Hodge v. White et al
Tennessee Western District Court | |
Judge: | Mark S Norris |
Referred: | Annie T Christoff |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-02179 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 3:20 AM CDT |
Defendant
New Era Transport, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Quin White
|
|
Plaintiff
James Albert Hodge
1738 Spain Street
New Orleans, LA 70117 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Attachment
Thu 04/11 1:10 PM
ATTACHMENT to1 Pro Se Complaint by James Albert Hodge.(jae) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 envelope | ||
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/29 2:13 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on 03/29/2024. (jad) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
ADR Compliance
Wed 03/20 10:44 AM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (csf) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge
Wed 03/20 10:44 AM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice LR 16.2
Wed 03/20 10:43 AM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/20 10:43 AM
Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Albert Hodge. (csf) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
cmp
Pro Se Complaint
Wed 03/20 10:35 AM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Albert Hodge.(csf) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Appearance of Counsel - Pro Se, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Envelope, | ||
Att: 5 Case assignment label | ||
misc
Clerks Referral to Magistrate Judge
Wed 03/20 10:51 AM
Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters, including screening of the complaint to determine whether or not summons shall be issued by the Clerk pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) and Local Rule 4.1(b)(2) (csf) |