Badilla Meza v. Nunez Reyes
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Julie S Sneed |
Referred: | Daniel C Irick |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00542 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 42:11601 International Child Abduction Remedies Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 20, 2024 5:24 PM EDT |
Defendant
Monica Enisse Nunez Reyes
|
|
Petitioner
Richard Pedro Badilla Meza
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order
Tue 04/23 4:49 PM
ENDORSED ORDER directing Petitioner to file a status report with the court regarding his efforts to locate a proper address for Respondent on or before April 30, 2024. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on April 23, 2024. (DAD) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
respoth
Response
Tue 04/16 9:44 AM
RESPONSE re27 Response Supplemental Response to Court Order for Status Report filed by Richard Pedro Badilla Meza. (Israel, Gary) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
respoth
Response
Mon 04/15 4:53 PM
RESPONSE re 26 Order for Status Report filed by Richard Pedro Badilla Meza. (Israel, Gary) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order
Fri 04/12 4:24 PM
ENDORSED ORDER. Petitioner failed to timely provide a status report to the court regarding his efforts to ascertain a correct address for service of process on Respondent. See (Dkt. 23.) On April 5, 2024, the United States Marshal's service informed the court that they learned of a potential address for Respondent at an apartment complex, but did not know the exact apartment number. (Dkt. 25 .) Accordingly, Petitioner is directed to provide a status report to the court, on or before April 19, 2024, regarding his efforts to ascertain a correct address for service of process upon Respondent. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on April 12, 2024. (DAD) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
service
US Marshal form 285
Mon 04/08 11:42 AM
US Marshal 285 form Process returned executed as to Monica Denisse Nunez Reyes. (ARL) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Hearing - Cancel
Thu 04/04 10:50 AM
NOTICE canceling Initial Status Conference scheduled for 4/10/2024. Hearing to be reset at a later date. (GNB) |
|
23 | 23
order
Order
Thu 04/04 10:44 AM
ENDORSED ORDER. The United States Marshal's service has advised the court that it was again unable to effect service at the address provided by Petitioner for Respondent. (Dkt. 20 .) Accordingly, Petitioner is directed to provide a status report to the court, on or before April 11, 2024, regarding his efforts to ascertain a correct address for service of process upon Respondent. The initial status conference set for April 10, 2024 is continued. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on April 4, 2024. (DAD) |
|
22 | 22
order
Order to Strike
Thu 04/04 10:39 AM
ENDORSED ORDER striking 21 Notice of Unavailability. The filing of such notices is prohibited by this court's Local Rules. See M.D. Fla. Loc. R. 3.08(c). Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on April 4, 2024. (DAD) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/03 5:55 PM
NOTICE by Richard Pedro Badilla Meza of Unavailability (Israel, Gary) |
|
20 | 20
service
US Marshal form 285
Wed 04/03 3:37 PM
US Marshal 285 form- Process returned unexecuted as to Monica Denisse Nunez Reyes. (AJS) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 04/02 5:04 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Status Conference set for 4/10/2024 at 02:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 6 C before Judge Julie S. Sneed.(GNB) |
|
18 | 18
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 04/02 4:46 PM
ORDER granting 17 Motion Issuance of New Order for Service. See order for details. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on April 2, 2024. (DAD) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/01 6:14 PM
First MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Issuance of New Order for Service by Richard Pedro Badilla Meza. (Israel, Gary) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Hearing - Cancel
Tue 03/26 12:41 PM
NOTICE canceling Initial Status Conference scheduled for 3/29/2024. Hearing to be reset at a later date. (GNB) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order to complete service forms
Tue 03/26 10:28 AM
ENDORSED ORDER. The address previously provided for service of process upon the Respondent was incorrect. Accordingly, Petitioner is directed to ascertain a correct address for service of process upon Respondent and, if warranted, file a motion with the court on or before April 1, 2024, requesting service by the Marshal at the corrected address. The initial status conference set for March 29, 2024 is continued and will be reset by separate notice. Signed by District Judge Julie S. Sneed on March 26, 2024. (DAD) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons returned unexecuted
Mon 03/25 4:08 PM
US Marshal 285 form- Process returned unexecuted as to Monica Denisse Nunez Reyes. (AJS) Modified on 3/25/2024 to edit docket text (AJS) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Amended Order
Fri 03/22 5:56 PM
AMENDED ORDER amending 11 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order re 9 Verified MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Richard Pedro Badilla Meza. Order amended to reflect an updated address for Respondent. Signed by District Judge Julie S. Sneed on March 22, 2024. (DAD) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 03/22 3:48 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Status Conference set for 3/29/2024 at 10:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 C before District Judge Julie S. Sneed (GNB) |
|
11 | 11
10
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order
Fri 03/22 3:31 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The United States Marshal shall immediately serve Respondent with a copy of the Verified Petition and all attachments (Dkt. 1 ), Petitioner's Motion and attachments (Dkt. 9 ), and this order. Upon service by the United States Marshal, Respondent is ORDERED to surrender each of her and the Child's passports, visas, or other travel documentation, if any, to the United States Marshal. This matter is set for an initial status hearing on March 29, 2024 at 10:30am in Courtroom 6C. See Order for further details. Signed by District Judge Julie S. Sneed on March 22, 2024. Signed by District Judge Julie S. Sneed on March 22, 2024. (DAD) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Fri 03/22 12:15 PM
Verified MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Richard Pedro Badilla Meza.(Israel, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit F | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Fri 03/22 12:10 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Gary Steven Israel on behalf of Richard Pedro Badilla Meza. Lead Counsel: Gary S. Israel. (Israel, Gary) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons issued
Fri 03/22 10:39 AM
**ENTERED IN ERROR** SUMMONS issued as to Monica Denisse Nunez Reyes. (JDR) Modified on 3/22/2024 to update docket and regenerate nef (MDC) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Proposed summons
Thu 03/21 2:26 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Richard Pedro Badilla Meza. (Israel, Gary) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Thu 03/21 2:15 PM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 03/21 7:35 AM
|
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/20 3:42 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to District Judge Julie S. Sneed and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:24-cv-542-JSS-DCI. (AJS) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/20 2:37 PM
COMPLAINT Verified Petition for Return of Minor Child Pursuant to International Treaty and Federal, against Monica Denisse Nunez Reyes against Richard Pedro Badilla Meza (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21891716) filed by Richard Pedro Badilla Meza.(Israel, Gary) (Chambers notified)- Modified on 3/20/2024 (AJS) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 9 State Court Other Documents Verified Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order |