AGSM, LLC
Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Gregory L Taddonio |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-20667 |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Debtor
AGSM, LLC
108 Huckleberry Ln
Greensburg, PA 15601-6486 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Robert H. Slone, Trustee
223 South Maple Avenue
Greensburg, PA 15601 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
1000 Liberty Avenue Suite 1316
Pittsburgh, PA 15222 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 6:20 AM EDT |
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition Chapter 7
Wed 03/20 4:07 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $338 Filed by AGSM, LLC Statement of Intentions due by 04/19/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 09/16/2024. Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due 04/3/2024. (Cooney, Ryan) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 03/20 4:08 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 7([LINK 24-20667 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16674250, amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29
Wed 03/20 4:13 PM
Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix Filed by Debtor AGSM, LLC (Cooney, Ryan) |