Jennings v. Berkshire Medical Center, Inc.
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Mark G Mastroianni |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-30041 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Copy Mailed
Thu 04/18 1:03 PM
Copy re 8 Order Dismissing Case, mailed to Plaintiff on 4/18/2024. (Figueroa, Tamara) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 04/18 1:01 PM
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ORDER entered DISMISSING CASE. On 3/25/2024, the court entered a Procedural Order4 directing Plaintiff to either (1) pay the filing fee or (2) file an application to proceed in forma pauperis within 21 days of the date of the order. The court's order stated that failure to comply might result in dismissal of the action. As it has now been more than 21 days since the date of the Procedural Order and Plaintiff has not paid the filing fee or filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis , this case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice and may now be closed. (Figueroa, Tamara) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter/request - non-motion
Wed 03/27 8:37 AM
Letter/request (non-motion) from Plaintiff. (Figueroa, Tamara) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter/request - non-motion
Mon 03/25 3:29 PM
Letter/request (non-motion) from Plaintiff. (Figueroa, Tamara) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Copy Mailed
Mon 03/25 12:46 PM
Copy mailed to:ECF4 -AO 240 Form - Edward Vincent Jennings 6376 Berkshire County House of Correction 467 Cheshire Road Pod B #210 Pittsfield MA 01201 and copy of ECF No. 4 only to Treasurers Office Berkshire County House of Correction 467 Cheshire Road Pittsfield MA 01201 on 3 25-2024 (Castilla, Francis) |
|
4 | 4
order
PSSA Order 6 - Prisoner no fee or IFP
Mon 03/25 9:20 AM
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ORDER entered. Procedural Order regarding resolution of filling fee. Plaintiff must respond within 21 days. (PSSA, 5) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
PSSA Order 6 - Prisoner no fee or IFP
Fri 03/22 8:02 AM
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ORDER entered. Procedural Order regarding resolution of filling fee. Plaintiff must respond within 21 days.(PSSA, 5) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Thu 03/21 10:17 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Phillips, Sophie) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/20 5:50 PM
COMPLAINT against Berkshire Medical Center, Inc., filed by Edward Vincent Jennings, Jr.(Castilla, Francis) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |