Delaware District Court
Judge:Richard G Andrews
Case #: 1:24-cv-00356
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause09:0010 Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2024
Terminated:Feb 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Sep 15, 2024 5:19 AM EDT
Amicus
Retail Litigation Center, Inc.
Represented By
Todd C Schiltz
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Petitioner
Walgreen Co.
Represented By
Reed Brodsky
contact info
David Ellis Moore
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Kasey J. Curtis
contact info
Tyler E. Cragg
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Callan R. Jackson
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Kevin R. Shannon
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Rahim Moloo
contact info
Gabriel Herrmann
contact info
Howard S. Hogan
contact info
Anne Champion
contact info
Charles Hyun
contact info
Respondent
PWNHealth, LLC
Represented By
Courtney Leigh Kurz
Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Stephanie Spies
contact info
Kevin Michael Coen
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Krysta Kauble Pachman
contact info
Shawn J. Rabin
contact info
William M. Lafferty
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Katherine M. Peaslee
contact info

GPO Feb 10 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/10/2025. (aas)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, February 27, 2025
72 72 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 02/27 9:11 AM
SO ORDERED Granting71 Stipulation of Dismissal (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/27/2025. (nms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
71 71 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 02/26 8:50 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Walgreen Co.. (Jackson, Callan)
Related: [-]