Maryland District Court
Judge:Theodore D Chuang
Case #: 8:24-cv-00807
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:2201 Injunction
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2024
Terminated:Jul 16, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 15, 2024 5:04 AM EDT
Defendant
Circuit Court for Montgomery County
Represented By
Kathryn Elizabeth Hummel
Office Of The Attorney General Of Maryland
contact info
Defendant
State of Maryland
Represented By
Kathryn Elizabeth Hummel
Office Of The Attorney General Of Maryland
contact info
Plaintiff
Crisstofer Michael French, Sr
500 Belmont Bay Drive Unit 312
Woodbridge, VA 22191

GPO Jul 17 2024
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 19 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; dismissing the Complaint and closing the case. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/16/2024. (c/m 7/17/2024)(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
27 27 6 pgs order Memorandum and Order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 07/17 8:20 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting19 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; dismissing the Complaint and closing the case. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/16/2024. (c/m 7/17/2024)(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
26 26 service Affidavit of Service Wed 06/12 1:54 PM
Proof of Delivery to Montgomery County Circuit Court filed by Crisstofer Michael French, Sr.(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
25 25 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 06/06 9:01 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Circuit Court for Montgomery County, State of Maryland.(Hummel, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
24 24 respm Response to Motion Fri 05/31 8:55 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Crisstofer Michael French, Sr.(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support
23 23 misc Affidavit Fri 05/31 8:54 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Verified Facts and Truth by Crisstofer Michael French, Sr (EDSS)(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order Fri 05/24 12:36 PM
ORDER: the Court finds that Pre-Motion Conference is not necessary and that it will consider an address all matters with the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 5/24/2024. (c/m to P on 5/24/2024 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
21 21 misc Rule 12/56 Wed 05/22 8:45 AM
Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Crisstofer Michael French, Sr (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
20 20 corresp Miscellaneous Tue 05/21 10:38 AM
Correspondence re: Plaintiff's Miscellaneous Filings (Hummel, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Dismiss Tue 05/21 10:36 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Circuit Court for Montgomery County, State of Maryland(Hummel, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
18 18 corresp Miscellaneous Wed 05/15 10:53 AM
Correspondence from Crisstofer Michael French Sr. re: Montgomery County Correctional Facility violating the rights protected by the constitution (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Mon 05/13 4:10 PM
RETURN EDSS DOCUMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 5/13/2024.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 First Page of Returned Document
Thursday, May 09, 2024
16 16 corresp Miscellaneous Thu 05/09 2:57 PM
Correspondence from Crisstofer Michael French Sr., regarding special appearance. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order Wed 05/08 4:06 PM
ORDER Granting Plaintiff leave to file the proposed Motion to Dismiss; the Motion will be deemed timely if filed by Wednesday, May 22, 2024. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 5/8/2024. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Response Wed 05/08 2:42 PM
Objection to9 Notice of Appearance filed by Crisstofer Michael French, Sr.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Response Wed 05/08 2:38 PM
RESPONSE to10 Notice of Intent to File a Motion to Dismiss filed by Crisstofer Michael French, Sr.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/08 2:37 PM
Request for Admissions pursuant to Federal Rules of Admission by Crisstofer Michael French, Sr. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
11 11 corresp Miscellaneous Wed 05/08 2:36 PM
Plaintiff's Petition for a declaratory judgment on the select issue of counsel.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/06 1:45 PM
NOTICE by Circuit Court for Montgomery County, State of Maryland (Hummel, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/02 12:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Elizabeth Hummel on behalf of Circuit Court for Montgomery County, State of Maryland (Hummel, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/29 8:42 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crisstofer Michael French, Sr. Circuit Court for Montgomery County served on 4/26/2024, answer due 5/17/2024; State of Maryland served on 4/26/2024, answer due 5/17/2024.(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 04/24 9:51 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Circuit Court for Montgomery County, State of Maryland.(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/16 11:09 AM
ORDER that Plaintiff shall provide summons for each Defendant to the Clerk for signature and seal; Plaintiff shall serve each defendant with the appropriate summons and the Complaint by June 19, 2024. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/16/2024. (c/m to P on 4/16/2024 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
5 5 corresp Miscellaneous Fri 04/12 12:08 PM
Proof of Delivery filed by Crisstofer Michael French, Sr.(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice EDSS Consent to Receive Electronic Notice Fri 04/12 12:06 PM
Documents submitted via EDSS. Crisstofer Michael French, Sr consents to receive notice and service electronically. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
4 4 order Case Management Order Wed 03/20 2:06 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/20/2024. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc New Case Notification Letter Wed 03/20 12:54 PM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Crisstofer Michael French, Sr. (c/m to P on 3/20/2024 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
2 2 misc Consent to Receive Electronic Notice Wed 03/20 12:51 PM
Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Crisstofer Michael French, Sr. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/20 12:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Circuit Court for Montgomery County State of Maryland ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 1837.), filed by Crisstofer Michael French, Sr.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet