Ariza v. Madame Tussauds Orlando, LLC
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | John Antoon II |
Referred: | Embry J Kidd |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00548 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 7:18 PM EDT |
Defendant
Madame Tussauds Orlando, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Victor Ariza
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons returned executed
Wed 04/17 4:33 PM
RETURN of service executed on 04/10/2024 by Victor Ariza as to Madame Tussauds Orlando, LLC. (Duran, Pelayo) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
respoth
Answer to court interrogatories
Tue 04/09 12:55 PM
ANSWER to court interrogatories re:5 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings by Victor Ariza.(Hannah, Roderick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Tue 04/02 11:08 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Victor Ariza. Related case(s): Yes (Hannah, Roderick) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/02 9:28 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re4 Interested Persons Order by Victor Ariza. (Hannah, Roderick) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
9
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 03/26 3:00 PM
ADA SCHEDULING ORDER setting various deadlines. Status Conference set for 10/9/2024 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 B before Judge John Antoon II. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/26/2024. (KLD) |
|
4 | 4
order
Interested Persons Order
Tue 03/26 2:55 PM
INITIAL CASE ORDER (ADA) directing counsel to file a Disclosure Statement within 7 days from the date of this order; file a notice of pendency if there is a related case within 14 days from the date of this order; waiving requirement for a case management report. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/26/2024. (KLD) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons issued
Mon 03/25 8:42 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Madame Tussauds Orlando, LLC. (LAB) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/21 12:30 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:24-cv-548-JA-EJK. (ARL) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/21 11:23 AM
COMPLAINT against Madame Tussauds Orlando, LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21895163) filed by Victor Ariza.(Duran, Pelayo) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons |