Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Roy K Altman
Referred: Eduardo I Sanchez
Case #: 1:24-cv-21098
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2024
Terminated:Mar 22, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 17, 2024 4:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Northpark at Scott Carver Apartments
2181 NW 74th Street
Miami, FL 33147
Plaintiff
Valeshia Anglin
PO Box 720
Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33302

GPO Mar 22 2024
ORDER denying 3 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Denying as moot 4 Motion for Hearing. ( Amended Complaint due by 4/22/2024.) We will not accept any filings after April 22, 2024. This case shall be CLOSED for administrative purposes. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 3/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 25, 2024
10 10 order Order on Motion for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program Thu 04/25 11:57 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER STRIKING 9 the Plaintiff's Motion for Referral to Voluntary Attorney Program. Our5 Order Denying the Plaintiff's IFP Motion was clear that we would "not accept any filings after April 22, 2024" if the Plaintiff failed to file her amended complaint by that date. Id. at 6. That date has passed, and the Plaintiff hasn't filed an amended complaint. See generally Docket. We'll therefore STRIKE 9 the Plaintiff's Motion. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/25/2024. (rco)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Volunteer Attorney Program Thu 04/25 10:14 AM
(STRICKEN PER DE# 10 ) MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Valeshia Anglin. (nwn) Modified Text on 4/25/2024 (cds)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
8 8 3 pgs order Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant Fri 04/05 9:04 AM
ORDER PROVIDING INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANTS. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/4/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order on Motion for Hearing Thu 04/04 10:31 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot 6 the Plaintiff's Amended Motion for a Hearing. On March 22, 2024, we dismissed the Plaintiff's Complaint without prejudice and gave the Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint by April 22, 2024. See 5 Order Denying IFP Motion at 6. The Plaintiff hasn't done that yet. See generally Docket. Without an operative complaint, then, there is nothing for us to hold a hearing on. See, e.g. , Powell v. Rios , 241 F. App'x 500, 505 n.4 (10th Cir. 2007) ("The Federal Rules of Civil Procedure make clear that only a properly-filed 'complaint' can commence a civil action." (citing Fed. R. Civ. P. 3)); Vaughan v. Apfel , 209 F.R.D. 496, 499 (S.D. Fla. 2001) (Glazebrook, Mag. J.) ("This matter simply cannot proceed without an operative complaint."). Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/4/2024. (rco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
6 6 motion Hearing Wed 04/03 4:11 PM
AMENDED MOTION for a Hearing by Valeshia Anglin. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
5 5 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Hearing Fri 03/22 11:38 AM
ORDER denying3 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Denying as moot4 Motion for Hearing. ( Amended Complaint due by 4/22/2024.) We will not accept any filings after April 22, 2024. This case shall be CLOSED for administrative purposes. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 3/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 03/22 11:39 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. PER DE#5 . (nwn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
4 4 motion Hearing Thu 03/21 12:58 PM
MOTION for Hearing re1 Complaint by Valeshia Anglin. (pc)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 03/21 12:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Valeshia Anglin. (pc)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 03/21 12:55 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/21 12:52 PM
COMPLAINT against Northpark at Scott Carver Apartments. Filing fees $ 405.00. IFP Filed, filed by Valeshia Anglin.(pc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit