LU v. KERRY et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | R Barclay Surrick |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01169 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2024 5:20 AM EDT |
Defendant
JOHN P. ZANINI
|
|
Defendant
WILLIAM D. DELAHUNT
|
|
Defendant
TRACY ANNE DAVIS
|
|
Defendant
CITY OF WOBURN
|
|
Defendant
DAVID J. CARCAMO
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL E. CAPUANO
|
|
Defendant
SCOTT P. BROWN
|
|
Defendant
JESUS __
|
|
Defendant
RYA W ZOBEL
|
|
Defendant
MONIKA ZARSKI
|
|
Defendant
CHUCK FLAHERTY
|
|
Defendant
SENIOR DISTRICT JUDG WILLIAM G YOUNG
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT GEORGE YOUNG, II
|
|
Defendant
JANE E YOUNG
|
|
Defendant
YIELD10 BIOSCIENCE
|
|
Defendant
MARIA YANAKOPOULOS
|
|
Defendant
DOUGLAS P WOODLOCK
|
|
Defendant
PATTY WONG-MURPHY
|
|
Defendant
LENA WONG
|
|
Defendant
MICROSOFT CORP
|
|
Defendant
STEVEN W. TOMPKINS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
COUNSEL JACQUELINE L ALLEN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
YAHOO INC.
|
|
Defendant
MARY-LOUISE WHITE
|
|
Defendant
AMY E RYAN
|
|
Defendant
THOMAS F. REILLY
|
|
Defendant
CRISTOPHER O QUAYLE
|
|
Defendant
AYANNA PRESSLEY
|
|
Defendant
CATHERINE O'HAGAN WOLFE
|
|
Defendant
STEPHEN F. LYNCH
|
|
Defendant
MARCY C. LEVINGTON
|
|
Defendant
JOHN F. KERRY
|
|
Defendant
L. SCOTT HARSHBARGER
|
|
Defendant
HERMAYNE GORDON
|
|
Defendant
GOOGLE LLC
|
|
Defendant
MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG
|
|
Defendant
SCOTT D. GALVIN
|
|
Defendant
ULTIMATE PARKING, INC
|
|
Defendant
MARTIN J. WALSH
|
|
Defendant
ANTHONY WALROND
|
|
Defendant
SARA A. WALKER
|
|
Defendant
BRIAN P. VOKE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER VAZQUEZ
|
|
Defendant
JOHN VANSCOYOC
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL VAN DANG
|
|
Defendant
ACHESON H. VALLAGHAN
|
|
Defendant
UNITED STATES
|
|
Defendant
MARK WANG
|
|
Defendant
BOODIE UGNUMBA
|
|
Defendant
U MASS MEMORIAL HEALTH CARE, INC
|
|
Defendant
A. RAYMOND TYE
|
|
Defendant
PAUL TUTTLE
|
|
Defendant
JEFFREY C. TURK
|
|
Defendant
THOMAS A. TURCO, III
|
|
Defendant
TUCKER LAW GROUP, LLC
|
|
Defendant
JOE H TUCKER, JR
|
|
Defendant
WILBERT WILSON
|
|
Defendant
MARK L WOLF
|
|
Defendant
WINNCOMPANIES
|
|
Defendant
JEFFREY M. WINIK
|
|
Defendant
KARYN M. WILSON
|
|
Defendant
WILLIE BUTLERM
|
|
Defendant
SHAWN A. WILLIAMS
|
|
Defendant
WILLIAM P LEAHY
|
|
Defendant
HERBERT P WILKINS
|
|
Defendant
JULIA WILDER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TS LAND TRUST LLC
|
|
Defendant
WHITE & CASE, LLP
|
|
Defendant
JOHN WHEATLEY
|
|
Defendant
DALILA ARGAEZ WENDLANDT
|
|
Defendant
BRIAN F WELSH
|
|
Defendant
DAVID WATERFALL
|
|
Defendant
SENATORS ELIZABETH WARREN
|
|
Defendant
STANLEY WANG
|
|
Defendant
ROBERTO RONQUILLO, JR.
|
|
Defendant
ABM JANITORIAL SERVICES NORTHEAST, INC.
|
|
Defendant
MARGARET M. ABRUZESE
|
|
Defendant
PETER W. AGNES, JR.
|
|
Defendant
ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC.
|
|
Defendant
ALLISON D BURROUGHS
|
|
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER M. ANDERSON
|
|
Defendant
ANDERSON & KREIGER LLP
|
|
Defendant
GERALD T. ANGELIN
|
|
Defendant
ANNE TAYLOR
|
|
Defendant
EVELYN ARANA-ORTIZ
|
|
Defendant
JOSE ARAUJO
|
|
Defendant
GREGORY R ARCHIBALD
|
|
Defendant
ZAMAWA ARENAS
|
|
Defendant
ARENTFOX SCHIFF
|
|
Defendant
ARMADA WASTE MA II, LLC
|
|
Defendant
PATRICIA ARMSTRONG
|
|
Defendant
BAIRD HOLM LLP
|
|
Defendant
CHARLES D. BAKER, JR.
|
|
Defendant
ANNAPURNA BALAKRISHNA
|
|
Defendant
WARREN T BAMFORD
|
|
Defendant
DAVID J BARRON
|
|
Defendant
BAY COVE HUMAN RESOURCES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ANNETTE C. BENEDETTO
|
|
Defendant
GEORGE A. BERMAN
|
|
Defendant
JOSEPH S. BERMAN
|
|
Defendant
MARK N. BERMAN
|
|
Defendant
ANNA BLACKBURNE-RIGSBY
|
|
Defendant
DOMINIC BLUE
|
|
Defendant
BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF MASSACHUSETTS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
LESTER BLUMBERG
|
|
Defendant
JENNIFER C BOAL
|
|
Defendant
JOSEPH R BONAVOLONTA
|
|
Defendant
RUTH BONSIGNORE
|
|
Defendant
JESSE M. BOODOO
|
|
Defendant
BOSTON COLLEGE
|
|
Defendant
BOSTON HOUSING AUTHORITY
|
|
Defendant
BOSTON PUBLIC HEALTH COMMISSION
|
|
Defendant
BOSTON SCHOOL COMMITTEE
|
|
Defendant
MARGOT BOTSFORD
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL BOUDIN
|
|
Defendant
WILLARD J. BOULTER, III
|
|
Defendant
BOWDITCH & DEWEY, LLP
|
|
Defendant
BOWDITCH AND DEWEY, LLP
|
|
Defendant
MARIANNE B BOWLER
|
|
Defendant
COLIN R. BOYLE
|
|
Defendant
BOYLE SHAUGHNESSY LAW PC
|
|
Defendant
DENNIS BRADBURY
|
|
Defendant
JILL M. BRADLEY
|
|
Defendant
RONALD L. BRANDT
|
|
Defendant
AMY B. BRATSKEIR
|
|
Defendant
MARIE BREEN
|
|
Defendant
DOUGLAS S BROOKS
|
|
Defendant
DOUGLAS S. BROWN
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT M. BUCHANAN, JR.
|
|
Defendant
KIMBERLY S BUDD
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL H. BUNIS
|
|
Defendant
ANDREA J CAMPBELL
|
|
Defendant
LEVIN H CAMPBELL
|
|
Defendant
BEVERLY J. CANNONE
|
|
Defendant
CAPITOL GRILLE OF BOSTON, INC
|
|
Defendant
CAPITOL WASTE SERVICES, INC.
|
|
Defendant
PAULA M. CAREY
|
|
Defendant
DAVID CARRASCO
|
|
Defendant
CRYSTAL CARRINGTON
|
|
Defendant
JAMES CARROLL
|
|
Defendant
ROSEMARY CASHMAN
|
|
Defendant
JULIO A CASTILLO
|
|
Defendant
CASTLE SQUARE TENANTS ORGANIZATION
|
|
Defendant
KATHLEEN M. CAWLEY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JEFFREY C CECIL
|
|
Defendant
CHING-JU CHANG
|
|
Defendant
SHAUGHNESSY CHARBONNEAU
|
|
Defendant
LYNN R CHARYTAN
|
|
Defendant
CHOATE HALL & STEWART
|
|
Defendant
JODI CHOEN
|
|
Defendant
DAVID CHRISTINI
|
|
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER J NOONE
|
|
Defendant
JULIE CIOLLO
|
|
Defendant
JAMES R. CLARKE
|
|
Defendant
CLASSIC CLEANING CO, INC
|
|
Defendant
JOHN C. CLOUGH
|
|
Defendant
CMBG3 LAW LLC.
|
|
Defendant
JIA M COBB
|
|
Defendant
GINA COHEN
|
|
Defendant
COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS, LLC
|
|
Defendant
WILBUR E. COMMODORE
|
|
Defendant
MARC C. CONCANNON
|
|
Defendant
MARK C. CONCANNON
|
|
Defendant
DANIEL F. CONLEY
|
|
Defendant
RUSSELL F. CONN
|
|
Defendant
CONN KAVANAUGH ROSENTHAL PEISCH & FORD LLP
|
|
Defendant
KATHRYN COOK
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT J CORDY
|
|
Defendant
CORRIGAN JOHNSON & TUTOR, PA
|
|
Defendant
PAMELA COVENEY
|
|
Defendant
JUDITH CA COWIN
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL A COX
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT D. COX, JR
|
|
Defendant
DANIEL G. CROMACK
|
|
Defendant
JOSEPH V. CRONIN
|
|
Defendant
RICHARD CURTIN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ELSPETH B CYPHER
|
|
Defendant
LYNDA D'ANDREA
|
|
Defendant
WILLIAM J. DAILEY, III
|
|
Defendant
BRIAN G. DALTON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MARK P. DALY
|
|
Defendant
DANA FARBER CANCER INSTITUTE
|
|
Defendant
EDWARD F. DAVIS, III
|
|
Defendant
KEVIN DAVIS
|
|
Defendant
YUDELKYS DE LOS SANTOS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LAURA DEBONIS
|
|
Defendant
JUDITH G DEIN
|
|
Defendant
MARIA E. DELUZIO
|
|
Defendant
SCOTT K DEMELLO
|
|
Defendant
DENISE J CASPER
|
|
Defendant
FRANK DEPAOLA
|
|
Defendant
PAUL DEPAULO
|
|
Defendant
DONNA M. DEPRISCO
|
|
Defendant
RICHARD C DESLAURIERS
|
|
Defendant
JODY L GOODMAN DINAN
|
|
Defendant
DISABILITY LAW CENTER
|
|
Defendant
MARK C DIVINCENZO
|
|
Defendant
MATTHEW DIVRIS
|
|
Defendant
DLC MANAGEMENT CORP.
|
|
Defendant
DAVID T DONNELLY
|
|
Defendant
DAVID T. DONNELLY
|
|
Defendant
SUSAN M. DONNELLY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DONNELLY CONROY & GELHAAR
|
|
Defendant
ERIC T DONOVAN
|
|
Defendant
LYNDIA DOWNIE
|
|
Defendant
IRWIN DRIGGS
|
|
Defendant
CAROLINE O. DRISCOLL
|
|
Defendant
JEFFREY DRISCOLL
|
|
Defendant
ANNA DRONZEK
|
|
Defendant
EILEEN R. DUFF
|
|
Defendant
FERNANDE RV DUFFLY
|
|
Defendant
JOHN EGAN
|
|
Defendant
SANDRA L. EHLINGER
|
|
Defendant
THOMAS M. ELCOCK
|
|
Defendant
EMINA ZAGANJORI KELLY
|
|
Defendant
BRENDAN ENGLAND
|
|
Defendant
JOHN T ENGLANDER
|
|
Defendant
WILLIAM ENRIGHT
|
|
Defendant
ERIKA GEETTER
|
|
Defendant
PAUL FRANCIS EVANS, JR
|
|
Defendant
WILLIAM B EVANS
|
|
Defendant
F DENNIS SAYLOR IV
|
|
Defendant
JOHN A. FAHEY
|
|
Defendant
FREDERICK E. FAIRFIELD, JR.
|
|
Defendant
HEATHER L. FAIRFIELD
|
|
Defendant
HEATHER LYNN FAIRFIELD
|
|
Defendant
FAIRFIELD REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT CORP
|
|
Defendant
FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORP.
|
|
Defendant
ABIGAIL L. FEE
|
|
Defendant
PETER D. FEEHERRY
|
|
Defendant
JOEL J. FELDMAN
|
|
Defendant
RAUL FERNANDEZ
|
|
Defendant
JOSEPH C. FERREIRA
|
|
Defendant
PHOEBE FISCHER-GROBAN
|
|
Defendant
JOEL FLORES
|
|
Defendant
FOR THE RECORD, INC.
|
|
Defendant
BENJAMIN FRANCO
|
|
Defendant
TIMOTHY FRATES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JESSICA L. FRATTAROLI
|
|
Defendant
DAVID FREDETTE
|
|
Defendant
STEPHEN D. FULLER
|
|
Defendant
FULLER ROSENBERG PALMER & BELIVEAU LLP
|
|
Defendant
CAROL FULP
|
|
Defendant
G&M COURT REPORTERS, LTD
|
|
Defendant
G4S SECURE SOLUTIONS (USA), INC
|
|
Defendant
BERTHE M. GAINES
|
|
Defendant
WILLIAM F GALVIN
|
|
Defendant
MARIELENA GAMBOA-RUIZ
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL S. GARDENER
|
|
Defendant
JOHN E. GARLAND
|
|
Defendant
MERRICK GARLAND
|
|
Defendant
SAMUEL R. GATES
|
|
Defendant
BRENDAN J. GAUGHAN
|
|
Defendant
THOMAS GAUGHAN, III
|
|
Defendant
FRANK M GAZIANO
|
|
Defendant
PETER GELHAAR
|
|
Defendant
GUSTAVO A GELPI
|
|
Defendant
KATHLEEN M. GENOVA
|
|
Defendant
JASON CHAKA GEORGE
|
|
Defendant
SERGE GEORGES, JR
|
|
Defendant
NANCY GERTNER
|
|
Defendant
ANDREW GHOBRIAL
|
|
Defendant
JAMES P. GIANELLIS
|
|
Defendant
DEIRDRE M. GIBLIN
|
|
Defendant
MD MICHAEL J. GILL
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL J. GILL
|
|
Defendant
JORDANA B. GLASGOW
|
|
Defendant
KAREN A. GLASGOW
|
|
Defendant
WAYNE P. GODIN
|
|
Defendant
BENJAMIN GOLDEN
|
|
Defendant
BENJAMIN K. GOLDEN
|
|
Defendant
DAVID A. GOLDMAN
|
|
Defendant
JULIE GOLDMAN
|
|
Defendant
MATTHEW M GRAVES
|
|
Defendant
STEPHEN S. GRAY
|
|
Defendant
JOHN M GREANEY
|
|
Defendant
MARK V. GREEN
|
|
Defendant
BERNARD GREENE
|
|
Defendant
LESLIE MILLER GREENSPAN
|
|
Defendant
CAROL A. GRIFFIN
|
|
Defendant
WILLIAM G GROSS
|
|
Defendant
ANTHONY GULLY
|
|
Defendant
DAVID F. HADLOCK
HADLOCK LAW OFFICES, PC 111 SPEEN ST. SUITE 200
FARMINGHAM, MA 01701 |
|
Defendant
ANDREW J. HAILE
|
|
Defendant
JOHN T. HAILER
|
|
Defendant
KARLENE HALL
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT R. HAMEL, JR.
|
|
Defendant
HAMEL MARCIN DUNN REARDON & SHEA PC
|
|
Defendant
HEATHER HAMILTON
|
|
Defendant
MARK P. HARMON
|
|
Defendant
EDWARD F HARRINGTON
|
|
Defendant
TIMOTHY J HARRINGTON
|
|
Defendant
CYNTHIA B. HARTMAN
|
|
Defendant
JAHAD HASAN
|
|
Defendant
DAVE HASSAN
|
|
Defendant
HASSAN & REARDON, PC
|
|
Defendant
KEVIN R HAYDEN
|
|
Defendant
MAURA T HEALEY
|
|
Defendant
MARGARET HEGARTY
|
|
Defendant
NANCY S. HELLER
|
|
Defendant
MAURA A. HENNIGAN
|
|
Defendant
GERALDINE S HINES
|
|
Defendant
MARK A HIPPLE
|
|
Defendant
HIRSCH ROBERTS WEINSTEIN LLP
|
|
Defendant
DANIEL J. HOGAN
|
|
Defendant
PATI A. HOLORAN
|
|
Defendant
THOMAS M HOOPES
|
|
Defendant
STEPHEN HORGAN
|
|
Defendant
THOMAS C. HORGAN
|
|
Defendant
ALYCIA HORN
|
|
Defendant
ANDREW R. HORNE
|
|
Defendant
JEFFREY R HOWARD
|
|
Defendant
BRIAN P HUDAK
|
|
Defendant
GEORGE HULME
|
|
Defendant
MARY E. HURLEY
|
|
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER A. IANNELLA
|
|
Defendant
INDIRA TALWANI
|
|
Defendant
RODERICK L IRELAND
|
|
Defendant
ISI SOFTWARE
|
|
Defendant
JACKSON LEWIS PC
|
|
Defendant
DARON L. JANIS
|
|
Defendant
JENNIFER M STAPLES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JESSS SON
|
|
Defendant
JOHN DOE
|
|
Defendant
JOHN HANCOCK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CO
|
|
Defendant
JOHN B. JOHNSON
|
|
Defendant
JON DAVID LEVIN
|
|
Defendant
SIAN JONES
|
|
Defendant
JONES & FULLER REPORTING, INC
|
|
Defendant
JOHN JORRITSMA
|
|
Defendant
JOSEPH HERLIHY
|
|
Defendant
JOSEPH M LEE
|
|
Defendant
MYONG J JOUN
|
|
Defendant
JOHN J. JOY
|
|
Defendant
JPMORGAN CHASE
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT L. JUBINVILLE
|
|
Defendant
SCOTT L KAFKER
|
|
Defendant
KENNETH W KAISER
|
|
Defendant
ABDUL KAMARA
|
|
Defendant
ZIAD KAMEL
|
|
Defendant
KAREN FRINK WOLF
|
|
Defendant
PAUL V KASTNER
|
|
Defendant
KASTNER REALTY TRUST
|
|
Defendant
BENJAMIN KATZ
|
|
Defendant
PAUL S. KAWAI
|
|
Defendant
WILLIAM J KAYATTA, JR
|
|
Defendant
PETER KEENAN
|
|
Defendant
JAMIE LEWIS KEITH
|
|
Defendant
BRIAN KELLY
|
|
Defendant
BRIAN T KELLY
|
|
Defendant
ELIZABETH H. KELLY
|
|
Defendant
SALLY A. KELLY
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL KENDALL
|
|
Defendant
KEVIN P. KERR
|
|
Defendant
CAMERON F KERRY
|
|
Defendant
C. JEFFREY KINDER
|
|
Defendant
JOSEPH A. KING
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MELVIN KLECHNER
|
|
Defendant
JULIA E. KOBICK
|
|
Defendant
PAUL LA CAMERA
|
|
Defendant
KAREN LAFRAZIA
|
|
Defendant
LANCE E WALKER
|
|
Defendant
BRIAN LANG
|
|
Defendant
JOSEPH N LAPLANTE
|
|
Defendant
DARYL J. LAPP
|
|
Defendant
PAUL N LAPROCINA, JR
|
|
Defendant
SHEILA F LAWN
|
|
Defendant
LAWRENCE H SUMMERS
|
|
Defendant
DANIEL M. LEE
|
|
Defendant
FRED LEE
|
|
Defendant
DENNIS LEHANE
|
|
Defendant
LEIGH CAMPBELL JOYCE
|
|
Defendant
BARBARA A LENK
|
|
Defendant
LEO T SOROKIN
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL J LEPIZZERA
|
|
Defendant
LEPIZZERA AND LAPROCINA
|
|
Defendant
JOSHUA S LEVY
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT L. LEWIS
|
|
Defendant
LIBBY HOOPES BROOKS AND MULVEY, PC
|
|
Defendant
MELANIE LIMA
|
|
Defendant
LIMITED TO ENDODONTICS, INC
|
|
Defendant
KERMIT V LIPEZ
|
|
Defendant
VINCENT B LISI
|
|
Defendant
DEBRA ANN LIVINGSTON
|
|
Defendant
JEFFREY A LOCKE
|
|
Defendant
LOCKE LORD LLP
|
|
Defendant
LONGWOOD SECURITY SERVICES, INC
|
|
Defendant
DAVID A LOWY
|
|
Defendant
KENNETH W. LUKE
|
|
Defendant
ERIK LUND
|
|
Defendant
SANDRA L LYNCH
|
|
Defendant
CHARLES LYONS
|
|
Defendant
ROY MACKENZIE
|
|
Defendant
DAVID S. MACKEY
|
|
Defendant
KEVIN MICHAEL MAGOON
|
|
Defendant
NANCY MAHAN
|
|
Defendant
PAUL MAHONEY
|
|
Defendant
MARIA ROBLES
|
|
Defendant
EDWARD J MARKEY
|
|
Defendant
CHRISTINA MARSHALL
|
|
Defendant
MARGARET H MARSHALL
|
|
Defendant
NANCY MARTINS
|
|
Defendant
MASSACHUSETTS BAY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
|
|
Defendant
MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
|
|
Defendant
MAUREEN FEENEY
|
|
Defendant
ROSLYNN R MAUSKOPF
|
|
Defendant
DEAN MAZZARELLA
|
|
Defendant
AMY M. MCCALLEN
|
|
Defendant
ANDREA W. MCCARTHY
|
|
Defendant
IAN MCCLAIN
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL MCCORMACK
|
|
Defendant
MCCULLOUGH, STIEVATER & POLVERE
|
|
Defendant
DONNA MCDONOUGH
|
|
Defendant
DOUGLAS M MCGARRAH
|
|
Defendant
OMAR MCGOVERN
|
|
Defendant
WILLIAM P. MCGOVERN
|
|
Defendant
JASON MCGRANE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROBERT J. MCKENNA
|
|
Defendant
DANIEL J. MCKENZIE
|
|
Defendant
DAVID S. MCMAHON
|
|
Defendant
MATT VP MCTYGUE
|
|
Defendant
MELICK & PORTER
|
|
Defendant
EVAN MEREDITH
|
|
Defendant
METHUNION MANOR COOPERATIVE CORP.
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL B HALPIN
|
|
Defendant
CAROL A. MICI
|
|
Defendant
SUSAN MILLS
|
|
Defendant
MINTZ LEVIN COHN FERRIS GLOVSKY & POPEO, PC
|
|
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER R. MIRICK
|
|
Defendant
LAUREN M. MITCHELL
|
|
Defendant
WALTER T MITCHELL
|
|
Defendant
CHARLES K. MONE
|
|
Defendant
GERALD F. MOORE
50 CRESTWOOD DRIVE
HOLLIS, NH 03049 |
|
Defendant
MORGAN, BROWN & JOY LLP
|
|
Defendant
ERICA MORIN
|
|
Defendant
MORRISON MAHONEY LLP
|
|
Defendant
MPD LAW, LLC.
|
|
Defendant
ELIZABETH N MULVEY
|
|
Defendant
RACHEL E. MUNOZ
|
|
Defendant
JOSLIN HAM MURPHY
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT MURPHY
|
|
Defendant
SUSAN D. MURPHY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MURPHY & RILEY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
REBECCA MURRAY
|
|
Defendant
MARIO MYRTHIL
|
|
Defendant
McNEES WALLACE & NURICK LLC
|
|
Defendant
MARYGRACE NEAL
|
|
Defendant
NIXON PEABODY LLP
|
|
Defendant
GARETH W. NOTIS
|
|
Defendant
ANDREA F. NUCIFORO, JR.
|
|
Defendant
KIMBERLY C. NUZSUM
|
|
Defendant
DAVID J. O'CONNOR
|
|
Defendant
FRANCIS J O'CONNOR
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MICHAEL O'CONNOR
|
|
Defendant
NICOLE M. O'CONNOR
|
|
Defendant
EUGENE L. O'FLAHERTY
|
|
Defendant
SEAN PATRICK O'MALLEY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GEORGE A O'TOOLE, JR
|
|
Defendant
KATHLEEN M O'TOOLE
|
|
Defendant
ALBERT OGISTE
|
|
Defendant
BISOLA OJIKUTU
|
|
Defendant
CARMEN M ORTIZ
|
|
Defendant
TYLER OSTHOLTHOFF
|
|
Defendant
ANTHONY S. OWENS
|
|
Defendant
COLEEN PALMISANO
|
|
Defendant
WHITNEY C PASTERNACK
|
|
Defendant
PATTI B SARIS
|
|
Defendant
MARK ALAN PERKINS
|
|
Defendant
PETER H VELYVIS
|
|
Defendant
MARILYN M. PETITTO DEVANEY
|
|
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER E PHILLIPS
|
|
Defendant
MARY PICCIRILLI
|
|
Defendant
NINA PICKERING-COOK
|
|
Defendant
LAWRENCE PIERCE
ROUTE 7, BOX 555A
MOBILE, AL 36608 |
|
Defendant
PINE STREET INN
|
|
Defendant
STEVE POFTAK
|
|
Defendant
STEPHANIE POLLACK
|
|
Defendant
MATTHEW P. POPPEL
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL J. POWER
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT P POWERS
|
|
Defendant
JOHN T. PRESCOBB
|
|
Defendant
PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE
|
|
Defendant
PRINCE LOBEL TYE LLP.
|
|
Defendant
JOHN P. PULEO
|
|
Defendant
PURCHASE AMERICA, INC.
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT L. QUAYLE
|
|
Defendant
LUIS MANUEL RAMIREZ
|
|
Defendant
CHARLES W. RANKIN
|
|
Defendant
BATOOL RAZA
|
|
Defendant
MARY REGAN
|
|
Defendant
LEO RAFAEL REIF
|
|
Defendant
JOHN REINSTEIN
|
|
Defendant
JULIANA DEHAAN RICE
|
|
Defendant
SHELLEY M RICHMOND JOSEPH
|
|
Defendant
KEVIN M. RIORDAN
|
|
Defendant
R. BRANDON RIOS
|
|
Defendant
RICARDO BRANDON RIOS
|
|
Defendant
ANTHONY J. RIZZO
|
|
Defendant
THOMAS G. ROBBINS
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT A BROWN
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT M FARRELL
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT W IULIANO
|
|
Defendant
SCOTT A. ROBERTS
|
|
Defendant
RACHAEL E ROLLINS
|
|
Defendant
ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF BOSTON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JEFFREY B. RUDMAN
|
|
Defendant
BYRON RUSHING
|
|
Defendant
RYAN A MACLEAN
|
|
Defendant
PATRICIA RYLE
|
|
Defendant
SAINT FRANCIS HOUSE, INC
|
|
Defendant
KENNETH W. SALINGER
|
|
Defendant
DENISE O. SALTERS
|
|
Defendant
RAMAN SAMRA
|
|
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER SAMUEL
|
|
Defendant
JUAN R SANCHEZ
|
|
Defendant
SARAH A THORNTON
|
|
Defendant
ANGELO M. SCACCIA
|
|
Defendant
KAREN SCHULTZ
|
|
Defendant
BRUCE M SELYA
|
|
Defendant
HAROLD SHAW
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT L. SHEKETOFF
|
|
Defendant
SARAH B. SINGER
|
|
Defendant
ELEANOR SINNOTT
|
|
Defendant
WILLIAM F. SINNOTT
|
|
Defendant
SONIA L. SKINNER
|
|
Defendant
SARA SLYMON
|
|
Defendant
DIANE SMITH
|
|
Defendant
MARTHA B SOSMAN
|
|
Defendant
FRANCIS X SPINA
|
|
Defendant
WILLIAM SPRAGUE
|
|
Defendant
SARAH ST PIERRE
|
|
Defendant
JOSEPH STANTON
|
|
Defendant
STAPES INC
|
|
Defendant
JENNIFER STAPLES
|
|
Defendant
STAR MARKET, INC.
|
|
Defendant
LAWRENCE M. STARR
|
|
Defendant
RICHARD G STEARNS
|
|
Defendant
KURT G. STENHOUSE
|
|
Defendant
DONALD K STERN
|
|
Defendant
STEVEN M CORLISS
|
|
Defendant
WILLARD STIEVATER
|
|
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER STORM
|
|
Defendant
SUFFOLK COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CATHERINE E. SULLIVAN
|
|
Defendant
DANIEL P. SULLIVAN
|
|
Defendant
DENNIS F. SULLIVAN
|
|
Defendant
JANE A. SULLIVAN
|
|
Defendant
JOSEPH SULLIVAN
|
|
Defendant
MICAHEL J SULLIVAN
|
|
Defendant
JAMES L. SULTAN
|
|
Defendant
CHRIS SUMMA
|
|
Defendant
MARK H. SUMMERVILLE
|
|
Defendant
SUPREME JUDICIAL COURT
|
|
Defendant
ISABEL SWEET
|
|
Defendant
STEVEN TANKLE
|
|
Defendant
BETSY TAYLOR
|
|
Defendant
DAVID TAYLOR
|
|
Defendant
GREGG TAYLOR
|
|
Defendant
LISA A. TENEROWICZ
|
|
Defendant
TENT CITY CORP.
|
|
Defendant
THE GEORGETOWN COMPANY LLC
|
|
Defendant
THE TOWNE LAW FIRM, PC
|
|
Defendant
THECANTON CORP
|
|
Defendant
ANN THOMAS
|
|
Defendant
O ROGERIEE THOMPSON
|
|
Defendant
WALTER F. TIMILTY
|
|
Defendant
ORLANDO TIRELLA
|
|
Defendant
JOHN L. TOBIN
|
|
Defendant
TOMMASINO & TOMMASINO
|
|
Defendant
TOWN OF BROOKLINE
|
|
Defendant
ROSEMARY A. TRAINI
|
|
Defendant
LIZA J. TRAN
|
|
Defendant
TRUSTEES OF BOSTON PUBLIC LIBRARY
|
|
Defendant
TRUSTEES OF BOSTON UNIVERSITY
|
|
Defendant
TRUSTEES OF TUFTS COLLEGE;
|
|
Plaintiff
FRIEDRICH LU
P.O. BOX 499 LAFAYETTE STATION
BOSTON, MA 02112 |
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 08, 2025 | ||
44 | 44
![]() ORDER of USCA as to39 Notice of Appeal filed by FRIEDRICH LU. The Above matter is Dismissed pursuant to frap 42(b). A Certified copy of this order is issued in lieu of a formal mandate. (dt) |
|
Thursday, April 03, 2025 | ||
43 | 43
![]() NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re39 Notice of Appeal filed by FRIEDRICH LU. USCA Case Number 25-1532 (dt) |
|
Friday, March 28, 2025 | ||
42 | 42
![]() NOTICE by FRIEDRICH LU. RE: Received Clerk's Email today.(dt) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, March 27, 2025 | ||
41 | 41
![]() Pro So Plaintiff Friedrich Lu's Waiver of Entry of Judgment on Sanction Proceeding.(dt) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, March 25, 2025 | ||
40 | 40
![]() RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by FRIEDRICH LU.(dt) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Sunday, March 23, 2025 | ||
39 | 39
![]() NOTICE OF APPEAL by FRIEDRICH LU. NO IFP, NO FEE PAID.(sg) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, March 21, 2025 | ||
38 | 38
![]() ORDER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUTPREJUDICE.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY ENTIREDISTRICT COURT AND FOR INTRA-CIRCUIT ASSIGNMENT (ECF NO. 2), MOTION TO REDACT (ECF NO. 3),MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AGAINST THE CITY OF BOSTON (ECF NO. 20), EMERGENCY MOTION TOENJOIN JOSEPH M. [L]EE AND [HIS] EMPLOYEE (ECF NO. 25), A MOTION TO IDENTIFY DEFICIENCY INSERVICE OF PROCESS (ECF NO. 26), AND MOTION TO DISQUALIFY JUDGE SURRICK (ECF NO. 35), THEMOTIONS ARE DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, WITHIN TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS OF THIS ORDER, PLAINTIFF FRIEDRICHLU SHALL SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY HIS PATTERN OF CONDUCT DOES NOT JUSTIFY A TAILORED PRE-FILING INJUNCTIONTHAT PROVIDES THE FOLLOWING:1. EXCEPT FOR A NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THIS ORDER (SEE 5 BELOW), THE CLERK OF COURTSHALL NOT ACCEPT ANY OF PLAINTIFF FRIEDRICH LUS FURTHER FILINGS IN THISMATTER AGAINST ANY DEFENDANT WITHOUT PRIOR APPROVAL OF THIS COURT.2. PLAINTIFF FRIEDRICH LU IS HEREBY ENJOINED FROM COMMENCING ANY NEW CIVILMATTERS IN THIS COURT AGAINST ANY OF THE DEFENDANTS IN THIS MATTER THAT RELATE, DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, TO CLAIMS THAT HAVE ALREADY BEEN RAISED OR DISPOSED OF IN FEDERAL COURT.IN ANY SUCH NEW MATTER, PLAINTIFF SHALL BE REQUIRED TO FIRST CERTIFY TO THIS COURT THAT(A) THE CLAIMS BEING PRESENTED HAVE NEVER BEEN RAISED OR DISPOSED OF ON THE MERITSBY A FEDERAL COURT AND (B) PLAINTIFF BELIEVES THE FACTS CONTAINED IN THE PROPOSEDCOMPLAINT TO BE TRUE.3. UPON A FAILURE TO CERTIFY OR UPON A FALSE CERTIFICATION, PLAINTIFF MAY BE FOUNDIN CONTEMPT OF COURT AND PUNISHED ACCORDINGLY.4. PLAINTIFF MUST ATTACH A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO ANY SUCH MOTION FOR LEAVE.5. THIS ORDER DOES NOT ENJOIN PLAINTIFF FROM PURSUING AN APPEAL OF THIS ORDER.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 3/21/2025. 3/21/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO PRO SE.(sg) |
|
37 | 37
![]() MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 3/21/2025. 3/21/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO PRO SE.(sg) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
![]() EXHIBIT by FRIEDRICH LU..(dt) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
![]() PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY JUDGE SURRICK FILED BY FRIEDRICH LU.(mas) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by SETH L. LAVER on behalf of SUSAN M. DONNELLY, JOSEPH A. KING, SUSAN D. MURPHY, MURPHY & RILEY with Certificate of Service(LAVER, SETH) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK T. CASEY on behalf of JENNIFER M STAPLES with Certificate of Service(CASEY, PATRICK) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK T. CASEY on behalf of BAY COVE HUMAN RESOURCES, INC., YUDELKYS DE LOS SANTOS with Certificate of Service(CASEY, PATRICK) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
![]() NOTICE of Appearance filed by GERALD F. MOORE. (mas) (mas) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by ALESIA S. SULOCK on behalf of BRIAN P. VOKE with Certificate of Service(SULOCK, ALESIA) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT M. RUNYON, III on behalf of COUNSEL JACQUELINE L ALLEN; with Certificate of Service(RUNYON, ROBERT) |
|
Wednesday, June 12, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by EDWIN L. STOCK on behalf of JASON MCGRANE with Certificate of Service(STOCK, EDWIN) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, June 05, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Notice on Defendant Ashley Brown Ahearn by FRIEDRICH LU.(lisad, ) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
26 | 26
![]() MOTION TO IDENTIFY DEFICIENCY IN SERVICE OF PROCESS, IF ANY BY PRO SE PLAINTIFF FRIEDRICH LU.(dt) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/6/2024) (lisad, ). Modified on 6/6/2024 (lisad, ) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, June 03, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
![]() PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION TO ENJOIN JOSEPH M KEE AND EMPLOYEE, filed by FRIEDRICH LU..(sg) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, May 30, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by EDWIN L. STOCK on behalf of KATHLEEN M. CAWLEY, RICHARD CURTIN, BRIAN G. DALTON, TIMOTHY FRATES, SUFFOLK COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT, STEVEN W. TOMPKINSW, JULIA WILDER with Certificate of Service(STOCK, EDWIN) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
23 | 23
![]() SUPPLEMENT OF NEW DEVELOPMENTS TO EMERGENCY MOTION TO ENJOIN CITY BY PRO SE PLAINTIFF by FRIEDRICH LU.(dt) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, May 28, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint by Pro Se Defendant DAVID F. HADLOCK, Certificate of Service..(dt) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Sunday, May 26, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE by FRIEDRICH LU(sg) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, May 23, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() EMERGENCY MOTION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF FRIEDRICH LU FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AGAINST CITY OF BOSTON.(dt) Modified on 5/23/2024 (dt) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, May 20, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() PREPARED SUMMONS, by FRIEDRICH LU.. (sg) |
|
Thursday, May 16, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT IS STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 5/16/2024. 5/16/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg) |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Pro Se Plaintiff FRIEDRICH LU's Rule 46 Statement of Boston Cardinal and His Attorney. (DT)(dt) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, May 06, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THEMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANTSSEAN PATRICK OMALLEY, FRANCIS J. OCONNOR, AND THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF BOSTON, IT ISHEREBY ORDERED AND DECREED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS SEAN PATRICKOMALLEY, FRANCIS J. OCONNOR, AND THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF BOSTON SHALL FILE A RESPONSETO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE JUNE 6, 2024. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 5/6/2024.5/7/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg) |
|
15 | 15
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by FRANCIS J O'CONNOR, SEAN PATRICK O'MALLEY, ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF BOSTON.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(JENNINGS, RUFUS) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by HENRI MARCEL on behalf of FRANCIS J O'CONNOR, SEAN PATRICK O'MALLEY, ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF BOSTON (MARCEL, HENRI) |
|
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS J. DEASEY on behalf of FRANCIS J O'CONNOR, SEAN PATRICK O'MALLEY, ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF BOSTON (DEASEY, FRANCIS) |
|
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by RUFUS A. JENNINGS on behalf of FRANCIS J O'CONNOR, SEAN PATRICK O'MALLEY, ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF BOSTON (JENNINGS, RUFUS) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE OF FILING IN THIRD CIRCUIT filed by FRIEDRICH LU with Exhibit.(mbh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Summons Issued as to MERRICK GARLAND, JUAN R SANCHEZ, UNITED STATES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF on 3/22/2024, EMAILED TO US ATTORNEY. (sg) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Summons Issued as to ROBERTO RONQUILLO, JR, ABM JANITORIAL SERVICES NORTHEAST, INC., MARGARET M. ABRUZESE, PETER W. AGNES, JR, ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., ALLISON D BURROUGHS, CHRISTOPHER M. ANDERSON, ANDERSON & KREIGER LLP, GERALD T. ANGELIN, ANNE TAYLOR, EVELYN ARANA-ORTIZ, JOSE ARAUJO, GREGORY R ARCHIBALD, ZAMAWA ARENAS, ARENTFOX SCHIFF, ARMADA WASTE MA II, LLC, PATRICIA ARMSTRONG, BAIRD HOLM LLP, CHARLES D. BAKER, JR, ANNAPURNA BALAKRISHNA, WARREN T BAMFORD, DAVID J BARRON, BAY COVE HUMAN RESOURCES, INC., ANNETTE C. BENEDETTO, GEORGE A. BERMAN, JOSEPH S. BERMAN, MARK N. BERMAN, ANNA BLACKBURNE-RIGSBY, DOMINIC BLUE, BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF MASSACHUSETTS, INC., LESTER BLUMBERG, JENNIFER C BOAL, JOSEPH R BONAVOLONTA, RUTH BONSIGNORE, JESSE M. BOODOO, BOSTON COLLEGE, BOSTON HOUSING AUTHORITY, BOSTON PUBLIC HEALTH COMMISSION, BOSTON SCHOOL COMMITTEE, MARGOT BOTSFORD, MICHAEL BOUDIN, WILLARD J. BOULTER, III, BOWDITCH & DEWEY, LLP, BOWDITCH AND DEWEY, LLP, MARIANNE B BOWLER, COLIN R. BOYLE, BOYLE SHAUGHNESSY LAW PC, DENNIS BRADBURY, JILL M. BRADLEY, RONALD L. BRANDT, AMY B. BRATSKEIR, MARIE BREEN, DOUGLAS S BROOKS, DOUGLAS S. BROWN, SCOTT P. BROWN, ROBERT M. BUCHANAN, JR, KIMBERLY S BUDD, MICHAEL H. BUNIS, ANDREA J CAMPBELL, LEVIN H CAMPBELL, BEVERLY J. CANNONE, CAPITOL GRILLE OF BOSTON, INC, CAPITOL WASTE SERVICES, INC., MICHAEL E. CAPUANO, DAVID J. CARCAM0, PAULA M. CAREY, DAVID CARRASCO, CRYSTAL CARRINGTON, JAMES CARROLL, ROSEMARY CASHMAN, JULIO A CASTILLO, CASTLE SQUARE TENANTS ORGANIZATION, KATHLEEN M. CAWLEY, JEFFREY C CECIL, CHING-JU CHANG, SHAUGHNESSY CHARBONNEAU, LYNN R CHARYTAN, CHOATE HALL & STEWART, JODI CHOEN, DAVID CHRISTINI, CHRISTOPHER J NOONE, JULIE CIOLLO, CITY OF WOBURN, JAMES R. CLARKE, CLASSIC CLEANING CO, INC, JOHN C. CLOUGH, CMBG3 LAW LLC., JIA M COBB, GINA COHEN, COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, WILBUR E. COMMODORE, MARC C. CONCANNON, MARK C. CONCANNON, DANIEL F. CONLEY, RUSSELL F. CONN, CONN KAVANAUGH ROSENTHAL PEISCH & FORD LLP, KATHRYN COOK, ROBERT J CORDY, CORRIGAN JOHNSON & TUTOR, PA, COUNSEL JACQUELINE L ALLEN;, PAMELA COVENEY, JUDITH CA COWIN, MICHAEL A COX, ROBERT D. COX, JR, DANIEL G. CROMACK, JOSEPH V. CRONIN, RICHARD CURTIN, ELSPETH B CYPHER, LYNDA D'ANDREA, WILLIAM J. DAILEY, III, BRIAN G. DALTON, MARK P. DALY, DANA FARBER CANCER INSTITUTE, EDWARD F. DAVIS, III, KEVIN DAVIS, TRACY ANNE DAVIS, YUDELKYS DE LOS SANTOS, LAURA DEBONIS, JUDITH G DEIN, WILLIAM D. DELAHUNT, MARIA E. DELUZIO, SCOTT K DEMELLO, DENISE J CASPER, FRANK DEPAOLA, PAUL DEPAULO, DONNA M. DEPRISCO, RICHARD C DESLAURIERS, JODY L GOODMAN DINAN, DISABILITY LAW CENTER, MARK C DIVINCENZO, MATTHEW DIVRIS, DLC MANAGEMENT CORP., DAVID T. DONNELLY, DAVID T DONNELLY, SUSAN M. DONNELLY, DONNELLY CONROY & GELHAAR, ERIC T DONOVAN, LYNDIA DOWNIE, IRWIN DRIGGS, CAROLINE O. DRISCOLL, JEFFREY DRISCOLL, ANNA DRONZEK, EILEEN R. DUFF, FERNANDE RV DUFFLY, JOHN EGAN, SANDRA L. EHLINGER, THOMAS M. ELCOCK, EMINA ZAGANJORI KELLY, BRENDAN ENGLAND, JOHN T ENGLANDER, WILLIAM ENRIGHT, ERIKA GEETTER, PAUL FRANCIS EVANS, JR, WILLIAM B EVANS, F DENNIS SAYLOR IV, JOHN A. FAHEY, FREDERICK E. FAIRFIELD, JR, HEATHER L. FAIRFIELD, HEATHER LYNN FAIRFIELD, FAIRFIELD REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT CORP, FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORP., ABIGAIL L. FEE, PETER D. FEEHERRY, JOEL J. FELDMAN, RAUL FERNANDEZ, JOSEPH C. FERREIRA, PHOEBE FISCHER-GROBAN, CHUCK FLAHERTY, JOEL FLORES, FOR THE RECORD, INC., BENJAMIN FRANCO, TIMOTHY FRATES, JESSICA L. FRATTAROLI, DAVID FREDETTE, STEPHEN D. FULLER, FULLER ROSENBERG PALMER & BELIVEAU LLP, CAROL FULP, G&M COURT REPORTERS, LTD, G4S SECURE SOLUTIONS (USA), INC, BERTHE M. GAINES, SCOTT D. GALVIN, WILLIAM F GALVIN, MARIELENA GAMBOA-RUIZ, MICHAEL S. GARDENER, JOHN E. GARLAND, MERRICK GARLAND, SAMUEL R. GATES, BRENDAN J. GAUGHAN, THOMAS GAUGHAN, III, FRANK M GAZIANO, PETER GELHAAR, GUSTAVO A GELPI, KATHLEEN M. GENOVA, JASON CHAKA GEORGE, SERGE GEORGES, JR, NANCY GERTNER, ANDREW GHOBRIAL, JAMES P. GIANELLIS, DEIRDRE M. GIBLIN, MICHAEL J. GILL, JORDANA B. GLASGOW, KAREN A. GLASGOW, WAYNE P. GODIN, MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG, BENJAMIN K. GOLDEN, BENJAMIN GOLDEN, DAVID A. GOLDMAN, JULIE GOLDMAN, HERMAYNE GORDON, MATTHEW M GRAVES, STEPHEN S. GRAY, JOHN M GREANEY, MARK V. GREEN, BERNARD GREENE, LESLIE MILLER GREENSPAN, CAROL A. GRIFFIN, WILLIAM G GROSS, ANTHONY GULLY, DAVID F. HADLOCK, ANDREW J. HAILE, JOHN T. HAILER, KARLENE HALL, ROBERT R. HAMEL, JR, HAMEL MARCIN DUNN REARDON & SHEA PC, HEATHER HAMILTON, MARK P. HARMON, EDWARD F HARRINGTON, TIMOTHY J HARRINGTON, L. SCOTT HARSHBARGER, CYNTHIA B. HARTMAN, JAHAD HASAN, DAVE HASSAN, HASSAN & REARDON, PC, KEVIN R HAYDEN, MAURA T HEALEY, MARGARET HEGARTY, NANCY S. HELLER, MAURA A. HENNIGAN, GERALDINE S HINES, MARK A HIPPLE, HIRSCH ROBERTS WEINSTEIN LLP, DANIEL J. HOGAN, PATI A. HOLORAN, THOMAS M HOOPES, STEPHEN HORGAN, THOMAS C. HORGAN, ALYCIA HORN, ANDREW R. HORNE, JEFFREY R HOWARD, BRIAN P HUDAK, GEORGE HULME, MARY E. HURLEY, CHRISTOPHER A. IANNELLA, INDIRA TALWANI, RODERICK L IRELAND, ISI SOFTWARE, JACKSON LEWIS PC, DARON L. JANIS, JENNIFER M STAPLES, JESSS SON, JOHN DOE, JOHN HANCOCK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CO, JOHN B. JOHNSON, JON DAVID LEVIN, SIAN JONES, JONES & FULLER REPORTING, INC, JOHN JORRITSMA, JOSEPH HERLIHY, JOSEPH M LEE, MYONG J JOUN, JOHN J. JOY, JPMORGAN CHASE, ROBERT L. JUBINVILLE, SCOTT L KAFKER, KENNETH W KAISER, ABDUL KAMARA, ZIAD KAMEL, KAREN FRINK WOLF, PAUL V KASTNER, KASTNER REALTY TRUST, BENJAMIN KATZ, PAUL S. KAWAI, WILLIAM J KAYATTA, JR, PETER KEENAN, JAMIE LEWIS KEITH, BRIAN T KELLY, BRIAN KELLY, ELIZABETH H. KELLY, SALLY A. KELLY, MICHAEL KENDALL, KEVIN P. KERR, CAMERON F KERRY, JOHN F. KERRY, C. JEFFREY KINDER, JOSEPH A. KING, MELVIN KLECHNER, JULIA E. KOBICK, PAUL LA CAMERA, KAREN LAFRAZIA, LANCE E WALKER, BRIAN LANG, JOSEPH N LAPLANTE, DARYL J. LAPP, PAUL N LAPROCINA, JR, SHEILA F LAWN, LAWRENCE H SUMMERS, DANIEL M. LEE, FRED LEE, DENNIS LEHANE, LEIGH CAMPBELL JOYCE, BARBARA A LENK, LEO T SOROKIN, MICHAEL J LEPIZZERA, LEPIZZERA AND LAPROCINA, MARCY C. LEVINGTON, JOSHUA S LEVY, ROBERT L. LEWIS, LIBBY HOOPES BROOKS AND MULVEY, PC, MELANIE LIMA, LIMITED TO ENDODONTICS, INC, KERMIT V LIPEZ, VINCENT B LISI, DEBRA ANN LIVINGSTON, JEFFREY A LOCKE, LOCKE LORD LLP, LONGWOOD SECURITY SERVICES, INC, DAVID A LOWY, KENNETH W. LUKE, ERIK LUND, SANDRA L LYNCH, STEPHEN F. LYNCH, CHARLES LYONS, ROY MACKENZIE, DAVID S. MACKEY, KEVIN MICHAEL MAGOON, NANCY MAHAN, PAUL MAHONEY, MARIA ROBLES, EDWARD J MARKEY, CHRISTINA MARSHALL, MARGARET H MARSHALL, NANCY MARTINS, MASSACHUSETTS BAY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, MAUREEN FEENEY, ROSLYNN R MAUSKOPF, DEAN MAZZARELLA, AMY M. MCCALLEN, ANDREA W. MCCARTHY, IAN MCCLAIN, MICHAEL MCCORMACK, MCCULLOUGH, STIEVATER & POLVERE, DONNA MCDONOUGH, DOUGLAS M MCGARRAH, OMAR MCGOVERN, WILLIAM P. MCGOVERN, JASON MCGRANE, ROBERT J. MCKENNA, DANIEL J. MCKENZIE, DAVID S. MCMAHON, MATT VP MCTYGUE, MELICK & PORTER, EVAN MEREDITH, METHUNION MANOR COOPERATIVE CORP., MICHAEL B HALPIN, CAROL A. MICI, SUSAN MILLS, MINTZ LEVIN COHN FERRIS GLOVSKY & POPEO, PC, CHRISTOPHER R. MIRICK, LAUREN M. MITCHELL, WALTER T MITCHELL, CHARLES K. MONE, GERALD F. MOORE, MORGAN, BROWN & JOY LLP, ERICA MORIN, MORRISON MAHONEY LLP, MPD LAW, LLC., ELIZABETH N MULVEY, RACHEL E. MUNOZ, JOSLIN HAM MURPHY, ROBERT MURPHY, SUSAN D. MURPHY, MURPHY & RILEY, REBECCA MURRAY, MARIO MYRTHIL, McNEES WALLACE & NURICK LLC, MARYGRACE NEAL, NIXON PEABODY LLP, GARETH W. NOTIS, ANDREA F. NUCIFORO, JR, KIMBERLY C. NUZSUM, DAVID J. O'CONNOR, FRANCIS J O'CONNOR, MICHAEL O'CONNOR, NICOLE M. O'CONNOR, EUGENE L. O'FLAHERTY, SEAN PATRICK O'MALLEY, GEORGE A O'TOOLE, JR, KATHLEEN M O'TOOLE, ALBERT OGISTE, BISOLA OJIKUTU, CARMEN M ORTIZ, TYLER OSTHOLTHOFF, ANTHONY S. OWENS, COLEEN