Valenzuela Hernandez et al v. Clear Blue Insurance Company
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | John L Badalamenti |
Referred: | Nicholas P Mizell |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00255 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 12:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
Clear Blue Insurance Company
200 East Las Olas Blvd. #1820
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aileen Valenzuela Ariciago
|
|
Plaintiff
Antonio Valenzuela Hernandez
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Tue 04/16 10:30 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 10 Unopposed Motion for Appraisal and to Abate All Proceedings Pending Completion of Appraisal. The appraisers must agree to an umpire by May 1, 2024, and the parties shall contemporaneously file a joint notice identifying the members of the appraisal panel. If the appraisers are unable to agree, then the parties shall file a motion by May 8, 2024, requesting a court-appointed umpire. The appraisal process must be completed within six months from the date the umpire is selected. Within one week after the appraisal concludes, the parties must promptly file a joint notice informing the Court of the outcome of the appraisal. This action is STAYED pending completion of the appraisal process. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to add a STAY FLAG to this case and to STAY this case pending further order of this Court. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 4/16/2024. (RHG) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Stay
Fri 04/12 12:11 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Appraisal and to Abate all Proceeding Pending Completion of Appraisal by Clear Blue Insurance Company.(Ketant, Samantha) Modified on 4/12/2024 to edit text (ELM) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/11 4:01 PM
NOTICE by Clear Blue Insurance Company re6 Case Management Scheduling Order Joint Certification of Familiarity and Abidance with Local Rules and Orders Entered to Date (Ketant, Samantha) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to amended complaint
Thu 03/28 2:19 PM
Defendant, Clear Blue Insurance Company's ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to 4 Amended Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Clear Blue Insurance Company.(Barzyk, Michael) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Protective Order
Mon 03/25 10:19 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 3/25/2024.(WRW) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
6 | 6
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Mon 03/25 10:18 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: (HURRICANE IAN) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 3/25/2024. (WRW) |
|
5 | 5
order
Civil Action Order
Mon 03/25 10:16 AM
CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/25/2024. (WRW) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 03/21 2:23 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Originally filed in State Court on 03/15/2024)(JDR) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Thu 03/21 8:48 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Irina Tarnovsky of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RLK) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/21 8:28 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:24-cv-255-JLB-NPM. (RLK) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/20 5:49 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL Defendant, Clear Blue Insurance Company's Notice of Removal from Desoto County, case number 2024CA000060 filed in State Court on 01/29/2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21893317 filed by Clear Blue Insurance Company.(Barzyk, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit I |