Myrtle Homosassa LLC
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jil Mazer-Marino |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-41187 |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Myrtle Homosassa LLC
957 Lorraine Dr
Franklin Square, NY 11010-1812 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Employ (Application)
Wed 05/01 4:11 PM
Application to Employ Titan Tax & Accounting Services Inc. as Accountants for the Debtor Filed by H Bruce Bronson on behalf of Myrtle Homosassa LLC. Order to be presented for signature on 5/28/2024. (Bronson, H) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Christopher Gonzalez | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 04/29 11:14 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Stephen McNally on behalf of TD Bank, NA (McNally, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Affidavit/Certificate of Service
Tue 04/23 12:28 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Ryan Reinert on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
order
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/22 5:11 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice . Signed on 4/22/2024. (mem) |
|
trustee
Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors
Mon 04/22 2:54 PM
Trustee's Notice of Continued Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) Meeting Adjourned to 4/29/2024 at 01:00 PM at Teleconference - Brooklyn. (Lateef, Reema) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Affidavit/Certificate of Service
Mon 04/08 10:51 AM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Larry I Glick on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee (Glick, Larry) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Amended Notice of Motion/Presentment (use to correct date, time or location of a presentment / heari
Mon 04/08 9:48 AM
Amended Notice of Motion/Presentment Filed by Larry I Glick on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee Hearing scheduled for 5/15/2024 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. (Glick, Larry) |
|
Saturday, April 06, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order
Sun 04/07 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 04/06/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Relief from Stay (Fee Due)
Fri 04/05 4:36 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay Fee Amount $199. Filed by Larry I Glick on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/15/2024 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. (Glick, Larry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - Part 3 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 - Part 4 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 1 - Part 5 | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 04/05 1:09 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Larry I Glick on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee (Glick, Larry) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/05 1:01 PM
Motion for Ryan C. Reinert to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee. Fee Amount $200. Filed by Larry I Glick on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee. (Glick, Larry) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice | ||
crditcrd
Automatic docket of credit card/debit card
Fri 04/05 1:05 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice([LINK:1 24-41187 jmm] ) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22521883. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
crditcrd
Automatic docket of credit card/debit card
Fri 04/05 4:37 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK:1 24-41187 jmm] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22523299. Fee amount 199.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges
Thu 04/04 11:53 AM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference. Signed on 4/4/2024 Status hearing to be held on 5/8/2024 at 11:45 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. (tml) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Reset of Section 341 Meeting of Creditors
Fri 03/29 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Reset of Section 341 Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 03/28/2024. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Affidavit
Thu 03/28 4:04 PM
Affidavit Re: Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 Filed by H Bruce Bronson on behalf of Myrtle Homosassa LLC (Bronson, H) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals (Form 207)
Tue 03/26 10:49 AM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals (Form 207) Filed by H Bruce Bronson on behalf of Myrtle Homosassa LLC (Bronson, H) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Statement
Mon 03/25 6:07 PM
Statement /Corporate Resolution Filed by H Bruce Bronson on behalf of Myrtle Homosassa LLC (Bronson, H) |
|
7 | 7
trustee
Notice of Rescheduled Telephonic 341 Meeting with Instructions
Mon 03/25 9:03 AM
Notice of Rescheduled Telephonic 341 Meeting with Instructions. Meeting scheduled for April 26, 2024, at 11:00 a.m. Filed by Office of the United States Trustee . (Lateef, Reema) |
|
Sunday, March 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Mon 03/25 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 03/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, March 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing
Sun 03/24 12:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 03/23/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Fri 03/22 3:08 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/26/2024 at 11:00 AM at Teleconference - Brooklyn. (drk) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
court
Case Related to a Chapter 11
Thu 03/21 7:39 AM
The above case is related to Case Number(s) 23-40481 jmm: The Burger Building 23-40482 jmm: LLC,57-36 Myrtle Ave LLC 23-43253 jmm: Paul Amato (nwh) |
||
crditcrd
Automatic docket of credit card/debit card
Thu 03/21 10:56 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1 24-41187 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22477179. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
court
Deficient Filing Chapter 11
Thu 03/21 10:03 AM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Filing fee for commencing a bankruptcy case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1930a due by 3/20/2024.Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 3/20/2024. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 3/20/2024. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 3/20/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 4/3/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 4/3/2024. (nwh) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 2017-1
Wed 03/20 4:35 PM
Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 2017-1 Filed by H Bruce Bronson on behalf of Myrtle Homosassa LLC (Bronson, H) |
|
1 | 1
23
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 03/20 4:34 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by H Bruce Bronson on behalf of Myrtle Homosassa LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/18/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 07/18/2024. (Bronson, H) |
|
utility
Judge Reassignment Utility
Wed 03/20 5:35 PM
Judge Elizabeth S. Stong removed from the case due to Related Case, Judge Reassigned. Judge Jil Mazer-Marino added to the case. (mem) |