Kersey v. Chewy Inc
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Allison D Burroughs |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10709 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 20, 2024 6:40 PM EDT |
Defendant
Chewy Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
George Kersey
684 Newton Street
Chestnut Hill, MA 02467 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 04/16 12:29 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chewy Inc, filed by George Kersey.(McManus, Caetlin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Cover Letter | ||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Copy Mailed
Fri 04/05 2:42 PM
Copy order 5mailed to George Kersey 684 Newton Street Chestnut Hill, MA 02467 on 4-5-24. (Castilla, Francis) |
|
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/05 12:33 PM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered granting4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If Kersey wishes to proceed with this action, he must, within thirty-five (35) days, file an amended complaint in which he provides images of his trademark and of the defendant's alleged infringing use of that trademark. (PSSA, 3) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/28 4:27 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by George Kersey.(McManus, Caetlin) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Jury Demand
Thu 03/28 4:25 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by George Kersey. (McManus, Caetlin) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Thu 03/21 10:36 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Phillips, Sophie) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
2
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/20 5:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Chewy Inc, filed by George Kersey.(Castilla, Francis) |