Case Filed:Nov 24, 2014
Last checked: Sunday Dec 18, 2016 5:04 PM EST
IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF
JASON JOSEPH MAZZEI
Movant
OFFICE OF DISCIPLINARY COUNSEL
Represented By
Susan N. Dobbins
Office Of Disciplinary Counsel
contact info


1. Embattled bankruptcy lawyer agrees to disbarment (goerie.com)
Submitted Wed 02/18/2015
2. Area bankruptcy lawyer gets 3-year license suspension (goerie.com)
Submitted Sun 11/30/2014
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, June 04, 2020
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 06/04 10:44 AM
Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak. Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer assigned to the case. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2016
8 8 order Order Wed 04/13 2:26 PM
CONSENT ORDER on settlement. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 4/13/2016. (ten)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order on Motion to Withdraw Wed 04/13 2:24 PM
ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 4/13/2016. (ten) (Main Document replaced on 4/13/2016 to attach correct order) (ten)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2016
6 6 notice Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents Tue 04/12 10:12 AM
NOTICE of Acceptance of Settlement Proposal by OFFICE OF DISCIPLINARY COUNSEL. (ksa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 05, 2016
minutes Motion Hearing Tue 04/05 4:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti: Motion Hearing held on 4/5/2016 re:4 MOTION to Withdraw filed by OFFICE OF DISCIPLINARY COUNSEL. Court stated its intention to grant the motion after replacement counsel is appointed. (Court Reporter: R. Ford) (ten)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2016
5 5 order Order Thu 03/31 12:42 PM
ORDER scheduling hearing on4 Motion to Withdraw for Tuesday, April 5, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5A at the Joseph F. Weis U.S. Courthouse located at 700 Grant Street, Pittsburgh, PA. Notice of the electronic filing of this order will be made to the parties listed on the certificate of service attached to that motion (ECF No. 4 at 15) and to the movant, by electronic mail. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 3/31/2016. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ten)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2016
4 4 motion Withdraw Wed 03/30 2:38 PM
MOTION to Withdraw the Office of Disciplinary Counsel's appearance in Misc No. 14-00205 GLT in the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania, by OFFICE OF DISCIPLINARY COUNSEL. (tt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 07, 2015
3 3 order Order Wed 01/07 2:10 PM
It Is Ordered that Jason Joseph Mazzei, is hereby SUSPENDED ON CONSENT until further Order of court from the practice of law in the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania, and he shall comply with all the provisions of Rule 217 Pa.R.D.E., and pending further Order of this Court. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 1/6/2015. (gmt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 25, 2014
2 2 order Order Tue 11/25 3:23 PM
ORDER appointing the Office of Disciplinary Counsel of the Supreme Court of Pennsylvania as disciplinary counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/24/2014. Court staff served copies of this order on each counsel or judicial officer listed on the face of the order on this date through the court's CM/ECF system. (ten).
Related: [-]
Monday, November 24, 2014
1 1 order Order Mon 11/24 4:25 PM
ORDER that a Rule to Show Cause be and the same is hereby issued to JASON JOSEPH MAZZEI, to show good cause why an identical order of SUSPENSION ON CONSENT for a period of three years, should not be entered by the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania, returnable with thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/24/2014. (gmt)
Related: [-]