PALMISANO, WHITNEY C PASTERNACK, PATTI B SARIS, MARK ALAN PERKINS, PETER H VELYVIS, MARILYN M. PETITTO DEVANEY, CHRISTOPHER E PHILLIPS, MARY PICCIRILLI, NINA PICKERING-COOK, LAWRENCE PIERCE, PINE STREET INN, STEVE POFTAK, STEPHANIE POLLACK, MATTHEW P. POPPEL, MICHAEL J. POWER, ROBERT P POWERS, JOHN T. PRESCOBB, PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE, AYANNA PRESSLEY, PRINCE LOBEL TYE LLP., JOHN P. PULEO, PURCHASE AMERICA, INC., CHRISTOPHER O. QUAYLE, ROBERT L. QUAYLE, LUIS MANUEL RAMIREZ, CHARLES W. RANKIN, BATOOL RAZA, MARY REGAN, LEO RAFAEL REIF, THOMAS F. REILLY, JOHN REINSTEIN, JULIANA DEHAAN RICE, SHELLEY M RICHMOND JOSEPH, KEVIN M. RIORDAN, R. BRANDON RIOS, RICARDO BRANDON RIOS, ANTHONY J. RIZZO, THOMAS G. ROBBINS, ROBERT A BROWN, ROBERT M FARRELL, ROBERT W IULIANO, SCOTT A. ROBERTS, RACHAEL E ROLLINS, ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF BOSTON, ROBERTO RONQUILLO, JR, JEFFREY B. RUDMAN, BYRON RUSHING, RYAN A MACLEAN, PATRICIA RYLE, SAINT FRANCIS HOUSE, INC, KENNETH W. SALINGER, DENISE O. SALTERS, RAMAN SAMRA, CHRISTOPHER SAMUEL, JUAN R SANCHEZ, SARAH A THORNTON, ANGELO M. SCACCIA, KAREN SCHULTZ, BRUCE M SELYA, HAROLD SHAW, ROBERT L. SHEKETOFF, SARAH B. SINGER, ELEANOR SINNOTT, WILLIAM F. SINNOTT, SONIA L. SKINNER, SARA SLYMON, DIANE SMITH, MARTHA B SOSMAN, FRANCIS X SPINA, WILLIAM SPRAGUE, SARAH ST PIERRE, JOSEPH STANTON, STAPES INC, JENNIFER STAPLES, STAR MARKET, INC., LAWRENCE M. STARR, RICHARD G STEARNS, KURT G. STENHOUSE, DONALD K STERN, STEVEN M CORLISS, WILLARD STIEVATER, CHRISTOPHER STORM, SUFFOLK COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT, CATHERINE E. SULLIVAN, DANIEL P. SULLIVAN, DENNIS F. SULLIVAN, JANE A. SULLIVAN, JOSEPH SULLIVAN, MICAHEL J SULLIVAN, JAMES L. SULTAN, CHRIS SUMMA, MARK H. SUMMERVILLE, SUPREME JUDICIAL COURT, ISABEL SWEET, STEVEN TANKLE, BETSY TAYLOR, DAVID TAYLOR, GREGG TAYLOR, LISA A. TENEROWICZ, TENT CITY CORP., THE GEORGETOWN COMPANY LLC, THE TOWNE LAW FIRM, PC, THECANTON CORP, ANN THOMAS, O ROGERIEE THOMPSON, WALTER F. TIMILTY, ORLANDO TIRELLA, JOHN L. TOBIN, TOMMASINO & TOMMASINO, STEVEN W. TOMPKINSW, TOWN OF BROOKLINE, ROSEMARY A. TRAINI, LIZA J. TRAN, TRUSTEES OF BOSTON PUBLIC LIBRARY, TRUSTEES OF BOSTON UNIVERSITY, TRUSTEES OF TUFTS COLLEGE;, TS LAND TRUST LLC, JOE H TUCKER, JR, TUCKER LAW GROUP, LLC, THOMAS A. TURCO, III, JEFFREY C. TURK, PAUL TUTTLE, A. RAYMOND TYE, U MASS MEMORIAL HEALTH CARE, INC, BOODIE UGNUMBA, ULTIMATE PARKING, INC, UNITED STATES, ACHESON H. VALLAGHAN, MICHAEL VAN DANG, JOHN VANSCOYOC, CHRISTOPHER VAZQUEZ, BRIAN P. VOKE, SARA A. WALKER, ANTHONY WALROND, MARTIN J. WALSH, MARK WANG, STANLEY WANG, ELIZABETH WARREN, DAVID WATERFALL, BRIAN F WELSH, DALILA ARGAEZ WENDLANDT, JOHN WHEATLEY, MARY-LOUISE WHITE, WHITE & CASE, LLP, WILBERT WILSON, JULIA WILDER, HERBERT P WILKINS, WILLIAM P LEAHY, SHAWN A. WILLIAMS, WILLIE BUTLERM, KARYN M. WILSON, JEFFREY M. WINIK, WINNCOMPANIES, MARK L WOLF, CATHERINE O'HAGAN WOLFE, LENA WONG, PATTY WONG-MURPHY, DOUGLAS P WOODLOCK, MARIA YANAKOPOULOS, YIELD10 BIOSCIENCE, JANE E YOUNG, ROBERT GEORGE YOUNG, II, WILLIAM G YOUNG, JOHN P. ZANINI, MONIKA ZARSKI, RYA W ZOBEL, JESUS __. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF on 4/2/2024 (sg) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() First Amended Complaint against ROBERTO RONQUILLO, JR, ABM JANITORIAL SERVICES NORTHEAST, INC., MARGARET M. ABRUZESE, PETER W. AGNES, JR, ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., ALLISON D BURROUGHS, CHRISTOPHER M. ANDERSON, ANDERSON & KREIGER LLP, GERALD T. ANGELIN, ANNE TAYLOR, EVELYN ARANA-ORTIZ, JOSE ARAUJO, GREGORY R ARCHIBALD, ZAMAWA ARENAS, ARENTFOX SCHIFF, ARMADA WASTE MA II, LLC, PATRICIA ARMSTRONG, BAIRD HOLM LLP, CHARLES D. BAKER, JR, ANNAPURNA BALAKRISHNA, WARREN T BAMFORD, DAVID J BARRON, BAY COVE HUMAN RESOURCES, INC., ANNETTE C. BENEDETTO, GEORGE A. BERMAN, JOSEPH S. BERMAN, MARK N. BERMAN, ANNA BLACKBURNE-RIGSBY, DOMINIC BLUE, BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF MASSACHUSETTS, INC., LESTER BLUMBERG, JENNIFER C BOAL, JOSEPH R BONAVOLONTA, RUTH BONSIGNORE, JESSE M. BOODOO, BOSTON COLLEGE, BOSTON HOUSING AUTHORITY, BOSTON PUBLIC HEALTH COMMISSION, BOSTON SCHOOL COMMITTEE, MARGOT BOTSFORD, MICHAEL BOUDIN, WILLARD J. BOULTER, III, BOWDITCH & DEWEY, LLP, BOWDITCH AND DEWEY, LLP, MARIANNE B BOWLER, COLIN R. BOYLE, BOYLE SHAUGHNESSY LAW PC, DENNIS BRADBURY, JILL M. BRADLEY, RONALD L. BRANDT, AMY B. BRATSKEIR, MARIE BREEN, DOUGLAS S BROOKS, DOUGLAS S. BROWN, ROBERT M. BUCHANAN, JR, KIMBERLY S BUDD, MICHAEL H. BUNIS, ANDREA J CAMPBELL, LEVIN H CAMPBELL, BEVERLY J. CANNONE, CAPITOL GRILLE OF BOSTON, INC, CAPITOL WASTE SERVICES, INC., PAULA M. CAREY, DAVID CARRASCO, CRYSTAL CARRINGTON, JAMES CARROLL, ROSEMARY CASHMAN, JULIO A CASTILLO, CASTLE SQUARE TENANTS ORGANIZATION, KATHLEEN M. CAWLEY, JEFFREY C CECIL, CHING-JU CHANG, SHAUGHNESSY CHARBONNEAU, LYNN R CHARYTAN, CHOATE HALL & STEWART, JODI CHOEN, DAVID CHRISTINI, CHRISTOPHER J NOONE, JULIE CIOLLO, JAMES R. CLARKE, CLASSIC CLEANING CO, INC, JOHN C. CLOUGH, CMBG3 LAW LLC., JIA M COBB, GINA COHEN, COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, WILBUR E. COMMODORE, MARC C. CONCANNON, MARK C. CONCANNON, DANIEL F. CONLEY, RUSSELL F. CONN, CONN KAVANAUGH ROSENTHAL PEISCH & FORD LLP, KATHRYN COOK, ROBERT J CORDY, CORRIGAN JOHNSON & TUTOR, PA, COUNSEL JACQUELINE L ALLEN;, PAMELA COVENEY, JUDITH CA COWIN, MICHAEL A COX, ROBERT D. COX, JR, DANIEL G. CROMACK, JOSEPH V. CRONIN, RICHARD CURTIN, ELSPETH B CYPHER, LYNDA D'ANDREA, WILLIAM J. DAILEY, III, BRIAN G. DALTON, MARK P. DALY, DANA FARBER CANCER INSTITUTE, EDWARD F. DAVIS, III, KEVIN DAVIS, YUDELKYS DE LOS SANTOS, LAURA DEBONIS, JUDITH G DEIN, MARIA E. DELUZIO, SCOTT K DEMELLO, DENISE J CASPER, FRANK DEPAOLA, PAUL DEPAULO, DONNA M. DEPRISCO, RICHARD C DESLAURIERS, JODY L GOODMAN DINAN, DISABILITY LAW CENTER, MARK C DIVINCENZO, MATTHEW DIVRIS, DLC MANAGEMENT CORP., DAVID T. DONNELLY, DAVID T DONNELLY, SUSAN M. DONNELLY, DONNELLY CONROY & GELHAAR, ERIC T DONOVAN, LYNDIA DOWNIE, IRWIN DRIGGS, CAROLINE O. DRISCOLL, JEFFREY DRISCOLL, ANNA DRONZEK, EILEEN R. DUFF, FERNANDE RV DUFFLY, JOHN EGAN, SANDRA L. EHLINGER, THOMAS M. ELCOCK, EMINA ZAGANJORI KELLY, BRENDAN ENGLAND, JOHN T ENGLANDER, WILLIAM ENRIGHT, ERIKA GEETTER, PAUL FRANCIS EVANS, JR, WILLIAM B EVANS, F DENNIS SAYLOR IV, JOHN A. FAHEY, FREDERICK E. FAIRFIELD, JR, HEATHER L. FAIRFIELD, HEATHER LYNN FAIRFIELD, FAIRFIELD REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT CORP, FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORP., ABIGAIL L. FEE, PETER D. FEEHERRY, JOEL J. FELDMAN, RAUL FERNANDEZ, JOSEPH C. FERREIRA, PHOEBE FISCHER-GROBAN, JOEL FLORES, FOR THE RECORD, INC., BENJAMIN FRANCO, TIMOTHY FRATES, JESSICA L. FRATTAROLI, DAVID FREDETTE, STEPHEN D. FULLER, FULLER ROSENBERG PALMER & BELIVEAU LLP, CAROL FULP, G&M COURT REPORTERS, LTD, G4S SECURE SOLUTIONS (USA), INC, BERTHE M. GAINES, WILLIAM F GALVIN, MARIELENA GAMBOA-RUIZ, MICHAEL S. GARDENER, JOHN E. GARLAND, MERRICK GARLAND, SAMUEL R. GATES, BRENDAN J. GAUGHAN, THOMAS GAUGHAN, III, FRANK M GAZIANO, PETER GELHAAR, GUSTAVO A GELPI, KATHLEEN M. GENOVA, JASON CHAKA GEORGE, SERGE GEORGES, JR, NANCY GERTNER, ANDREW GHOBRIAL, JAMES P. GIANELLIS, DEIRDRE M. GIBLIN, MICHAEL J. GILL, JORDANA B. GLASGOW, KAREN A. GLASGOW, WAYNE P. GODIN, BENJAMIN K. GOLDEN, BENJAMIN GOLDEN, DAVID A. GOLDMAN, JULIE GOLDMAN, MATTHEW M GRAVES, STEPHEN S. GRAY, JOHN M GREANEY, MARK V. GREEN, BERNARD GREENE, LESLIE MILLER GREENSPAN, CAROL A. GRIFFIN, WILLIAM G GROSS, ANTHONY GULLY, DAVID F. HADLOCK, ANDREW J. HAILE, JOHN T. HAILER, KARLENE HALL, ROBERT R. HAMEL, JR, HAMEL MARCIN DUNN REARDON & SHEA PC, HEATHER HAMILTON, MARK P. HARMON, EDWARD F HARRINGTON, TIMOTHY J HARRINGTON, CYNTHIA B. HARTMAN, JAHAD HASAN, DAVE HASSAN, HASSAN & REARDON, PC, KEVIN R HAYDEN, MAURA T HEALEY, MARGARET HEGARTY, NANCY S. HELLER, MAURA A. HENNIGAN, GERALDINE S HINES, MARK A HIPPLE, HIRSCH ROBERTS WEINSTEIN LLP, DANIEL J. HOGAN, PATI A. HOLORAN, THOMAS M HOOPES, STEPHEN HORGAN, THOMAS C. HORGAN, ALYCIA HORN, ANDREW R. HORNE, JEFFREY R HOWARD, BRIAN P HUDAK, GEORGE HULME, MARY E. HURLEY, CHRISTOPHER A. IANNELLA, INDIRA TALWANI, RODERICK L IRELAND, ISI SOFTWARE, JACKSON LEWIS PC, DARON L. JANIS, JENNIFER M STAPLES, JESSS SON, JOHN DOE, JOHN HANCOCK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CO, JOHN B. JOHNSON, JON DAVID LEVIN, SIAN JONES, JONES & FULLER REPORTING, INC, JOHN JORRITSMA, JOSEPH HERLIHY, JOSEPH M LEE, MYONG J JOUN, JOHN J. JOY, JPMORGAN CHASE, ROBERT L. JUBINVILLE, SCOTT L KAFKER, KENNETH W KAISER, ABDUL KAMARA, ZIAD KAMEL, KAREN FRINK WOLF, PAUL V KASTNER, KASTNER REALTY TRUST, BENJAMIN KATZ, PAUL S. KAWAI, WILLIAM J KAYATTA, JR, PETER KEENAN, JAMIE LEWIS KEITH, BRIAN T KELLY, BRIAN KELLY, ELIZABETH H. KELLY, SALLY A. KELLY, MICHAEL KENDALL, KEVIN P. KERR, CAMERON F KERRY, C. JEFFREY KINDER, JOSEPH A. KING, MELVIN KLECHNER, JULIA E. KOBICK, PAUL LA CAMERA, KAREN LAFRAZIA, LANCE E WALKER, BRIAN LANG, JOSEPH N LAPLANTE, DARYL J. LAPP, PAUL N LAPROCINA, JR, SHEILA F LAWN, LAWRENCE H SUMMERS, DANIEL M. LEE, FRED LEE, DENNIS LEHANE, LEIGH CAMPBELL JOYCE, BARBARA A LENK, LEO T SOROKIN, MICHAEL