Ritrovato v. United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Original Case: 1:23-cv-12880
First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-civil-01267 |
Type | civil / us a party civil case / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 7:19 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
US SECURITIES & EXCHANGE COMMISSION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
NICHOLAS A. RITROVATO, III
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/21/2024 7:19 AM EDT |
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #20) filed by Appellant Nicholas A. Ritrovato, III. 24-1267 (JMK) | ||
Att: 1 8 pgs Abbreviated Record | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Case Opening Notice | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF | ||
2 pgs TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Nicholas A. Ritrovato, III indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Served on 03/20/2024. 24-1267 (NAR) |