Sutherby v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | John Antoon II |
Referred: | Daniel C Irick |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00545 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Volusia County Circuit Court, 24-10667-CICI |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 20, 2024 5:24 PM EDT |
Defendant
Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carol Lois Sutherby
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/24 2:33 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. (Potter, Maggie) Modified text on 4/25/2024 (ABM) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/17 2:32 PM
ORDER that Defendant shall file a Disclosure Statement no later than April 24, 2024. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 4/17/2024. (EK) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/09 10:27 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re12 Order by Carol Lois Sutherby. (Castillo, Ramon) |
|
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/09 9:59 AM
ORDER re 6 and 10 Disclosure Statements filed by Plaintiff. No later than April 16, 2024, Plaintiff shall file a Disclosure Statement that identifies the State of which she is a citizen. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 4/9/2024. (EK) |
|
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/09 9:56 AM
ORDER that Defendant shall file its Disclosure Statement no later than April 16, 2024. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 4/9/2024. (EK) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/08 12:37 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re8 Order by Carol Lois Sutherby. (Castillo, Ramon) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/04 4:15 PM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/01 2:13 PM
ORDER that no later than April 8, 2024, Plaintiff shall file an amended disclosure statement that identifies her citizenship. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 4/1/2024. (EK) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/29 7:58 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc..(Potter, Maggie) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/29 3:35 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Carol Lois Sutherby. (Castillo, Ramon) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Fri 03/29 3:33 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Carol Lois Sutherby. Related case(s): Yes (Castillo, Ramon) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Interested Persons Order
Tue 03/26 2:42 PM
INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Counsel have 7 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/26/2024. (KLD) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Thu 03/21 8:09 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Ramon Castillo of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/21 8:08 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:24-cv-545-JA-DCI. (ARL) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/20 5:00 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Volusia County Circuit Court, case number 2024-10667-CICI filed in State Court on 2/23/2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21893161 filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc..(Potter, Maggie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 State Court COMPLAINT, | ||
Att: 5 State Court Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 State Court Other Documents, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet |