POWER OF GOD CATHEDRAL
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth S Stong |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-41193 |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Debtor
POWER OF GOD CATHEDRAL
17138 107th Ave
Jamaica, NY 11433-2530 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Affidavit/Certificate of Service
Wed 05/01 1:00 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Office of the United States Trustee (Lateef, Reema) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss Case
Mon 04/29 5:18 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case . Objections to be filed on 5/23/2024. Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/30/2024 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (Lateef, Reema) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10
motion
Withdraw As Attorney
Mon 04/29 7:33 AM
First Motion to Withdraw as Attorney . Objections to be filed on May 9, 2024. Filed by Christal Cammock on behalf of Power of God Cathedral. Hearing scheduled for 5/30/2024 at 10:00 AM (check with court for location).Order to be presented for signature on 5/30/2024. (Cammock, Christal) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit certificate notice | ||
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
trustee
Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors
Fri 04/26 12:13 PM
Trustee's Notice of Continued Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) Meeting Adjourned to 4/29/2024 at 11:00 AM at Teleconference - Brooklyn. (Lateef, Reema) |
||
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Reset of Section 341 Meeting of Creditors
Fri 03/29 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Reset of Section 341 Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 03/28/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order
Thu 03/28 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 03/27/2024. (Admin.) |
|
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto
Wed 03/27 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Installment Filing Fee - $1,698.00. Receipt Number 10333198. (LS) (admin) |
||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges
Mon 03/25 3:08 PM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference . Signed on 3/25/2024. Status hearing to be held on 5/6/2024 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sej) |
|
6 | 6
trustee
Notice of Rescheduled Telephonic 341 Meeting with Instructions
Mon 03/25 9:07 AM
Notice of Rescheduled Telephonic 341 Meeting with Instructions. Meeting scheduled for April 26, 2024, at 12:00 p.m. Filed by Office of the United States Trustee . (Lateef, Reema) |
|
Sunday, March 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Mon 03/25 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 03/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, March 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing
Sun 03/24 12:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 03/23/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Fri 03/22 2:52 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/26/2024 at 12:00 PM at Teleconference - Brooklyn. (drk) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
court
Deficient Filing Chapter 11
Thu 03/21 3:58 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Filing fee for commencing a bankruptcy case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1930a due by 3/21/2024. Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 3/21/2024.Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 3/21/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 3/21/2024. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 3/21/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 3/21/2024. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 3/21/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 4/4/2024. Schedule A/B due 4/4/2024. Schedule G due 4/4/2024. Schedule H due 4/4/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 4/4/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 4/4/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 4/4/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 4/4/2024. (nwh) |
|
1 | 1
13
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 03/21 9:08 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Fee Amount $ 40. Filed by Christal Cammock on behalf of POWER OF GOD CATHEDRAL Chapter 11 Plan - due by 07/19/2024. Chapter 11 Disclosure Statement due by 07/19/2024. (Cammock, Christal) Modified on 3/21/2024 to update petition type (nwh). Modified on 3/22/2024 to update due dates(drk) |
|
crditcrd
Automatic docket of credit card/debit card
Thu 03/21 9:24 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1 24-41193 ) [misc,volp11a] ( 40.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22476488. Fee amount 40.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
utility
Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadlines
Thu 03/21 3:50 PM
Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline Updated Chapter 11 Plan due by 7/19/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 7/19/2024. (nwh) |