEE) Mon 05/05 6:37 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay (FEE) Motion of Randy Blodgett for Relief from the Automatic Stay Pursuant to Section 362(d) of the Bankruptcy Code . Fee Amount $199. Filed by Randy Blodgett. Hearing scheduled for 5/28/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2025. (Joyce, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
Att: 2 Notice
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
1551 1551 crditcrd none Mon 05/05 6:34 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay (B)([LINK 24-10443 TMH] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A12160962, amount $ 199.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1550 1550 7 pgs motion Relief from Stay - Motion (FEE) Mon 05/05 6:34 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay (FEE) Motion of Farrell Herron, Special Administrator of the Estate and Person of Norma Herron, for Relief from the Automatic Stay Pursuant to Section 362(d) of the Bankruptcy Code ( . Fee Amount $199. Filed by Farrell Herron, Special Administrator of the Estate and Person of Norma Herron. Hearing scheduled for 5/28/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2025. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order #2 Notice #3 Certificate of Service) (Joyce, Michael)
Related: [-]
1549 1549 crditcrd none Mon 05/05 6:31 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay (B)([LINK 24-10443 TMH] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A12160957, amount $ 199.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1548 1548 7 pgs motion Relief from Stay - Motion (FEE) Mon 05/05 6:31 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay (FEE) Motion of Donna Giesler, Special Administrator of the Estate and Person of Duane Ayres, for Relief from the Automatic Stay Pursuant to Section 362(d) of the Bankruptcy Code . Fee Amount $199. Filed by Donna Giesler, Special Administrator of the Estate and Person of Duane Ayres. Hearing scheduled for 5/28/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2025. (Joyce, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
Att: 2 Notice
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
1547 1547 crditcrd none Mon 05/05 6:28 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay (B)([LINK 24-10443 TMH] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A12160953, amount $ 199.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1546 1546 7 pgs motion Relief from Stay - Motion (FEE) Mon 05/05 6:28 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay (FEE) Motion of Stacy Colnaghi, Special Administrator of the Estate and Person of Christopher Colnaghi, for Relief from the Automatic Stay Pursuant to Section 362(d) of the Bankruptcy Code . Fee Amount $199. Filed by Stacy Colnaghi, Special Administrator of the Estate and Person of Christopher Colnaghi. Hearing scheduled for 5/28/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2025. (Joyce, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
Att: 2 Notice
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
1545 1545 crditcrd none Mon 05/05 6:26 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay (B)([LINK 24-10443 TMH] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A12160948, amount $ 199.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1544 1544 7 pgs motion Relief from Stay - Motion (FEE) Mon 05/05 6:26 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay (FEE) Motion of Julia Clemons, Special Administrator of the Estate and Person of Danny Love, for Relief from the Automatic Stay Pursuant to Section 362(d) of the Bankruptcy Code . Fee Amount $199. Filed by Julia Clemons, Special Administrator of the Estate and Person of Danny Love. Hearing scheduled for 5/28/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2025. (Joyce, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
Att: 2 Notice
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, May 02, 2025
1543 1543 misc Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Fri 05/02 4:04 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding Application for Compensation (Fifth) and Reimbursement of Expenses of Duane Morris LLP for the period January 1, 2025 to February 28, 2025 Related [+] Filed by SC Healthcare Holding, LLC. (Thompson, Carol)
Related: [-] 1405
1542 1542 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Fri 05/02 4:00 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 12/31/2024 Filed by SC Healthcare Holding, LLC. (Borovinskaya, Shella)
Related: [-]
1541 1541 notice Adjourned Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Fri 05/02 3:24 PM
HEARING CANCELLED- Notice of Adjourned Hearing. The following original hearing has been adjourned. Filed by SC Healthcare Holding, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/28/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Borovinskaya, Shella)
Related: [-]