Perryman et al v. Progressive Select Insurance Company et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Wendy W Berger |
Referred: | Monte C Richardson |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00283 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 12:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
Progressive Select Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Gayle Perryman
|
|
Plaintiff
Rick Barron Perryman
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 04/26 3:20 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Worden, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of appearance
Wed 04/17 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg A. Silverstein on behalf of Donna Gayle Perryman, Rick Barron Perryman (Silverstein, Gregg) |
|
17 | 17
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Wed 04/17 12:09 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2024 Joinder of Parties due by 7/1/2024 Discovery due by 1/31/2025 Dispositive motions due by 3/4/2025 Pretrial statement due by 7/7/2025 All other motions due by 6/4/2025 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/3/2024 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/2/2025 Trial Status Conference set for 7/8/2025 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 A before Judge Wendy W. Berger; Jury Trial set for the trial term commencing on 8/4/2025 at 08:30 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 A before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Conduct mediation hearing by 2/14/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/17/2024. (CKS) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Remand to State Court
Tue 04/16 5:34 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Donna Gayle Perryman, Rick Barron Perryman.(Silverstein, Gregg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Thu 04/11 12:08 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jennifer Claire Worden on behalf of Progressive Select Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Jennifer C. Worden. (Worden, Jennifer) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Thu 04/11 10:22 AM
SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL Brett C. Powell of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Thu 04/11 10:18 AM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Bifurcate
Wed 04/10 5:45 PM
Amended MOTION to Bifurcate by Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Worden, Jennifer) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss
Wed 04/10 5:41 PM
Amended MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, III and IV of Plaintiff's Complaint by Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Worden, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Case Management Report
Tue 04/02 6:54 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Worden, Jennifer) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/02 5:22 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Progressive Select Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Corporation, Corporate Parent Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc. for Progressive Select Insurance Company.. (Worden, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Wed 03/27 12:57 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CKS) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order
Wed 03/27 12:56 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/27/2024. (CKS) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Fri 03/22 3:37 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Progressive Select Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Worden, Jennifer) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/22 9:33 AM
COMPLAINT against Progressive Select Insurance Company, Blake Austin Blackburn, Mauri Swanson with Jury Demand filed by Progressive Select Insurance Company.(Worden, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet filed in State Court with Complaint | ||
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Thu 03/21 12:04 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Brett C. Powell of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/21 12:02 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:24-cv-283-WWB-MCR. (AJS) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/20 6:49 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial Circuit in and for Clay County, Florida, case number 2024-CA-000110 filed in State Court on March 22, 2023. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21893415 filed by Progressive Select Insurance Company.(Worden, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 4 State Court COMPLAINT, | ||
Att: 5 State Court Docket Sheet for Broward County, | ||
Att: 6 State Court Docket Sheet for Clay County, | ||
Att: 7 State Court Other Documents, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet |