White v. Secretary, Department of Corrections (Volusia County)
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Anne C Conway |
Referred: | Embry J Kidd |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00544 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 04/18 11:05 PM
ORDER Granting 5 Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall have until May 6, 2024, to comply with the Court's Order 3 of March 27, 2024. The failure to comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. The Court's Order 4 dismissing this case is VACATED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to reopen this case. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 4/18/2024. (KLD) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Thu 04/18 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LSS) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 04/16 1:29 PM
ORDER DISMISSING case without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed close this case. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 4/16/2024. (KLD) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File
Wed 04/17 3:03 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File re3 Order by Marcus White.(ARL) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/27 8:35 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Within fourteen days from the date of this Order, Petitioner must submit a certified copy of his prison account statement containing all the transactions in his prisoner account for the period from December 20, 2023, through March 20, 2024, (the three months preceding the filing of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus). The failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 3/26/2024. (DS) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/21 10:41 AM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Marcus White.(ARL) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/21 10:41 AM
COMPLAINT against Secretary, Department of Corrections filed by Marcus White. (pages 5 & 6 not included)(ARL) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Mailing Envelope |