Emery v. Equifax Information Services LLC
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Roy B Dalton, Jr |
Referred: | Robert M Norway |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00547 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 7:18 PM EDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Joseph Emery
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
utility
*Remark
Mon 04/08 8:24 AM
Remark: Doc.8 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/1/2024. (JWG) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Fri 03/29 10:08 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Michael Joseph Emery. Related case(s): No (Gomez, Octavio) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/29 10:07 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Michael Joseph Emery. (Gomez, Octavio) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Fri 03/29 10:06 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Octavio Gomez on behalf of Michael Joseph Emery. Lead Counsel: Octavio Gomez. (Gomez, Octavio) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
13
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/25 2:13 PM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/25/2024. (ALL) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 03/22 5:10 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LSS) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons issued
Fri 03/22 5:09 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC. (LSS) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program
Fri 03/22 8:50 AM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (LDJ) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/21 4:00 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:24-cv-547-RBD-RMN. (TNP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/21 11:11 AM
COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21895081) filed by Michael Joseph Emery.(Gomez, Octavio) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons as to Equifax |