Gachupin et al v. Albuquerque Public Schools et al
New Mexico District Court | |
Judge: | Joel M Carson, III |
Referred: | Steven C Yarbrough |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00276 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Second Judicial District Court, D-202-CV-24-01638 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 20, 2024 6:25 PM MDT |
Defendant
Albuquerque Public Schools
|
|
Defendant
Manuel Alzaga
|
|
Defendant
Loviata Mitchell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arnold Gachupin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judy Gachupin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 8 and 9. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg) | ||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
11 | 11 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution: Michelle A Hernandez substituted for Kevin D. Pierce (Hernandez, Michelle) | |
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United Statese Circuit Judge Joel M. Carson, III as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Albuquerque Public Schools, Manuel Alzaga voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Muirhead, Megan) | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 4/18/2024 unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cda) | ||
CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Loviata Mitchell voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Rawls-De Santiago, Roxie) | ||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Loviata Mitchell. (Rawls-De Santiago, Roxie) | |
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 2 pgs INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 5/3/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2024 at 03:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 4/18/2024. (kfo) | |
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheet by Loviata Mitchell (Rawls-De Santiago, Roxie) | |
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Albuquerque Public Schools, Manuel Alzaga. (Pierce, Kevin) | |
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Loviata Mitchell from Second District Court of Bernalillo County, case number D-202-CV-2024-01638. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Loviata Mitchell.(Rawls-De Santiago, Roxie) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9274486 re1 Notice of Removal, (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Rawls-De Santiago, Roxie) | ||
United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (eh) | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh) |