Juravin v. Kennedy
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory A Presnell |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00128 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:0158 Bankruptcy Appeal from Judgment/Order |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 12:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dennis Kennedy
|
Represented By
|
In Re
Don Karl Juravin
15118 Pendio Drive
Montverde, FL 34756 |
|
Interested Party
Scott Bomkamp
US Trustee's office 400 W Washington St, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801 |
|
Interested Party
Lauren M. Reynolds
329 North Park Avenue, 2nd Floor
Winter Park, FL 32789 |
|
Interested Party
Charles R. Sterbach
US Trustee's Office Assistant U.S. Trustee 400 W. Washington St. Ste 1100
Orlando, FL 32801 |
|
Plaintiff
Don Karl Juravin
15118 Pendio Drive
Montverde, FL 34756 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
Transmission of Bankruptcy appeal record
Thu 04/25 8:31 AM
BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: 1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal filed by Don Karl Juravin.(Miguenes, Guillermo) |
|
Att: 1 2 Notice of Appeal, | ||
Att: 2 3 Order Granting Motion to Declare Debtor Vextatious Litigant and for Martin-Trigona Injunction, | ||
Att: 3 4 Public Docket Sheet | ||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
order
Interested Persons Order
Wed 04/24 12:46 PM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER for Appellant Don Karl Juravin. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/8/2024. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/24/2024. (AKC) |
|
13 | 13
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 04/24 10:13 AM
ORDER denying 11 Appellant Don Karl Juravin's Motion to Comply with 28 U.S.C. § 1292(a)(1) and setting briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/24/2024. (LDM) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 04/19 4:30 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to transfer to 11th Circuit Court of Appeals pursuant to 28 USC 1292(a)(1) filed by Dennis Kennedy. |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/15 8:36 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Gregory A. Presnell. New case number: 5:24-cv-128-GAP. Judge Marcia Morales Howard no longer assigned to the case. (LMF) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/15 8:45 AM
MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to transfer to 11th Circuit Court of Appeals pursuant to 28 USC 1292(a)(1) by Don Karl Juravin. (filed e-portal) (RLK) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 04/12 11:05 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to the Honorable Gregory A. Presnell with his consent. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/12/2024. (JW) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/01 5:01 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by The Bella Collina Property Owner's Association, Inc.. (Timko, James) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Mon 04/01 4:52 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by The Bella Collina Property Owner's Association, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Timko, James) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of appearance
Mon 04/01 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Timko on behalf of The Bella Collina Property Owner's Association, Inc. (Timko, James) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Fri 03/29 3:46 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Dennis Kennedy. Related case(s): Yes |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/29 3:45 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Dennis Kennedy. |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of appearance
Fri 03/29 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Marie Reynolds on behalf of Dennis Kennedy |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
appeal
Notice of docketing bankruptcy appeal re Rule 8018
Wed 03/20 4:17 PM
NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 03/18/2024. (HAI) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
appeal
Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal
Wed 03/20 11:57 AM
BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Don Karl Juravin. Bankruptcy Court case number 6:18-bk-6821-LVV. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 2/27/2024.(LMF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Appeal |