J LEPIZZERA, LEPIZZERA AND LAPROCINA, JOSHUA S LEVY, ROBERT L. LEWIS, LIBBY HOOPES BROOKS AND MULVEY, PC, MELANIE LIMA, LIMITED TO ENDODONTICS, INC, KERMIT V LIPEZ, VINCENT B LISI, DEBRA ANN LIVINGSTON, JEFFREY A LOCKE, LOCKE LORD LLP, LONGWOOD SECURITY SERVICES, INC, DAVID A LOWY, KENNETH W. LUKE, ERIK LUND, SANDRA L LYNCH, CHARLES LYONS, ROY MACKENZIE, DAVID S. MACKEY, KEVIN MICHAEL MAGOON, NANCY MAHAN, PAUL MAHONEY, MARIA ROBLES, EDWARD J MARKEY, CHRISTINA MARSHALL, MARGARET H MARSHALL, NANCY MARTINS, MASSACHUSETTS BAY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, MAUREEN FEENEY, ROSLYNN R MAUSKOPF, DEAN MAZZARELLA, AMY M. MCCALLEN, ANDREA W. MCCARTHY, IAN MCCLAIN, MICHAEL MCCORMACK, MCCULLOUGH, STIEVATER & POLVERE, DONNA MCDONOUGH, DOUGLAS M MCGARRAH, OMAR MCGOVERN, WILLIAM P. MCGOVERN, JASON MCGRANE, ROBERT J. MCKENNA, DANIEL J. MCKENZIE, DAVID S. MCMAHON, MATT VP MCTYGUE, MELICK & PORTER, EVAN MEREDITH, METHUNION MANOR COOPERATIVE CORP., MICHAEL B HALPIN, CAROL A. MICI, SUSAN MILLS, MINTZ LEVIN COHN FERRIS GLOVSKY & POPEO, PC, CHRISTOPHER R. MIRICK, LAUREN M. MITCHELL, WALTER T MITCHELL, CHARLES K. MONE, GERALD F. MOORE, MORGAN, BROWN & JOY LLP, ERICA MORIN, MORRISON MAHONEY LLP, MPD LAW, LLC., ELIZABETH N MULVEY, RACHEL E. MUNOZ, JOSLIN HAM MURPHY, ROBERT MURPHY, SUSAN D. MURPHY, MURPHY & RILEY, REBECCA MURRAY, MARIO MYRTHIL, McNEES WALLACE & NURICK LLC, MARYGRACE NEAL, NIXON PEABODY LLP, GARETH W. NOTIS, ANDREA F. NUCIFORO, JR, KIMBERLY C. NUZSUM, DAVID J. O'CONNOR, FRANCIS J O'CONNOR, MICHAEL O'CONNOR, NICOLE M. O'CONNOR, EUGENE L. O'FLAHERTY, SEAN PATRICK O'MALLEY, GEORGE A O'TOOLE, JR, KATHLEEN M O'TOOLE, ALBERT OGISTE, BISOLA OJIKUTU, CARMEN M ORTIZ, TYLER OSTHOLTHOFF, ANTHONY S. OWENS, COLEEN PALMISANO, WHITNEY C PASTERNACK, PATTI B SARIS, MARK ALAN PERKINS, PETER H VELYVIS, MARILYN M. PETITTO DEVANEY, CHRISTOPHER E PHILLIPS, MARY PICCIRILLI, NINA PICKERING-COOK, LAWRENCE PIERCE, PINE STREET INN, STEVE POFTAK, STEPHANIE POLLACK, MATTHEW P. POPPEL, MICHAEL J. POWER, ROBERT P POWERS, JOHN T. PRESCOBB, PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE, PRINCE LOBEL TYE LLP., JOHN P. PULEO, PURCHASE AMERICA, INC., ROBERT L. QUAYLE, LUIS MANUEL RAMIREZ, CHARLES W. RANKIN, BATOOL RAZA, MARY REGAN, LEO RAFAEL REIF, JOHN REINSTEIN, JULIANA DEHAAN RICE, SHELLEY M RICHMOND JOSEPH, KEVIN M. RIORDAN, R. BRANDON RIOS, RICARDO BRANDON RIOS, ANTHONY J. RIZZO, THOMAS G. ROBBINS, ROBERT A BROWN, ROBERT M FARRELL, ROBERT W IULIANO, SCOTT A. ROBERTS, RACHAEL E ROLLINS, ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF BOSTON, ROBERTO RONQUILLO, JR, JEFFREY B. RUDMAN, BYRON RUSHING, RYAN A MACLEAN, PATRICIA RYLE, SAINT FRANCIS HOUSE, INC, KENNETH W. SALINGER, DENISE O. SALTERS, RAMAN SAMRA, CHRISTOPHER SAMUEL, JUAN R SANCHEZ, SARAH A THORNTON, ANGELO M. SCACCIA, KAREN SCHULTZ, BRUCE M SELYA, HAROLD SHAW, ROBERT L. SHEKETOFF, SARAH B. SINGER, ELEANOR SINNOTT, WILLIAM F. SINNOTT, SONIA L. SKINNER, SARA SLYMON, DIANE SMITH, MARTHA B SOSMAN, FRANCIS X SPINA, WILLIAM SPRAGUE, SARAH ST PIERRE, JOSEPH STANTON, STAPES INC, JENNIFER STAPLES, STAR MARKET, INC., LAWRENCE M. STARR, RICHARD G STEARNS, KURT G. STENHOUSE, DONALD K STERN, STEVEN M CORLISS, WILLARD STIEVATER, CHRISTOPHER STORM, SUFFOLK COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT, CATHERINE E. SULLIVAN, DANIEL P. SULLIVAN, DENNIS F. SULLIVAN, JANE A. SULLIVAN, JOSEPH SULLIVAN, MICAHEL J SULLIVAN, JAMES L. SULTAN, CHRIS SUMMA, MARK H. SUMMERVILLE, SUPREME JUDICIAL COURT, ISABEL SWEET, STEVEN TANKLE, BETSY TAYLOR, DAVID TAYLOR, GREGG TAYLOR, LISA A. TENEROWICZ, TENT CITY CORP., THE GEORGETOWN COMPANY LLC, THE TOWNE LAW FIRM, PC, THECANTON CORP, ANN THOMAS, O ROGERIEE THOMPSON, WALTER F. TIMILTY, ORLANDO TIRELLA, JOHN L. TOBIN, TOMMASINO & TOMMASINO, STEVEN W. TOMPKINSW, TOWN OF BROOKLINE, ROSEMARY A. TRAINI, LIZA J. TRAN, TRUSTEES OF BOSTON PUBLIC LIBRARY, TRUSTEES OF BOSTON UNIVERSITY, TRUSTEES OF TUFTS COLLEGE;, TS LAND TRUST LLC, JOE H TUCKER, JR, TUCKER LAW GROUP, LLC, THOMAS A. TURCO, III, JEFFREY C. TURK, PAUL TUTTLE, A. RAYMOND TYE, U MASS MEMORIAL HEALTH CARE, INC, BOODIE UGNUMBA, ULTIMATE PARKING, INC, UNITED STATES, ACHESON H. VALLAGHAN, MICHAEL VAN DANG, JOHN VANSCOYOC, CHRISTOPHER VAZQUEZ, BRIAN P. VOKE, SARA A. WALKER, ANTHONY WALROND, MARTIN J. WALSH, MARK WANG, STANLEY WANG, ELIZABETH WARREN, DAVID WATERFALL, BRIAN F WELSH, DALILA ARGAEZ WENDLANDT, JOHN WHEATLEY, WHITE & CASE, LLP, WILBERT WILSON, JULIA WILDER, HERBERT P WILKINS, WILLIAM P LEAHY, SHAWN A. WILLIAMS, WILLIE BUTLERM, KARYN M. WILSON, JEFFREY M. WINIK, WINNCOMPANIES, MARK L WOLF, CATHERINE O'HAGAN WOLFE, LENA WONG, PATTY WONG-MURPHY, DOUGLAS P WOODLOCK, MARIA YANAKOPOULOS, YIELD10 BIOSCIENCE, JANE E YOUNG, ROBERT GEORGE YOUNG, II, WILLIAM G YOUNG, JOHN P. ZANINI, MONIKA ZARSKI, RYA W ZOBEL, JESUS __, JOHN F. KERRY, SCOTT P. BROWN, MICHAEL E. CAPUANO, AYANNA PRESSLEY, STEPHEN F. LYNCH, WILLIAM D. DELAHUNT, MARY-LOUISE WHITE, MARCY C. LEVINGTON, L. SCOTT HARSHBARGER, THOMAS F. REILLY, MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG, SCOTT D. GALVIN, CITY OF WOBURN, CHUCK FLAHERTY, HERMAYNE GORDON, DAVID J. CARCAM0, TRACY ANNE DAVIS, CHRISTOPHER O. QUAYLE filed by FRIEDRICH LU.(mbh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES, EMAILED TO PRO SE. (sg) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Summons Issued as to ROBERTO RONQUILLO, JR, ABM JANITORIAL SERVICES NORTHEAST, INC., MARGARET M. ABRUZESE, PETER W. AGNES, JR, ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., ALLISON D BURROUGHS, CHRISTOPHER M. ANDERSON, ANDERSON & KREIGER LLP, GERALD T. ANGELIN, ANNE TAYLOR, EVELYN ARANA-ORTIZ, JOSE ARAUJO, GREGORY R ARCHIBALD, ZAMAWA ARENAS, ARENTFOX SCHIFF, ARMADA WASTE MA II, LLC, PATRICIA ARMSTRONG, BAIRD HOLM LLP, CHARLES D. BAKER, JR, ANNAPURNA BALAKRISHNA, WARREN T BAMFORD, DAVID J BARRON, BAY COVE HUMAN RESOURCES, INC., ANNETTE C. BENEDETTO, GEORGE A. BERMAN, JOSEPH S. BERMAN, MARK N. BERMAN, ANNA BLACKBURNE-RIGSBY, DOMINIC BLUE, BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF MASSACHUSETTS, INC., LESTER BLUMBERG, JENNIFER C BOAL, JOSEPH R BONAVOLONTA, RUTH BONSIGNORE, JESSE M. BOODOO, BOSTON COLLEGE, BOSTON HOUSING AUTHORITY, BOSTON PUBLIC HEALTH COMMISSION, BOSTON SCHOOL COMMITTEE, MARGOT BOTSFORD, MICHAEL BOUDIN, WILLARD J. BOULTER, III, BOWDITCH & DEWEY, LLP, BOWDITCH AND DEWEY, LLP, MARIANNE B BOWLER, COLIN R. BOYLE, BOYLE SHAUGHNESSY LAW PC, DENNIS BRADBURY, JILL M. BRADLEY, RONALD L. BRANDT, AMY B. BRATSKEIR, MARIE BREEN, DOUGLAS S BROOKS, DOUGLAS S. BROWN, ROBERT M. BUCHANAN, JR, KIMBERLY S BUDD, MICHAEL H. BUNIS, ANDREA J CAMPBELL, LEVIN H CAMPBELL, BEVERLY J. CANNONE, CAPITOL GRILLE OF BOSTON, INC, CAPITOL WASTE SERVICES, INC., PAULA M. CAREY, DAVID CARRASCO, CRYSTAL CARRINGTON, JAMES CARROLL, ROSEMARY CASHMAN, JULIO A CASTILLO, CASTLE SQUARE TENANTS ORGANIZATION, KATHLEEN M. CAWLEY, JEFFREY C CECIL, CHING-JU CHANG, SHAUGHNESSY CHARBONNEAU, LYNN R CHARYTAN, CHOATE HALL & STEWART, JODI CHOEN, DAVID CHRISTINI, CHRISTOPHER J NOONE, JULIE CIOLLO, JAMES R. CLARKE, CLASSIC CLEANING CO, INC, JOHN C. CLOUGH, CMBG3 LAW LLC., JIA M COBB, GINA COHEN, COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, WILBUR E. COMMODORE, MARC C. CONCANNON, MARK C. CONCANNON, DANIEL F. CONLEY, RUSSELL F. CONN, CONN KAVANAUGH ROSENTHAL PEISCH & FORD LLP, KATHRYN COOK, ROBERT J CORDY, CORRIGAN JOHNSON & TUTOR, PA, COUNSEL JACQUELINE L ALLEN;, PAMELA COVENEY, JUDITH CA COWIN, MICHAEL A COX, ROBERT D. COX, JR, DANIEL G. CROMACK, JOSEPH V. CRONIN, RICHARD CURTIN, ELSPETH B CYPHER, LYNDA D'ANDREA, WILLIAM J. DAILEY, III, BRIAN G. DALTON, MARK P. DALY, DANA FARBER CANCER INSTITUTE, EDWARD F. DAVIS, III, KEVIN DAVIS, YUDELKYS DE LOS SANTOS, LAURA DEBONIS, JUDITH G DEIN, MARIA E. DELUZIO, SCOTT K DEMELLO, DENISE J CASPER, FRANK DEPAOLA, PAUL DEPAULO, DONNA M. DEPRISCO, RICHARD C DESLAURIERS, JODY L GOODMAN DINAN, DISABILITY LAW CENTER, MARK C DIVINCENZO, MATTHEW DIVRIS, DLC MANAGEMENT CORP., DAVID T. DONNELLY, DAVID T DONNELLY, SUSAN M. DONNELLY, DONNELLY CONROY & GELHAAR, ERIC T DONOVAN, LYNDIA DOWNIE, IRWIN DRIGGS, CAROLINE O. DRISCOLL, JEFFREY DRISCOLL, ANNA DRONZEK, EILEEN R. DUFF, FERNANDE RV DUFFLY, JOHN EGAN, SANDRA L. EHLINGER, THOMAS M. ELCOCK, EMINA ZAGANJORI KELLY, BRENDAN ENGLAND, JOHN T ENGLANDER, WILLIAM ENRIGHT, ERIKA GEETTER, PAUL FRANCIS EVANS, JR, WILLIAM B EVANS, F DENNIS SAYLOR IV, JOHN A. FAHEY, FREDERICK E. FAIRFIELD, JR, HEATHER L. FAIRFIELD, HEATHER LYNN FAIRFIELD, FAIRFIELD REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT CORP, FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORP., ABIGAIL L. FEE, PETER D. FEEHERRY, JOEL J. FELDMAN, RAUL FERNANDEZ, JOSEPH C. FERREIRA, PHOEBE FISCHER-GROBAN, JOEL FLORES, FOR THE RECORD, INC., BENJAMIN FRANCO, TIMOTHY FRATES, JESSICA L. FRATTAROLI, DAVID FREDETTE, STEPHEN D. FULLER, FULLER ROSENBERG PALMER & BELIVEAU LLP, CAROL FULP, G&M COURT REPORTERS, LTD, G4S SECURE SOLUTIONS (USA), INC, BERTHE M. GAINES, WILLIAM F GALVIN, MARIELENA GAMBOA-RUIZ, MICHAEL S. GARDENER, JOHN E. GARLAND, SAMUEL R. GATES, BRENDAN J. GAUGHAN, THOMAS GAUGHAN, III, FRANK M GAZIANO, PETER GELHAAR, GUSTAVO A GELPI, KATHLEEN M. GENOVA, JASON