Ariza v. Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory A Presnell |
Referred: | Leslie Hoffman Price |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00550 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 7:18 PM EDT |
Defendant
Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Victor Ariza
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Thu 04/18 4:05 PM
NOTICE of a related action Defendant's Notice of Pendency of Other Actions per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.. Related case(s): No (DeBoe, Paul) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 04/15 4:36 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint. The deadline by which Defendant shall respond to the complaint is extended up to and including April 29, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 4/15/2024. (SFC) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint
Mon 04/15 4:02 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.. (DeBoe, Paul) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/15 4:00 PM
NOTICE by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS (DeBoe, Paul) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/15 3:58 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re4 Interested Persons Order by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Disney Enterprises, Inc., Corporate Parent The Walt Disney Company, Other Affiliate Walt Disney Parks & Resorts Online, LLC for Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.. (DeBoe, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Tue 04/02 12:30 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Victor Ariza. Related case(s): Yes (Hannah, Roderick) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/02 12:20 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re4 Interested Persons Order by Victor Ariza. (Hannah, Roderick) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons returned executed
Tue 03/26 9:49 AM
RETURN of service executed on 3/25/2024 by Victor Ariza as to Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.. (Hannah, Roderick) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Interested Persons Order
Fri 03/22 9:47 AM
INITIAL CASE ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement and Notice of Pendency of Other Actions due within 14 days. Case Management Report required in this case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/22/2024. (AKC) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons issued
Fri 03/22 9:43 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. (AJS) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/21 4:07 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:24-cv-550-GAP-LHP. (AA) |
|
1 | 1
21
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/21 12:24 PM
COMPLAINT against Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21895563) filed by Victor Ariza.(Hannah, Roderick) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons |