Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-52488

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John E Hoffman Jr
Case #: 2:24-ap-02014
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2024
Terminated:Jan 22, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
The Pointe Hilliard
4890 Edwards Farms Rd.
Hilliard, OH 43026
Represented By
The Pointe Hilliard
contact info
Defendant
Red Energy
L-3765
Columbus, OH 43260
Represented By
Red Energy
contact info
Plaintiff
Shannon Nealey
5689 Briardale Ct Apt B
Dublin, OH 43016
Represented By
Shannon Nealey
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Wed 01/22 4:32 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-2014 , Adversary Case 2:24-ap-2014 Closed (ao)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
15 15 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Fri 11/22 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 11/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)13 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, November 14, 2024
14 14 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Fri 11/15 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 11/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)13 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
13 13 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Tue 11/12 2:43 PM
Order Dismissing Case. (kam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/09 10:13 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Red Energy. (ao)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
10 10 misc Summons Issued Fri 08/30 6:22 PM
Summons Issued on Pacific Pointe LLC Registered agent for the The Pointe Hilliard Date Issued 8/29/2024, Answer Due 9/30/2024 (ao)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Summons Issued Fri 08/30 6:20 PM
Summons Issued on The Pointe Hilliard Date Issued 8/29/2024, Answer Due 9/30/2024 (ao)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Summons Issued Fri 08/30 6:19 PM
Summons Issued on Bradley B. Wrightzel Registered agent for Red Energy, LLC Date Issued 8/29/2024, Answer Due 9/30/2024 (ao)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Summons Issued Fri 08/30 6:17 PM
Summons Issued on Red Energy Date Issued 8/29/2024, Answer Due 9/30/2024 (ao)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
6 6 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Fri 08/02 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 08/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)5 Order of Proposed Dismissal
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
5 5 order Proposed Dismissal Tue 07/30 2:34 PM
Order Directing Plaintiff to Comply with Procedural Requirements or Face Dismissal. Summons and Service Due: 8/29/2024 and Proof of Service Due 9/5/24. (kam)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
4 4 answer Response Tue 06/11 6:03 PM
Answer to/for Adversary Proceeding to Continue Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Shannon Nealey (ao)
Related: [-] 2 Order of Proposed Dismissal
Friday, May 31, 2024
3 3 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Sat 06/01 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 05/31/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)2 Order of Proposed Dismissal
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
2 2 order Proposed Dismissal Wed 05/29 9:19 AM
Order Proposing Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Objections Due: 6/19/2024. (spd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/21 1:09 PM
Adversary case 2:24-ap-02014. (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by Shannon Nealey against The Pointe Hilliard, Red Energy . Receipt Number Exempt, Fee Amount of $ 0.00 is Exempt (ao)
Related: [-]