CHAKA GEORGE, SERGE GEORGES, JR, NANCY GERTNER, ANDREW GHOBRIAL, JAMES P. GIANELLIS, DEIRDRE M. GIBLIN, MICHAEL J. GILL, JORDANA B. GLASGOW, KAREN A. GLASGOW, WAYNE P. GODIN, BENJAMIN K. GOLDEN, BENJAMIN GOLDEN, DAVID A. GOLDMAN, JULIE GOLDMAN, MATTHEW M GRAVES, STEPHEN S. GRAY, JOHN M GREANEY, MARK V. GREEN, BERNARD GREENE, LESLIE MILLER GREENSPAN, CAROL A. GRIFFIN, WILLIAM G GROSS, ANTHONY GULLY, DAVID F. HADLOCK, ANDREW J. HAILE, JOHN T. HAILER, KARLENE HALL, ROBERT R. HAMEL, JR, HAMEL MARCIN DUNN REARDON & SHEA PC, HEATHER HAMILTON, MARK P. HARMON, EDWARD F HARRINGTON, TIMOTHY J HARRINGTON, CYNTHIA B. HARTMAN, JAHAD HASAN, DAVE HASSAN, HASSAN & REARDON, PC, KEVIN R HAYDEN, MAURA T HEALEY, MARGARET HEGARTY, NANCY S. HELLER, MAURA A. HENNIGAN, GERALDINE S HINES, MARK A HIPPLE, HIRSCH ROBERTS WEINSTEIN LLP, DANIEL J. HOGAN, PATI A. HOLORAN, THOMAS M HOOPES, STEPHEN HORGAN, THOMAS C. HORGAN, ALYCIA HORN, ANDREW R. HORNE, JEFFREY R HOWARD, BRIAN P HUDAK, GEORGE HULME, MARY E. HURLEY, CHRISTOPHER A. IANNELLA, INDIRA TALWANI, RODERICK L IRELAND, ISI SOFTWARE, JACKSON LEWIS PC, DARON L. JANIS, JENNIFER M STAPLES, JESSS SON, JOHN DOE, JOHN HANCOCK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CO, JOHN B. JOHNSON, JON DAVID LEVIN, SIAN JONES, JONES & FULLER REPORTING, INC, JOHN JORRITSMA, JOSEPH HERLIHY, JOSEPH M LEE, MYONG J JOUN, JOHN J. JOY, JPMORGAN CHASE, ROBERT L. JUBINVILLE, SCOTT L KAFKER, KENNETH W KAISER, ABDUL KAMARA, ZIAD KAMEL, KAREN FRINK WOLF, PAUL V KASTNER, KASTNER REALTY TRUST, BENJAMIN KATZ, PAUL S. KAWAI, WILLIAM J KAYATTA, JR, PETER KEENAN, JAMIE LEWIS KEITH, BRIAN T KELLY, BRIAN KELLY, ELIZABETH H. KELLY, SALLY A. KELLY, MICHAEL KENDALL, KEVIN P. KERR, CAMERON F KERRY, C. JEFFREY KINDER, JOSEPH A. KING, MELVIN KLECHNER, JULIA E. KOBICK, PAUL LA CAMERA, KAREN LAFRAZIA, LANCE E WALKER, BRIAN LANG, JOSEPH N LAPLANTE, DARYL J. LAPP, PAUL N LAPROCINA, JR, SHEILA F LAWN, LAWRENCE H SUMMERS, DANIEL M. LEE, FRED LEE, DENNIS LEHANE, LEIGH CAMPBELL JOYCE, BARBARA A LENK, LEO T SOROKIN, MICHAEL J LEPIZZERA, LEPIZZERA AND LAPROCINA, JOSHUA S LEVY, ROBERT L. LEWIS, LIBBY HOOPES BROOKS AND MULVEY, PC, MELANIE LIMA, LIMITED TO ENDODONTICS, INC, KERMIT V LIPEZ, VINCENT B LISI, DEBRA ANN LIVINGSTON, JEFFREY A LOCKE, LOCKE LORD LLP, LONGWOOD SECURITY SERVICES, INC, DAVID A LOWY, KENNETH W. LUKE, ERIK LUND, SANDRA L LYNCH, CHARLES LYONS, ROY MACKENZIE, DAVID S. MACKEY, KEVIN MICHAEL MAGOON, NANCY MAHAN, PAUL MAHONEY, MARIA ROBLES, EDWARD J MARKEY, CHRISTINA MARSHALL, MARGARET H MARSHALL, NANCY MARTINS, MASSACHUSETTS BAY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, MAUREEN FEENEY, ROSLYNN R MAUSKOPF, DEAN MAZZARELLA, AMY M. MCCALLEN, ANDREA W. MCCARTHY, IAN MCCLAIN, MICHAEL MCCORMACK, MCCULLOUGH, STIEVATER & POLVERE, DONNA MCDONOUGH, DOUGLAS M MCGARRAH, OMAR MCGOVERN, WILLIAM P. MCGOVERN, JASON MCGRANE, ROBERT J. MCKENNA, DANIEL J. MCKENZIE, DAVID S. MCMAHON, MATT VP MCTYGUE, MELICK & PORTER, EVAN MEREDITH, METHUNION MANOR COOPERATIVE CORP., MICHAEL B HALPIN, CAROL A. MICI, SUSAN MILLS, MINTZ LEVIN COHN FERRIS GLOVSKY & POPEO, PC, CHRISTOPHER R. MIRICK, LAUREN M. MITCHELL, WALTER T MITCHELL, CHARLES K. MONE, GERALD F. MOORE, MORGAN, BROWN & JOY LLP, ERICA MORIN, MORRISON MAHONEY LLP, MPD LAW, LLC., ELIZABETH N MULVEY, RACHEL E. MUNOZ, JOSLIN HAM MURPHY, ROBERT MURPHY, SUSAN D. MURPHY, MURPHY & RILEY, REBECCA MURRAY, MARIO MYRTHIL, McNEES WALLACE & NURICK LLC, MARYGRACE NEAL, NIXON PEABODY LLP, GARETH W. NOTIS, ANDREA F. NUCIFORO, JR, KIMBERLY C. NUZSUM, DAVID J. O'CONNOR, FRANCIS J O'CONNOR, MICHAEL O'CONNOR, NICOLE M. O'CONNOR, EUGENE L. O'FLAHERTY, SEAN PATRICK O'MALLEY, GEORGE A O'TOOLE, JR, KATHLEEN M O'TOOLE, ALBERT OGISTE, BISOLA OJIKUTU, CARMEN M ORTIZ, TYLER OSTHOLTHOFF, ANTHONY S. OWENS, COLEEN PALMISANO, WHITNEY C PASTERNACK, PATTI B SARIS, MARK ALAN PERKINS, PETER H VELYVIS, MARILYN M. PETITTO DEVANEY, CHRISTOPHER E PHILLIPS, MARY PICCIRILLI, NINA PICKERING-COOK, LAWRENCE PIERCE, PINE STREET INN, STEVE POFTAK, STEPHANIE POLLACK, MATTHEW P. POPPEL, MICHAEL J. POWER, ROBERT P POWERS, JOHN T. PRESCOBB, PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE, PRINCE LOBEL TYE LLP., JOHN P. PULEO, PURCHASE AMERICA, INC., ROBERT L. QUAYLE, LUIS MANUEL RAMIREZ, CHARLES W. RANKIN, BATOOL RAZA, MARY REGAN, LEO RAFAEL REIF, JOHN REINSTEIN, JULIANA DEHAAN RICE, SHELLEY M RICHMOND JOSEPH, KEVIN M. RIORDAN, R. BRANDON RIOS, RICARDO BRANDON RIOS, ANTHONY J. RIZZO, THOMAS G. ROBBINS, ROBERT A BROWN, ROBERT M FARRELL, ROBERT W IULIANO, SCOTT A. ROBERTS, RACHAEL E ROLLINS, ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF BOSTON, ROBERTO RONQUILLO, JR, JEFFREY B. RUDMAN, BYRON RUSHING, RYAN A MACLEAN, PATRICIA RYLE, SAINT FRANCIS HOUSE, INC, KENNETH W. SALINGER, DENISE O. SALTERS, RAMAN SAMRA, CHRISTOPHER SAMUEL, SARAH A THORNTON, ANGELO M. SCACCIA, KAREN SCHULTZ, BRUCE M SELYA, HAROLD SHAW, ROBERT L. SHEKETOFF, SARAH B. SINGER, ELEANOR SINNOTT, WILLIAM F. SINNOTT, SONIA L. SKINNER, SARA SLYMON, DIANE SMITH, MARTHA B SOSMAN, FRANCIS X SPINA, WILLIAM SPRAGUE, SARAH ST PIERRE, JOSEPH STANTON, STAPES INC, JENNIFER STAPLES, STAR MARKET, INC., LAWRENCE M. STARR, RICHARD G STEARNS, KURT G. STENHOUSE, DONALD K STERN, STEVEN M CORLISS, WILLARD STIEVATER, CHRISTOPHER STORM, SUFFOLK COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT, CATHERINE E. SULLIVAN, DANIEL P. SULLIVAN, DENNIS F. SULLIVAN, JANE A. SULLIVAN, JOSEPH SULLIVAN, MICAHEL J SULLIVAN, JAMES L. SULTAN, CHRIS SUMMA, MARK H. SUMMERVILLE, SUPREME JUDICIAL COURT, ISABEL SWEET, STEVEN TANKLE, BETSY TAYLOR, DAVID TAYLOR, GREGG TAYLOR, LISA A. TENEROWICZ, TENT CITY CORP., THE GEORGETOWN COMPANY LLC, THE TOWNE LAW FIRM, PC, THECANTON CORP, ANN THOMAS, O ROGERIEE THOMPSON, WALTER F. TIMILTY, ORLANDO TIRELLA, JOHN L. TOBIN, TOMMASINO & TOMMASINO, STEVEN W. TOMPKINSW, TOWN OF BROOKLINE, ROSEMARY A. TRAINI, LIZA J. TRAN, TRUSTEES OF BOSTON PUBLIC LIBRARY, TRUSTEES OF BOSTON UNIVERSITY, TRUSTEES OF TUFTS COLLEGE;, TS LAND TRUST LLC, JOE H TUCKER, JR, TUCKER LAW GROUP, LLC, THOMAS A. TURCO, III, JEFFREY C. TURK, PAUL TUTTLE, A. RAYMOND TYE, U MASS MEMORIAL HEALTH CARE, INC, BOODIE UGNUMBA, ULTIMATE PARKING, INC, ACHESON H. VALLAGHAN, MICHAEL VAN DANG, JOHN VANSCOYOC, CHRISTOPHER VAZQUEZ, BRIAN P. VOKE, SARA A. WALKER, ANTHONY WALROND, MARTIN J. WALSH, MARK WANG, STANLEY WANG, ELIZABETH WARREN, DAVID WATERFALL, BRIAN F WELSH, DALILA ARGAEZ WENDLANDT, JOHN WHEATLEY, WHITE & CASE, LLP, WILBERT WILSON, JULIA WILDER, HERBERT P WILKINS, WILLIAM P LEAHY, SHAWN A. WILLIAMS, WILLIE BUTLERM, KARYN M. WILSON, JEFFREY M. WINIK, WINNCOMPANIES, MARK L WOLF, CATHERINE O'HAGAN WOLFE, LENA WONG, PATTY WONG-MURPHY, DOUGLAS P WOODLOCK, MARIA YANAKOPOULOS, YIELD10 BIOSCIENCE, JANE E YOUNG, ROBERT GEORGE YOUNG, II, WILLIAM G YOUNG, JOHN P. ZANINI, MONIKA ZARSKI, RYA W ZOBEL, JESUS __. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF on 3/22/2024 (sg) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Summons Issued as to MERRICK GARLAND, JUAN R SANCHEZ, UNITED STATES. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF on 3/22/2024, Summons Issued as to MERRICK GARLAND, JUAN R SANCHEZ, UNITED STATES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF on 3/22/2024. (sg) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number 20018520 (sbt) |
|
3 | 3
![]() MOTION TO REDACT FILED BY FRIEDRICH LU. (mbh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() MOTION TO DISQUALIFY FILED BY FRIEDRICH LU.(mbh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() Complaint against ROBERTO RONQUILLO, JR, ABM JANITORIAL SERVICES NORTHEAST, INC., MARGARET M. ABRUZESE, PETER W. AGNES, JR, ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., ALLISON D BURROUGHS, CHRISTOPHER M. ANDERSON, ANDERSON & KREIGER LLP, GERALD T. ANGELIN, ANNE TAYLOR, EVELYN ARANA-ORTIZ, JOSE ARAUJO, GREGORY R ARCHIBALD, ZAMAWA ARENAS, ARENTFOX SCHIFF, ARMADA WASTE MA II, LLC, PATRICIA ARMSTRONG, BAIRD HOLM LLP, CHARLES D. BAKER, JR, ANNAPURNA BALAKRISHNA, WARREN T BAMFORD, DAVID J BARRON, BAY COVE HUMAN RESOURCES, INC., ANNETTE C. BENEDETTO, GEORGE A. BERMAN, JOSEPH S. BERMAN, MARK N. BERMAN, ANNA BLACKBURNE-RIGSBY, DOMINIC BLUE, BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF MASSACHUSETTS, INC., LESTER BLUMBERG, JENNIFER C BOAL, JOSEPH R BONAVOLONTA, RUTH BONSIGNORE, JESSE M. BOODOO, BOSTON COLLEGE, BOSTON HOUSING AUTHORITY, BOSTON PUBLIC HEALTH COMMISSION, BOSTON SCHOOL COMMITTEE, MARGOT BOTSFORD, MICHAEL BOUDIN, WILLARD J. BOULTER, III, BOWDITCH & DEWEY, LLP, BOWDITCH AND DEWEY, LLP, MARIANNE B BOWLER, COLIN R. BOYLE, BOYLE SHAUGHNESSY LAW PC, DENNIS BRADBURY, JILL M. BRADLEY, RONALD L. BRANDT, AMY B. BRATSKEIR, MARIE BREEN, DOUGLAS S BROOKS, DOUGLAS S. BROWN, ROBERT M. BUCHANAN, JR, KIMBERLY S BUDD, MICHAEL H. BUNIS, ANDREA J CAMPBELL, LEVIN H CAMPBELL, BEVERLY J. CANNONE, CAPITOL GRILLE OF BOSTON, INC, CAPITOL WASTE SERVICES, INC., PAULA M. CAREY, DAVID CARRASCO, CRYSTAL CARRINGTON, JAMES CARROLL, ROSEMARY CASHMAN, JULIO A CASTILLO, CASTLE SQUARE TENANTS ORGANIZATION, KATHLEEN M. CAWLEY, JEFFREY C CECIL, CHING-JU CHANG, SHAUGHNESSY CHARBONNEAU, LYNN R CHARYTAN, CHOATE HALL & STEWART, JODI CHOEN, DAVID CHRISTINI, CHRISTOPHER