Tillis v. Fidelity National Financial Inc. et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Marcia Morales Howard |
Referred: | Patricia D Barksdale |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00285 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 42:1396 - Tort Negligence |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Case in other court: | California Central, 5:23-cv-02537 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 7:17 PM EDT |
Defendant
Fidelity National Financial, Inc.,
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LoanCare LLC
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rodney Tillis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teneika Tillis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
misc
Pay Fee
Mon 04/22 10:46 AM
FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22006525 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Mona Amini. (Amini, Mona) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order
Thu 04/18 11:24 AM
ENDORSED ORDER. By May 1, 2024, each party must file a disclosure statement. See Local Rule 3.03; Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1; All Forms | Middle District of Florida | United States District Court (uscourts.gov) ("Disclosure Statement"). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on April 18, 2024(ASL) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/18 11:23 AM
ORDER granting 31 Mona Amini's motion asking the Court for permission to specially appear to represent Rodney Tillis in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 4/18/2024. (ASL) |
|
31 | 31
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/16 3:27 PM
MOTION for Mona Amini to appear pro hac vice by Rodney Tillis. (e-portal) (JDR) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 03/22 3:44 PM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ELM) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
transfer
District Transfer In
Thu 03/21 11:45 AM
TRANSFER IN from the Central District of California. Case assigned to District Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New Case Number: 3:24-cv-285-MMH-PDB. (MDC) |
|
28 | 28
transfer
Case transferred in - district transfer
Thu 03/21 11:43 AM
Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 5:23-cv-02537. File received electronically |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
27 | 27 ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation26 to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, in the interests of justice, this case is hereby TRANSFERRED for all further proceedings to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Original file electronically sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
26 | 26 STIPULATION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida filed by Defendants Fidelity National Financial Inc., LoanCare LLC.(Peralta, Adriane) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
25 | 25 NOTICE of Change of address by Adriane Kayoko Peralta attorney for Defendant Fidelity National Financial Inc.. Changing attorneys address to 350 South Grand Avenue, Los Angeles, California 90071. Filed by Defendant Fidelity National Financial Inc.. (Peralta, Adriane) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
Tuesday, February 20, 2024 | ||
24 | 24 Text Only Entry re Case closed in error re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)),23 ; case is returned to pending status and closed flag removed from case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
Thursday, February 15, 2024 | ||
23 | 23 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Teneika Tillis pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff Teneika Tillis's Claims Without Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to Fidelity National Financial Inc., LoanCare LLC. (Blood, Timothy) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
Monday, February 12, 2024 | ||
22 | 22 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition12 , filed by Plaintiffs Teneika Tillis, Rodney Tillis(Attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian added to party Rodney Tillis(pty:pla))(Kazerounian, Seyed) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
21 | 21 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R.Civ. P. 15(a)(2)20 . Defendants response to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint shall be due March 15, 2024. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
20 | 20 STIPULATION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Teneika Tillis.(Blood, Timothy) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Ex. A - (clean second amended complaint), | ||
Att: 2 Ex. B - (redlined version), | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
19 | 19 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Approving Stipulation to Extend Defendants' Deadline to Respond to the First Amended Complaint (More than 30 days)16 . The Court hereby orders that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint on or before March 15, 2024. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
Monday, January 29, 2024 | ||
18 | 18 Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings Pursuant to Local Rule 83-1.4 filed by plaintiff Teneika Tillis. (Blood, Timothy) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
17 | 17 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Teneika Tillis. Plaintiff's Notice of Related Case Pursuant to Local Rule 83-1.3 Related Case(s): 2:23-cv-10907-MEMF-JC (Blood, Timothy) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
16 | 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to March 15, 2024 re Amended Complaint/Petition12 filed by Defendants Fidelity National Financial Inc., LoanCare LLC.(Peralta, Adriane) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Adriane Kayoko Peralta counsel for Defendants Fidelity National Financial Inc., LoanCare LLC. Adding Adriane Peralta as counsel of record for Fidelity National Financial, Inc. and LoanCare, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Fidelity National Financial, Inc. and LoanCare, LLC. (Attorney Adriane Kayoko Peralta added to party Fidelity National Financial Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Adriane Kayoko Peralta added to party LoanCare LLC(pty:dft))(Peralta, Adriane) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
Friday, January 19, 2024 | ||
14 | 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Teneika Tillis, upon Defendant LoanCare LLC served on 1/12/2024, answer due 2/2/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Amini, Mona) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
13 | 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Teneika Tillis, upon Defendant Fidelity National Financial Inc. served on 1/10/2024, answer due 1/31/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Amini, Mona) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
Tuesday, January 09, 2024 | ||
12 | 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Teneika Tillis(Kazerounian, Seyed) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
Wednesday, January 03, 2024 | ||
11 | 11 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
Wednesday, December 13, 2023 | ||
10 | 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Fidelity National Financial Inc.. (sh) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
9 | 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant LoanCare LLC. (sh) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
8 | 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
7 | 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (sh) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
Tuesday, December 12, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Teneika Tillis. (Kazerounian, Seyed) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
4 | 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Teneika Tillis. (Kazerounian, Seyed) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Teneika Tillis, identifying Defendants Fidelity National Financial, Inc.; and LoanCare, LLC. (Kazerounian, Seyed) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Teneika Tillis. (Kazerounian, Seyed) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36560936 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Teneika Tillis. (Attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian added to party Teneika Tillis(pty:pla))(Kazerounian, Seyed) [Transferred from cacd on 3/21/2024.] |