California Central District Court
Judge:Dale S Fischer
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 2:24-cv-02314
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2024
Terminated:Sep 18, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, County of Ventura, 2024CUICO20664
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 17, 2024 1:19 AM PDT
Defendant
American Amicable Life Insurance Company of Texas
Represented By
Hilda Adriana Akopyan
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Kevin Khachatryan
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Patrick K Shockey
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Adrienne Publicover
Represented By
Adrienne C Publicover
Jams
contact info
Plaintiff
Bryant Dempsey
Represented By
Scott E Calvert
Donahue And Horrow LLP
contact info
Michael B Horrow
Donahue And Horrow LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Does
Terminated: 05/30/2024
Plaintiff
Michelle Dempsey
Terminated: 07/19/2024
Represented By
Scott E Calvert
Donahue And Horrow LLP
contact info
Michael B Horrow
Donahue And Horrow LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 60 minutes ago
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
26 26 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 09/18 3:21 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DISMISSING CASE DUE TO SETTLEMENT by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court has been advised that this action has been settled. Accordingly, it is ordered that the action is dismissed without prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction for 60 days to vacate this Order and to reopen the action on a showing of good cause that the settlement has not been completed and further proceedings are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
25 25 notice Settlement Thu 09/05 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Bryant Dempsey. (Calvert, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
24 24 answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Thu 08/08 10:55 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition23 filed by Defendant American Amicable Life Insurance Company of Texas.(Khachatryan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
23 23 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Fri 07/19 2:55 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant American Amicable Life Insurance Company of Texas amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Bryant Dempsey(Attorney Michael B Horrow added to party Bryant Dempsey(pty:pla))(Horrow, Michael)
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs order Order Fri 07/19 11:58 AM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING The Stipulation for Leave to Allow the Filing of a First Amended Complaint Following Plaintiff's Death and to Change the Caption Pursuant to FRCP 15(a)(2)21 . The Caption shall be changed as follows: BRYANT DEMPSEY, Plaintiff, vs. AMERICAN AMICABLE LIFE INSURANCE OF COMPANY TEXAS; DOES 1-10 Defendants. See Order for specifics. (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
21 21 stip Amend/Correct Thu 07/18 4:53 PM
STIPULATION to AMEND Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Michelle Dempsey.(Calvert, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Friday, June 21, 2024
20 20 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Fri 06/21 12:53 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Adrienne Publicover has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
19 19 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Thu 05/30 9:12 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 2/24/2025. (pk)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Thu 05/30 9:11 AM
Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2025 at 03:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 5/20/2025 at 08:30 AM. (pk)
Related: [-]
17 17 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 05/30 9:02 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court takes the Scheduling Conference off calendar and establishes the case management dates as proposed by parties in the Joint Rule 26(f) Report as further described in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates except as noted in the Order re Trial. (See Order re Trial for specific dates and times.) These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine unless the Court orders otherwise. All fictitiously named defendants are dismissed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
16 16 stip Leave Wed 05/29 9:26 AM
Joint STIPULATION for Leave to Allow Plaintiff's Appearance at Scheduling Conference by Other Than Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiff Michelle Dempsey.(Horrow, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 20, 2024
15 15 misc Disclosure Mon 05/20 10:10 AM
Initial DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant American Amicable Life Insurance Company of Texas (Akopyan, Hilda)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
14 14 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Fri 05/17 6:27 AM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Adrienne Publicover may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 8/28/2024 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Defendant American Amicable Life Insurance Company of Texas(Shockey, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
13 13 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 05/06 4:45 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7-10 days, filed by Defendant American Amicable Life Insurance Company of Texas.. (Khachatryan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 05/03 2:10 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin Khachatryan counsel for Defendant American Amicable Life Insurance Company of Texas. Adding Kevin Khachatryan as counsel of record for American Amicable Life Insurance Company of Texas for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant American Amicable Life Insurance Company of Texas. (Attorney Kevin Khachatryan added to party American Amicable Life Insurance Company of Texas(pty:dft))(Khachatryan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
11 11 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/04 5:22 PM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING10 Non-Resident Attorney Patrick K Shockey APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant American Amicable Life Insurance Company of Texas, designating Hilda A. Akopyan as local counsel. (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 04/03 12:50 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Patrick K. Shockey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant American Amicable Life Insurance Company of Texas (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37218282) filed by Defendant American Amicable Life Insurance Company of Texas. (Akopyan, Hilda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
9 9 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 03/27 11:32 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (pk)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 03/27 11:22 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (pk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 03/22 9:08 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 03/22 9:08 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 03/22 9:07 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/21 11:40 AM
ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Defendant American Amicable Life Insurance Company of Texas.(Akopyan, Hilda)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/21 11:21 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant American Amicable Life Insurance Company of Texas, identifying Pioneer Security Life Insurance Company; IA American Life Insurance Company; IA American Holdings Inc; Industrial Alliance Insurance and Financial Services Inc. and iA Financial Corporation Inc.. (Akopyan, Hilda)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/21 11:16 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant American Amicable Life Insurance Company of Texas. (Akopyan, Hilda)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/21 11:15 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Ventura, case number 2024CUICO20664 Receipt No: ACACDC-37138128 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant American Amicable Life Insurance Company of Texas. (Attorney Hilda Adriana Akopyan added to party American Amicable Life Insurance Company of Texas(pty:dft))(Akopyan, Hilda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 8 pgs Exhibit A-State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-State Court Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-State Court Summons,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-State Court Notice of Case Assignment,
Att: 5 Exhibit E-State Court Notice of Case Assignment and Mandatory Appearance,
Att: 6 Exhibit F-State Court Proof and Personal Service
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 03/22 9:38 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants American Amicable Life Insurance Company of Texas, Does 1-10. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Michelle Dempsey. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/14/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ]. (et)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 03/22 9:41 AM
CONFORMED E-FILED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Michelle Dempsey, upon Defendant American Amicable Life Insurance Company of Texas served on 2/21/2024, answer due 3/13/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jenn Bautista, Agent for CSC Lawyers in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/27/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT F AS ATTACHMENT NO. 6 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ]. (et)
Related: [-]