J NOONE, JULIE CIOLLO, JAMES R. CLARKE, CLASSIC CLEANING CO, INC, JOHN C. CLOUGH, CMBG3 LAW LLC., JIA M COBB, GINA COHEN, COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, WILBUR E. COMMODORE, MARC C. CONCANNON, MARK C. CONCANNON, DANIEL F. CONLEY, RUSSELL F. CONN, CONN KAVANAUGH ROSENTHAL PEISCH & FORD LLP, KATHRYN COOK, ROBERT J CORDY, CORRIGAN JOHNSON & TUTOR, PA, COUNSEL JACQUELINE L ALLEN;, PAMELA COVENEY, JUDITH CA COWIN, MICHAEL A COX, ROBERT D. COX, JR, DANIEL G. CROMACK, JOSEPH V. CRONIN, RICHARD CURTIN, ELSPETH B CYPHER, LYNDA D'ANDREA, WILLIAM J. DAILEY, III, BRIAN G. DALTON, MARK P. DALY, DANA FARBER CANCER INSTITUTE, EDWARD F. DAVIS, III, KEVIN DAVIS, YUDELKYS DE LOS SANTOS, LAURA DEBONIS, JUDITH G DEIN, MARIA E. DELUZIO, SCOTT K DEMELLO, DENISE J CASPER, FRANK DEPAOLA, PAUL DEPAULO, DONNA M. DEPRISCO, RICHARD C DESLAURIERS, JODY L GOODMAN DINAN, DISABILITY LAW CENTER, MARK C DIVINCENZO, MATTHEW DIVRIS, DLC MANAGEMENT CORP., DAVID T. DONNELLY, DAVID T DONNELLY, SUSAN M. DONNELLY, DONNELLY CONROY & GELHAAR, ERIC T DONOVAN, LYNDIA DOWNIE, IRWIN DRIGGS, CAROLINE O. DRISCOLL, JEFFREY DRISCOLL, ANNA DRONZEK, EILEEN R. DUFF, FERNANDE RV DUFFLY, JOHN EGAN, SANDRA L. EHLINGER, THOMAS M. ELCOCK, EMINA ZAGANJORI KELLY, BRENDAN ENGLAND, JOHN T ENGLANDER, WILLIAM ENRIGHT, ERIKA GEETTER, PAUL FRANCIS EVANS, JR, WILLIAM B EVANS, F DENNIS SAYLOR IV, JOHN A. FAHEY, FREDERICK E. FAIRFIELD, JR, HEATHER L. FAIRFIELD, HEATHER LYNN FAIRFIELD, FAIRFIELD REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT CORP, FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORP., ABIGAIL L. FEE, PETER D. FEEHERRY, JOEL J. FELDMAN, RAUL FERNANDEZ, JOSEPH C. FERREIRA, PHOEBE FISCHER-GROBAN, JOEL FLORES, FOR THE RECORD, INC., BENJAMIN FRANCO, TIMOTHY FRATES, JESSICA L. FRATTAROLI, DAVID FREDETTE, STEPHEN D. FULLER, FULLER ROSENBERG PALMER & BELIVEAU LLP, CAROL FULP, G&M COURT REPORTERS, LTD, G4S SECURE SOLUTIONS (USA), INC, BERTHE M. GAINES, WILLIAM F GALVIN, MARIELENA GAMBOA-RUIZ, MICHAEL S. GARDENER, JOHN E. GARLAND, MERRICK GARLAND, SAMUEL R. GATES, BRENDAN J. GAUGHAN, THOMAS GAUGHAN, III, FRANK M GAZIANO, PETER GELHAAR, GUSTAVO A GELPI, KATHLEEN M. GENOVA, JASON CHAKA GEORGE, SERGE GEORGES, JR, NANCY GERTNER, ANDREW GHOBRIAL, JAMES P. GIANELLIS, DEIRDRE M. GIBLIN, MICHAEL J. GILL, JORDANA B. GLASGOW, KAREN A. GLASGOW, WAYNE P. GODIN, BENJAMIN K. GOLDEN, BENJAMIN GOLDEN, DAVID A. GOLDMAN, JULIE GOLDMAN, MATTHEW M GRAVES, STEPHEN S. GRAY, JOHN M GREANEY, MARK V. GREEN, BERNARD GREENE, LESLIE MILLER GREENSPAN, CAROL A. GRIFFIN, WILLIAM G GROSS, ANTHONY GULLY, DAVID F. HADLOCK, ANDREW J. HAILE, JOHN T. HAILER, KARLENE HALL, ROBERT R. HAMEL, JR, HAMEL MARCIN DUNN REARDON & SHEA PC, HEATHER HAMILTON, MARK P. HARMON, EDWARD F HARRINGTON, TIMOTHY J HARRINGTON, CYNTHIA B. HARTMAN, JAHAD HASAN, DAVE HASSAN, HASSAN & REARDON, PC, KEVIN R HAYDEN, MAURA T HEALEY, MARGARET HEGARTY, NANCY S. HELLER, MAURA A. HENNIGAN, GERALDINE S HINES, MARK A HIPPLE, HIRSCH ROBERTS WEINSTEIN LLP, DANIEL J. HOGAN, PATI A. HOLORAN, THOMAS M HOOPES, STEPHEN HORGAN, THOMAS C. HORGAN, ALYCIA HORN, ANDREW R. HORNE, JEFFREY R HOWARD, BRIAN P HUDAK, GEORGE HULME, MARY E. HURLEY, CHRISTOPHER A. IANNELLA, INDIRA TALWANI, RODERICK L IRELAND, ISI SOFTWARE, JACKSON LEWIS PC, DARON L. JANIS, JENNIFER M STAPLES, JESSS SON, JOHN DOE, JOHN HANCOCK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CO, JOHN B. JOHNSON, JON DAVID LEVIN, SIAN JONES, JONES & FULLER REPORTING, INC, JOHN JORRITSMA, JOSEPH HERLIHY, JOSEPH M LEE, MYONG J JOUN, JOHN J. JOY, JPMORGAN CHASE, ROBERT L. JUBINVILLE, SCOTT L KAFKER, KENNETH W KAISER, ABDUL KAMARA, ZIAD KAMEL, KAREN FRINK WOLF, PAUL V KASTNER, KASTNER REALTY TRUST, BENJAMIN KATZ, PAUL S. KAWAI, WILLIAM J KAYATTA, JR, PETER KEENAN, JAMIE LEWIS KEITH, BRIAN T KELLY, BRIAN KELLY, ELIZABETH H. KELLY, SALLY A. KELLY, MICHAEL KENDALL, KEVIN P. KERR, CAMERON F KERRY, C. JEFFREY KINDER, JOSEPH A. KING, MELVIN KLECHNER, JULIA E. KOBICK, PAUL LA CAMERA, KAREN LAFRAZIA, LANCE E WALKER, BRIAN LANG, JOSEPH N LAPLANTE, DARYL J. LAPP, PAUL N LAPROCINA, JR, SHEILA F LAWN, LAWRENCE H SUMMERS, DANIEL M. LEE, FRED LEE, DENNIS LEHANE, LEIGH CAMPBELL JOYCE, BARBARA A LENK, LEO T SOROKIN, MICHAEL J LEPIZZERA, LEPIZZERA AND LAPROCINA, JOSHUA S LEVY, ROBERT L. LEWIS, LIBBY HOOPES BROOKS AND MULVEY, PC, MELANIE LIMA, LIMITED TO ENDODONTICS, INC, KERMIT V LIPEZ, VINCENT B LISI, DEBRA ANN LIVINGSTON, JEFFREY A LOCKE, LOCKE LORD LLP, LONGWOOD SECURITY SERVICES, INC, DAVID A LOWY, KENNETH W. LUKE, ERIK LUND, SANDRA L LYNCH, CHARLES LYONS, ROY MACKENZIE, DAVID S. MACKEY, KEVIN MICHAEL MAGOON, NANCY MAHAN, PAUL MAHONEY, MARIA ROBLES, EDWARD J MARKEY, CHRISTINA MARSHALL, MARGARET H MARSHALL, NANCY MARTINS, MASSACHUSETTS BAY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, MAUREEN FEENEY, ROSLYNN R MAUSKOPF, DEAN MAZZARELLA, AMY M. MCCALLEN, ANDREA W. MCCARTHY, IAN MCCLAIN, MICHAEL MCCORMACK, MCCULLOUGH, STIEVATER & POLVERE, DONNA MCDONOUGH, DOUGLAS M MCGARRAH, OMAR MCGOVERN, WILLIAM P. MCGOVERN, JASON MCGRANE, ROBERT J. MCKENNA, DANIEL J. MCKENZIE, DAVID S. MCMAHON, MATT VP MCTYGUE, MELICK & PORTER, EVAN MEREDITH, METHUNION MANOR COOPERATIVE CORP., MICHAEL B HALPIN, CAROL A. MICI, SUSAN MILLS, MINTZ LEVIN COHN FERRIS GLOVSKY & POPEO, PC, CHRISTOPHER R. MIRICK, LAUREN M. MITCHELL, WALTER T MITCHELL, CHARLES K. MONE, GERALD F. MOORE, MORGAN, BROWN & JOY LLP, ERICA MORIN, MORRISON MAHONEY LLP, MPD LAW, LLC., ELIZABETH N MULVEY, RACHEL E. MUNOZ, JOSLIN HAM MURPHY, ROBERT MURPHY, SUSAN D. MURPHY, MURPHY & RILEY, REBECCA MURRAY, MARIO MYRTHIL, McNEES WALLACE & NURICK LLC, MARYGRACE NEAL, NIXON PEABODY LLP, GARETH W. NOTIS, ANDREA F. NUCIFORO, JR, KIMBERLY C. NUZSUM, DAVID J. O'CONNOR, FRANCIS J O'CONNOR, MICHAEL O'CONNOR, NICOLE M. O'CONNOR, EUGENE L. O'FLAHERTY, SEAN PATRICK O'MALLEY, GEORGE A O'TOOLE, JR, KATHLEEN M O'TOOLE, ALBERT OGISTE, BISOLA OJIKUTU, CARMEN M ORTIZ, TYLER OSTHOLTHOFF, ANTHONY S. OWENS, COLEEN PALMISANO, WHITNEY C PASTERNACK, PATTI B SARIS, MARK ALAN PERKINS, PETER H VELYVIS, MARILYN M. PETITTO DEVANEY, CHRISTOPHER E PHILLIPS, MARY PICCIRILLI, NINA PICKERING-COOK, LAWRENCE PIERCE, PINE STREET INN, STEVE POFTAK, STEPHANIE POLLACK, MATTHEW P. POPPEL, MICHAEL J. POWER, ROBERT P POWERS, JOHN T. PRESCOBB, PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE, PRINCE LOBEL TYE LLP., JOHN P. PULEO, PURCHASE AMERICA, INC., ROBERT L. QUAYLE, LUIS MANUEL RAMIREZ, CHARLES W. RANKIN, BATOOL RAZA, MARY REGAN, LEO RAFAEL REIF, JOHN REINSTEIN, JULIANA DEHAAN RICE, SHELLEY M RICHMOND JOSEPH, KEVIN M. RIORDAN, R. BRANDON RIOS, RICARDO BRANDON RIOS, ANTHONY J. RIZZO, THOMAS G. ROBBINS, ROBERT A BROWN, ROBERT M FARRELL, ROBERT W IULIANO, SCOTT A. ROBERTS, RACHAEL E ROLLINS, ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF BOSTON, ROBERTO RONQUILLO, JR, JEFFREY B. RUDMAN, BYRON RUSHING, RYAN A MACLEAN, PATRICIA RYLE, SAINT FRANCIS HOUSE, INC, KENNETH W. SALINGER, DENISE O. SALTERS, RAMAN SAMRA, CHRISTOPHER SAMUEL, JUAN R SANCHEZ, SARAH A THORNTON, ANGELO M. SCACCIA, KAREN SCHULTZ, BRUCE M SELYA, HAROLD SHAW, ROBERT L. SHEKETOFF, SARAH B. SINGER, ELEANOR SINNOTT, WILLIAM F. SINNOTT, SONIA L. SKINNER, SARA SLYMON, DIANE SMITH, MARTHA B SOSMAN, FRANCIS X SPINA, WILLIAM SPRAGUE, SARAH ST PIERRE, JOSEPH STANTON, STAPES INC, JENNIFER STAPLES, STAR MARKET, INC., LAWRENCE M. STARR, RICHARD G STEARNS, KURT G. STENHOUSE, DONALD K STERN, STEVEN M CORLISS, WILLARD STIEVATER, CHRISTOPHER STORM, SUFFOLK COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT, CATHERINE E. SULLIVAN, DANIEL P. SULLIVAN, DENNIS F. SULLIVAN, JANE A. SULLIVAN, JOSEPH SULLIVAN, MICAHEL J SULLIVAN, JAMES L. SULTAN, CHRIS SUMMA, MARK H. SUMMERVILLE, SUPREME JUDICIAL COURT, ISABEL SWEET, STEVEN TANKLE, BETSY TAYLOR, DAVID TAYLOR, GREGG TAYLOR, LISA A. TENEROWICZ, TENT CITY CORP., THE GEORGETOWN COMPANY LLC, THE TOWNE LAW FIRM, PC, THECANTON CORP, ANN THOMAS, O ROGERIEE THOMPSON, WALTER F. TIMILTY, ORLANDO TIRELLA, JOHN L. TOBIN, TOMMASINO & TOMMASINO, STEVEN W. TOMPKINSW, TOWN OF BROOKLINE, ROSEMARY A. TRAINI, LIZA J. TRAN, TRUSTEES OF BOSTON PUBLIC LIBRARY, TRUSTEES OF BOSTON UNIVERSITY, TRUSTEES OF TUFTS COLLEGE;, TS LAND TRUST LLC, JOE H TUCKER, JR, TUCKER LAW GROUP, LLC, THOMAS A. TURCO, III, JEFFREY C. TURK, PAUL TUTTLE, A. RAYMOND TYE, U MASS MEMORIAL HEALTH CARE, INC, BOODIE UGNUMBA, ULTIMATE PARKING, INC, UNITED STATES, ACHESON H. VALLAGHAN, MICHAEL VAN DANG, JOHN VANSCOYOC, CHRISTOPHER VAZQUEZ, BRIAN P. VOKE, SARA A. WALKER, ANTHONY WALROND, MARTIN J. WALSH, MARK WANG, STANLEY WANG, ELIZABETH WARREN, DAVID WATERFALL, BRIAN F WELSH, DALILA ARGAEZ WENDLANDT, JOHN WHEATLEY, WHITE & CASE, LLP, WILBERT WILSON, JULIA WILDER, HERBERT P WILKINS, WILLIAM P LEAHY, SHAWN A. WILLIAMS, WILLIE BUTLERM, KARYN M. WILSON, JEFFREY M. WINIK, WINNCOMPANIES, MARK L WOLF, CATHERINE O'HAGAN WOLFE, LENA WONG, PATTY WONG-MURPHY, DOUGLAS P WOODLOCK, MARIA YANAKOPOULOS, YIELD10 BIOSCIENCE, JANE E YOUNG, ROBERT GEORGE YOUNG, II, WILLIAM G YOUNG, JOHN P. ZANINI, MONIKA ZARSKI, RYA W ZOBEL and JESUS filed by FRIEDRICH LU. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP)(mbh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |