Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Damon R Leichty
Referred: Michael G Gotsch, Sr
Case #: 3:24-cv-00252
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2024
Terminated:Jul 24, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 16, 2024 4:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Thor Motor Coach Inc
a Foreign Profit Corporation C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM, S/A 334 North Senate Ave
INDIANAPOLIS, IN 46204
Represented By
Erin V Bolden
Thor Industries Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Valerie Kay Lee
individual c/o Lemon Law Group Partners PLC 48 Nort Emerson Ave, Ste 400
Greenwood, IN 46143
Represented By
Sara Mae Douglass
Lemon Law Group Partners Plc - Gr/in
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
8 8 order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Terminate Civil Case Wed 07/24 9:37 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to7 STIPULATION to Dismiss. Parties to bear their own fees and costs. Text-only order by Judge Damon R Leichty on 7/24/24. (dnj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
7 7 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Tue 07/23 7:42 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss by Defendant Thor Motor Coach Inc. (Bolden, Erin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
6 6 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 05/08 2:52 PM
ORDER: Having received the5 Notice of Settlement, the court ORDERS Dismissal Papers by 8/6/2024. Text-only order by Judge Damon R Leichty on 5/8/24. (dnj)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 05/06 6:28 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Thor Motor Coach Inc (Bolden, Erin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/27 9:15 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thor Motor Coach Inc identifying Corporate Parent THOR Industries Inc for Thor Motor Coach Inc.. (Bolden, Erin)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/27 9:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Erin V Bolden on behalf of Thor Motor Coach Inc (Bolden, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 03/21 9:54 AM
Summons Issued as to Thor Motor Coach Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nae)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 03/21 9:42 AM
**NEW CASE** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (nae)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/20 7:38 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Valerie Lee against Thor Motor Coach Inc( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5523545.), filed by Valerie Kay Lee.(Douglass, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Thor proposed summons