New Jersey District Court
Judge:Susan D Wigenton
Referred: Andre M Espinosa
Case #: 2:24-cv-04038
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2024
Terminated:Jan 29, 2025
Last checked: Monday Sep 16, 2024 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
ALLEN GROSNICK
Defendant
GROSNICK STRUCTURED FUNDING
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Defendant
XYZ CORPORATION 1-10
Plaintiff
DANIEL HAKIMI
Represented By
RAPHAEL MARK ROSENBLATT
Rosenblatt Law PC
contact info
Plaintiff
OB-GYN AND INFERTILITY SERVICES OF NORTHERN NEW JERSEY, LLC
Represented By
RAPHAEL MARK ROSENBLATT
Rosenblatt Law PC
contact info

GPO Jan 29 2025
ORDER granting 14 Motion for Default Judgment ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 1/29/2025. (ld)

Docket last updated: 77 minutes ago
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Wed 01/29 5:13 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Default Judgment ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 1/29/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/24 8:49 AM
Set Deadlines as to14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Allen Grosnick and Grosnick Structured Funding . Motion set for 2/18/2025 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (pm, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
14 14 motion Default Judgment Thu 01/23 5:55 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Allen Grosnick and Grosnick Structured Funding by OB-GYN AND INFERTILITY SERVICES OF NORTHERN NEW JERSEY, LLC, DANIEL HAKIMI. Responses due by 2/24/2025.(ROSENBLATT, RAPHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Raphael M. Rosenblatt, Esq. in Support of Motion for Default Judgment,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Rosenblatt Declaration (Complaint),
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Rosenblatt Declaration (Email),
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Rosenblatt Declaration (Email),
Att: 5 Exhibit D to Rosenblatt Declaration (Aff. of Non-Military Service),
Att: 6 Declaration of Ann Hakimi in Support,
Att: 7 Exhibit E (Boucher Contract),
Att: 8 Exhibit F (Cook-Westerlund Contract),
Att: 9 Exhibit G (Texiera Contract),
Att: 10 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 11 Certificate of Service
Friday, January 10, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Call for Dismissal Fri 01/10 12:29 PM
Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 41.1(a). Motion set for 1/24/2025 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cds)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
12 12 order Text Order Thu 09/19 9:59 AM
TEXT ORDER Withdrawing8 Notice of Call for dismissal. So Ordered by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 9/19/2024. (cds)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
11 11 order Clerks Entry of Default Wed 09/18 4:00 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ALLEN GROSNICK, GROSNICK STRUCTURED FUNDING for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (and)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Wed 09/18 12:56 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Request for Entry of Default filed by RAPHAEL ROSENBLATT on 9/17/2024 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. Next time please use the Event Request for Clerk's Entry of Default for a filing of that nature. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (and)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
10 10 misc Declaration Tue 09/17 4:59 PM
DECLARATION of Raphael M. Rosenblatt, Esq. re9 MOTION for Entry of Default and in Response to Call for Dismissal by Court Regarding Proof of Service by DANIEL HAKIMI, OB-GYN AND INFERTILITY SERVICES OF NORTHERN NEW JERSEY, LLC. (ROSENBLATT, RAPHAEL)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs motion Entry of Default Tue 09/17 3:58 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default and in Response to Call for Dismissal by Court by DANIEL HAKIMI, OB-GYN AND INFERTILITY SERVICES OF NORTHERN NEW JERSEY, LLC.(ROSENBLATT, RAPHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Raphael M. Rosenblatt, Esq. in Response to Call for Dismissal and in Support of Request for Entry of Default as Against Defendants Allen Grosnick and Grosnick Structured Funding
Friday, September 06, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Call for Dismissal Fri 09/06 10:17 AM
Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 41.1(a). Motion set for 9/20/2024 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cds)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
7 7 service Certificate of Service Wed 06/05 3:47 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DANIEL HAKIMI, OB-GYN AND INFERTILITY SERVICES OF NORTHERN NEW JERSEY, LLC re6 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,(ROSENBLATT, RAPHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Cover Letter),
Att: 2 Exhibit B (UPS Proof of Service),
Att: 3 Exhibit C (USPS Delivery Status),
Att: 4 Exhibit D (USPS Receipt)
Friday, May 24, 2024
6 6 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/24 1:33 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion authorizing service of process on defendants Allen Grosnick and Grosnick Structured Funding no later than 7/18/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/24/2024. (sm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
5 5 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/16 10:56 AM
MOTION Permit Alternate Service on Defendants by DANIEL HAKIMI, OB-GYN AND INFERTILITY SERVICES OF NORTHERN NEW JERSEY, LLC.(ROSENBLATT, RAPHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Letter Brief in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration of Raphael M. Rosenblatt, Esq. in Support of Motion,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/16 4:09 PM
Set Deadlines as to5 MOTION Permit Alternate Service on Defendants . Motion set for 5/20/2024 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
4 4 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 03/27 5:57 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by DANIEL HAKIMI, OB-GYN AND INFERTILITY SERVICES OF NORTHERN NEW JERSEY, LLC. (ROSENBLATT, RAPHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 03/21 11:51 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALLEN GROSNICK, GROSNICK STRUCTURED FUNDING. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 03/21 11:50 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (sm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 03/20 5:04 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by DANIEL HAKIMI, OB-GYN AND INFERTILITY SERVICES OF NORTHERN NEW JERSEY, LLC. (ROSENBLATT, RAPHAEL)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 03/20 4:59 PM
COMPLAINT against ALLEN GROSNICK, GROSNICK STRUCTURED FUNDING, JOHN DOES 1-10, XYZ CORPORATION 1-10 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15199019) with JURY DEMAND, filed by OB-GYN AND INFERTILITY SERVICES OF NORTHERN NEW JERSEY, LLC, DANIEL HAKIMI.(ROSENBLATT, RAPHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/21 11:02 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (ak, )
Related: [-]