Nussbaum v. Commissioner of Social Security
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | J Philip Calabrese |
Referred: | James E Grimes Jr |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00525 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy
Mon 04/01 9:30 AM
Magistrate Consent Package issued. (M,MT) |
|
5 | 5
order
Magistrate Judges Initial Order
Mon 04/01 9:29 AM
Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 04/01/24. (M,MT) |
|
order
Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis
Mon 04/01 9:26 AM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 04/01/24.(M,MT) |
||
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Administrative Track DCM Initial Order
Wed 03/20 4:10 PM
Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Sara Lioi. (P,G) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Status Report (atty event)
Wed 03/20 3:36 PM
Status Report filed by Denise M. Nussbaum. (Wicklund, Edward) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/20 3:35 PM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Denise M. Nussbaum. (Wicklund, Edward) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/20 3:34 PM
Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Denise M. Nussbaum. (Wicklund, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeal Council Action, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Wed 03/20 4:04 PM
Judge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (P,G) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Wed 03/20 4:06 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr.. (P,G) |
||
oth_evt
Notice of Social Security Complaint
Wed 03/20 4:08 PM
Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (P,G) |
||
order
Automatic Reference of Administrative Action
Wed 03/20 4:16 PM
Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 3/20/2024. (P,G) |