Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Victoria M Calvert
Case #: 1:24-cv-01126
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 et seq. Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2024
Terminated:Mar 21, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2024 5:19 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Rosewood Plantation Condominium Association, Inc.
Represented By
Joanna Eljazzar
Lazega & Johanson, LLC
contact info
Casey Torres
Lazega & Johanson, LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Timothy A. Bruno
3 Pendleton Place
Atlanta, GA 30342
Counter Defendant
Denise H. Dempsey
3 Pendleton Place
Atlanta, GA 30342
Defendant
Rosewood Plantation Condominium Association, Inc.
Represented By
Lee Whatling
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Arash A. Sabzevari
Freeman Mathis & Gary Llp - Atlanta, Ga
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy A. Bruno
3 Pendleton Place
Atlanta, GA 30342
Plaintiff
Denise H. Dempsey
3 Pendleton Place
Atlanta, GA 30342


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, March 22, 2024
9 9 utility Remark Fri 03/22 11:28 AM
Case electronically remanded to Superior Court of Fulton County re7 Order Certified copy of remand order,8 Letter, sent electronically. Filing status: Submitted. (dnb)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Letter Fri 03/22 11:11 AM
Remand Letter (dnb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/25 9:04 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Timothy A. Bruno, Denise H. Dempsey re7 Order. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
7 7 5 pgs order Order Fri 03/22 10:44 AM
ORDER. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to REMAND this matter to the Superior Court of Fulton County. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 3/21/2024. (dnb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 03/22 10:53 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
6 6 motion Stay Wed 03/20 3:01 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery and Memorandum of Law in Support by Rosewood Plantation Condominium Association, Inc..(Sabzevari, Arash)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
5 5 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Wed 03/20 3:00 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings with Brief In Support by Rosewood Plantation Condominium Association, Inc..(Sabzevari, Arash)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
4 4 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/20 2:58 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rosewood Plantation Condominium Association, Inc.. (Sabzevari, Arash)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Leave of Absence Wed 03/20 2:23 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 3/25/24-3/27/24,4/25/24-4/29/24,7/3/24-7/8/24,7/15/24-7/22/24,9/5/24-9/9/24,9/19/24-9/23/24,10/18/24-10/21/24,10/24/24-10/28/24, by Arash A. Sabzevari. (Sabzevari, Arash)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 03/20 2:44 PM
Submission of1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with PETITION for Emergency Injunctive Relief and COMPLAINT to District Judge Victoria M. Calvert. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Counterclaim Wed 03/20 11:36 AM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Timothy A. Bruno, Denise H. Dempsey with Jury Demand by Rosewood Plantation Condominium Association, Inc. (Discovery ends on 8/12/2024.) (pdt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 03/20 11:33 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with PETITION for Emergency Injunctive Relief and COMPLAINT filed by Rosewood Plantation Condominium Association, Inc. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13292241) (pdt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet